Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1321009

EP1321009 - METHOD FOR PERFORMING A CANDIDATE FREQUENCY SEARCH IN A WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2003/26]METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PERFORMING A CANDIDATE FREQUENCY SEARCH IN A WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM
[2006/31]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.11.2007
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 11.09.2013  [2013/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
QUALCOMM INCORPORATED
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2003/26]
Inventor(s)01 / CHEN, Qingxin
841 America Way
Del Mar, CA 92014 / US
02 / ACHOUR, Baaziz
4215 Camino Sandoval
San Diego, CA 92130 / US
 [2003/26]
Representative(s)Wagner & Geyer
Partnerschaft
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/26]Wagner & Geyer
Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
D-80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date01973609.927.09.2001
[2003/26]
WO2001US30422
Priority number, dateUS2000067703929.09.2000         Original published format: US 677039
[2003/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0228122
Date:04.04.2002
Language:EN
[2002/12]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1321009
Date:25.06.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.04.2002
[2003/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1321009
Date:03.01.2007
Language:EN
[2007/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.10.2002
ClassificationInternational:H04Q7/38
[2003/26]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/26]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM DURCHFÜHREN EINER KANDIDATFREQUENZSUCHE IN EINEM DRAHTLOSEN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM[2006/31]
English:METHOD FOR PERFORMING A CANDIDATE FREQUENCY SEARCH IN A WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM[2006/31]
French:PROCEDE DE RECHERCHE D'UNE FREQUENCE CANDIDATE DANS UN SYSTEME DE TELECOMMUNICATIONS SANS FIL[2006/31]
Former [2003/26]VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM DURCHFÜHREN EINER KANDIDATFREQUENZSUCHE IN EINEM DRAHTLOSEN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM
Former [2003/26]METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PERFORMING A CANDIDATE FREQUENCY SEARCH IN A WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM
Former [2003/26]PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE RECHERCHE D'UNE FREQUENCE CANDIDATE DANS UN SYSTEME DE TELECOMMUNICATIONS SANS FIL
Entry into regional phase31.03.2003National basic fee paid 
31.03.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
31.03.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.04.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
31.03.2003Examination requested  [2003/26]
20.08.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.02.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.09.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.03.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.07.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.11.2006Fee for grant paid
14.11.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.10.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
09.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
05.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
08.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT03.01.2007
BE03.01.2007
CH03.01.2007
CY03.01.2007
DK03.01.2007
LI03.01.2007
NL03.01.2007
TR03.01.2007
GR04.04.2007
PT04.06.2007
IE27.09.2007
LU27.09.2007
MC30.09.2007
[2013/37]
Former [2009/42]AT03.01.2007
BE03.01.2007
CH03.01.2007
CY03.01.2007
DK03.01.2007
LI03.01.2007
NL03.01.2007
TR03.01.2007
GR04.04.2007
PT04.06.2007
IE27.09.2007
LU27.09.2007
MC30.09.2007
Former [2009/37]AT03.01.2007
BE03.01.2007
CH03.01.2007
CY03.01.2007
DK03.01.2007
LI03.01.2007
NL03.01.2007
GR04.04.2007
PT04.06.2007
IE27.09.2007
LU27.09.2007
MC30.09.2007
Former [2009/33]AT03.01.2007
BE03.01.2007
CH03.01.2007
CY03.01.2007
DK03.01.2007
LI03.01.2007
NL03.01.2007
GR04.04.2007
PT04.06.2007
IE27.09.2007
MC30.09.2007
Former [2008/45]AT03.01.2007
BE03.01.2007
CH03.01.2007
DK03.01.2007
LI03.01.2007
NL03.01.2007
GR04.04.2007
PT04.06.2007
IE27.09.2007
MC30.09.2007
Former [2008/22]AT03.01.2007
BE03.01.2007
CH03.01.2007
DK03.01.2007
LI03.01.2007
NL03.01.2007
GR04.04.2007
PT04.06.2007
MC30.09.2007
Former [2008/20]AT03.01.2007
BE03.01.2007
CH03.01.2007
DK03.01.2007
LI03.01.2007
NL03.01.2007
GR04.04.2007
PT04.06.2007
Former [2008/01]AT03.01.2007
BE03.01.2007
CH03.01.2007
DK03.01.2007
LI03.01.2007
NL03.01.2007
PT04.06.2007
Former [2007/46]AT03.01.2007
CH03.01.2007
DK03.01.2007
LI03.01.2007
NL03.01.2007
PT04.06.2007
Former [2007/40]CH03.01.2007
LI03.01.2007
NL03.01.2007
PT04.06.2007
Former [2007/37]CH03.01.2007
LI03.01.2007
PT04.06.2007
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9941934  (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [A] 1,24 * abstract * * page 2, line 3 - page 2, line 30 *;
 [A]EP1035649  (PIONEER CORP [JP]) [A] 1,24 * column 4, line 11 - column 4, line 33 *