Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1320741

EP1320741 - MICROFLUIDIC DEVICES FOR ROTATIONAL MANIPULATION OF THE FLUIDIC INTERFACE BETWEEN MULTIPLE FLOW STREAMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.06.2009
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip19.06.2009Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 22.07.2009  [2009/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
University of Washington
Suite 42, 1107 N.E. 45th Street
Seattle, WA 98105 / US
[2003/26]
Inventor(s)01 / KAMHOLZ, Andrew
6030 35th Avenue NE
Seattle, WA 98105 / US
02 / MUNSON, Matthew
2116 NE 88th Street, 2
Seattle, WA 98115 / US
03 / SCHILLING, Eric
3918 Meridian Avenue N
Seattle, WA 98013 / US
04 / HAWKINS, Kenneth
20505 SE 24th
Sammamish, WA 78075 / US
05 / WEIGL, Bernhardt, H.
5530 Canfield Place N
Seattle, WA 98103 / US
06 / BARDELL, Ronald L.
8500 148th Avenue
NE U3068, Redmond, WA 98052 / US
 [2003/26]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/26]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Former [2004/23]Grünecker, August, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Partner Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Former [2003/26]Fisher, Adrian John , et al
CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date01973129.818.09.2001
[2003/26]
WO2001US29137
Priority number, dateUS20000233396P18.09.2000         Original published format: US 233396 P
US20010269754P16.02.2001         Original published format: US 269754 P
[2003/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0223161
Date:21.03.2002
Language:EN
[2002/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1320741
Date:25.06.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.03.2002
[2003/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US21.03.2002
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.08.2006
ClassificationInternational:G01N15/06, G01N21/64, G01N30/00, G01N35/08, B01D11/00
[2003/26]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/26]
TitleGerman:MIKROFLUIDISCHE EINRICHTUNGEN ZUR DREHMANIPULATION DER FLUIDISCHEN GRENZFLÄCHE ZWISCHEN MEHREREN STRÖMUNGEN[2003/26]
English:MICROFLUIDIC DEVICES FOR ROTATIONAL MANIPULATION OF THE FLUIDIC INTERFACE BETWEEN MULTIPLE FLOW STREAMS[2003/26]
French:DISPOSITIFS MICROFLUIDIQUES POUR MANIPULATION PAR ROTATION DE L'INTERFACE FLUIDIQUE ENTRE PLUSIEURS ECOULEMENTS FLUIDIQUES[2003/26]
Entry into regional phase27.03.2003National basic fee paid 
27.03.2003Search fee paid 
27.03.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
27.03.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.04.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
27.03.2003Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.03.2003Examination requested  [2003/26]
05.09.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.01.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2009/30]
23.02.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2009/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
25.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
21.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
27.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
26.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200404   M06   Fee paid on   25.10.2004
30.09.200808   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[PX]US6136272  (WEIGL BERNHARD [US], et al) [PX] 1-32 * abstract * * column 2, lines 23-36 * * column 3, line 35 - column 4, line 54 * * column 14, line 44 - column 15, line 12 * * figure 8 *
International search[Y]US5716852
 [X]US5932100
 [X]US5972710
 [X]US5971158
 [X]WO9700442