Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1283732

EP1283732 - BATTERY RECHARGE MANAGEMENT FOR AN IMPLANTABLE MEDICAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.01.2010
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2012Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 21.11.2012  [2012/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Medtronic, Inc.
710 Medtronic Parkway
Minneapolis, MN 55432-5604 / US
[N/P]
Former [2009/09]For all designated states
MEDTRONIC, INC.
710 Medtronic Parkway
Minneapolis MN 55432-5604 / US
Former [2004/34]For all designated states
Medtronic, Inc.
710 Medtronic Parkway
Minneapolis, Minnesota 55432-5604 / US
Former [2003/08]For all designated states
Medtronic, Inc.
710 Medtronic Parkway Northeast
Minneapolis, MN 55432 / US
Inventor(s)01 / TORGERSON, Nathan, A.
13618 Bittersweet Street Northwest
Andover, MN 55304 / US
02 / RIEKELS, James, E.
8615 Hopewood Lane North
New Hope, MN 55427 / US
 [2003/08]
Representative(s)Hughes, Andrea Michelle
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/08]Hughes, Andrea Michelle
Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street
London EC4V 4EL / GB
Application number, filing date01973774.118.01.2001
[2003/08]
WO2001US01694
Priority number, dateUS2000056222128.04.2000         Original published format: US 562221
[2003/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0183029
Date:08.11.2001
Language:EN
[2001/45]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1283732
Date:19.02.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.11.2001
[2003/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1283732
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.11.2001
ClassificationInternational:A61N1/378
[2003/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/08]
TitleGerman:BATTERIELADEREGELUNG FÜR EIN IMPLANTIERBARES GERÄT[2003/08]
English:BATTERY RECHARGE MANAGEMENT FOR AN IMPLANTABLE MEDICAL DEVICE[2003/08]
French:GESTION DE LA RECHARGE D'UNE BATTERIE D'UN DISPOSITIF MEDICAL IMPLANTABLE[2003/08]
Entry into regional phase06.11.2002National basic fee paid 
06.11.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
06.11.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.10.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
06.11.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.11.2002Examination requested  [2003/08]
12.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.12.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
09.03.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.07.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.10.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.05.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.09.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.03.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.07.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.08.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.12.2008Fee for grant paid
18.12.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP05016794.9  / EP1598092
Opposition(s)26.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/05]
Request for further processing for:09.03.2005Request for further processing filed
09.03.2005Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
24.03.2005Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
30.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
07.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
09.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
05.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
08.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
07.01.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT25.02.2009
BE25.02.2009
CY25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IT25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
TR25.02.2009
SE25.05.2009
GR26.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
[2012/47]
Former [2012/37]AT25.02.2009
BE25.02.2009
CY25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IT25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
SE25.05.2009
GR26.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
Former [2011/14]AT25.02.2009
BE25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IT25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
SE25.05.2009
GR26.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
Former [2010/47]AT25.02.2009
BE25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
SE25.05.2009
GR26.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
Former [2009/49]AT25.02.2009
BE25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
SE25.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
Former [2009/46]AT25.02.2009
BE25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
SE25.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
Former [2009/43]AT25.02.2009
BE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
SE25.05.2009
Former [2009/40]AT25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
SE25.05.2009
Former [2009/37]FI25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
SE25.05.2009
Former [2009/34]NL25.02.2009
Cited inInternational search[XA]US5733313  (BARRERAS SR FRANCISCO JOSE [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6-11,14-22,25-30,33-37 * column 8, line 33 - column 9, line 18 * [A] 4,5,12,13,23,24,31,32;
 [XA]WO9837926  (MANN ALFRED E FOUND SCIENT RES [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6,8-12,14-16,18-21,24,25,27-31,33-35 * page 9, line 33 - page 10, line 19 * * page 13, line 45 - page 14, line 8 * [A] 3,12,17,22,32,36;
 [XA]US5876425  (GORD JOHN C [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6,8,9,12-15,17,20,21,25,27,28,31-35 * column 3, line 60 - column 4, line 14 * * column 6, lines 19-59 * [A] 3,11,16,18,22,30,36;
 [XA]WO9811942  (SULZER INTERMEDICS INC [US]) [X] 1-3,6,8,9,11,14-22,25,27,28,30,33-35 * page 5, lines 2-31 * [A] 4,5,12,13,23,24,29,31,32,36
by applicantUS5807397
 US5991665
 US5752977