Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1318895

EP1318895 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PRETENSIONING REMOTELY INSTALLED CLAMPS AND FLANGES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  08.08.2008
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.08.2008Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 10.09.2008  [2008/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Russell, Larry R.
3607 Gramercy
Houston, TX 77025-1320 / US
[2003/25]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2003/25]
Representative(s)Jones, Keith William , et al
Murgitroyd & Company
Scotland House
165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2005/21]Jones, Keith William , et al
Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
Former [2003/25]Buckley, Guy Julian , et al
Castles, 1 King Street
Bakewell, Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB
Application number, filing date01973662.823.08.2001
[2003/25]
WO2001US41855
Priority number, dateUS2000064865225.08.2000         Original published format: US 648652
[2003/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0216084
Date:28.02.2002
Language:EN
[2002/09]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1318895
Date:18.06.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.02.2002
[2003/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US28.02.2002
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.04.2006
ClassificationInternational:B25B29/02, B23P19/06, F16B31/04
[2006/23]
Former International [2003/25]B25B23/14
Designated contracting statesFR,   GB,   IT [2004/22]
Former [2003/25]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM VORSPANNEN VON AUF DISTANZ EINGEBAUTEN SPANNVORRICHTUNGEN UND FLAUSCHEN[2003/25]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PRETENSIONING REMOTELY INSTALLED CLAMPS AND FLANGES[2003/25]
French:PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE PRECONTRAINTE DE COLLIERS DE SERRAGE ET DE BRIDES INSTALLEES A DISTANCE[2003/25]
Entry into regional phase05.03.2003National basic fee paid 
05.03.2003Search fee paid 
05.03.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
05.03.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.02.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
05.03.2003Examination requested  [2003/25]
04.03.2008Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2008/37]
22.04.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2008/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
19.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
08.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
07.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200707   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XA]DE1922430  (OESTERWIND DIETER) [X] 23 * the whole document * [A] 1-22,24-31;
 [A]US4520446  (SATO YOSHINORI [JP]) [A] 23 * abstract *;
 [A]SU1101342  ;
 [A]SU969510  ;
 [A]SU1523761
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1985, no. 07, Database accession no. 1985-042941, XP002377064 & SU1101342 A 19840707 (VOLGODON ATOMMASH) [A] 1-31 * abstract *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1983, no. 36, Database accession no. 1983-757016, XP002377065 & SU969510 A 19821105 (MOCHIDA PHARM CO LTD) [A] 1-31 * abstract *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1990, no. 37, Database accession no. 1990-280754, XP002377066 & SU1523761 A 19891123 (FEDOROV O I) [A] 1,22,24,30 * abstract *
International search[Y]US2888292  (SCHOESSOW EARL E);
 [Y]JPS54121305  (HITACHI LTD);
 [Y]US4010669  (KLOREN ULRICH);
 [Y]JPH11198056  (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD);
 [Y]US6105471  (TAKAYUKI KAWANO [JP], et al)