Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1319146

EP1319146 - BLOCK FOR FIRE AND SMOKE ALONG A BARRIER PENETRATING MEMBER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  09.09.2005
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.09.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 26.10.2005  [2005/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Royal Group Technologies Limited
1 Royal Gate Boulevard
Woodbridge, Ontario L4L 8Z7 / CA
[2003/25]
Inventor(s)01 / SAKNO, Michael, Peter
2 Muriel Avenue
Toronto, Ontario M4J 2X8 / CA
02 / MILANI, Walter
79 Canning Crescent
Cambridge, Ontario N1T 1X2 / CA
 [2003/25]
Representative(s)Lorenz, Werner
Lorenz & Kollegen
Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Alte Ulmer Strasse 2
89522 Heidenheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/25]Lorenz, Werner, Dr.-Ing.
Lorenz & Kollegen, Alte Ulmer Strasse 2
89522 Heidenheim / DE
Application number, filing date01973885.519.09.2001
[2003/25]
WO2001CA01318
Priority number, dateCA2000231987619.09.2000         Original published format: CA 2319876
[2003/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0225158
Date:28.03.2002
Language:EN
[2002/12]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1319146
Date:18.06.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.03.2002
[2003/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.06.2002
ClassificationInternational:F16L5/04
[2003/25]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/25]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:SPERRE FÜR FEUER UND RAUCH ENTLANG EINEM DURCHDRINGUNGSBAUTEIL[2003/25]
English:BLOCK FOR FIRE AND SMOKE ALONG A BARRIER PENETRATING MEMBER[2003/25]
French:DISPOSITIF ARRETANT LE FEU ET LA FUMEE DESTINE A ETRE UTILISE AVEC UN ELEMENT TRAVERSANT UNE PAROI[2003/25]
Entry into regional phase18.03.2003National basic fee paid 
18.03.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
18.03.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.05.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
18.03.2003Examination requested  [2003/25]
06.10.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.04.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/43]
25.05.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2005/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200404   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0681134  (HAUFF WERNER [DE]) [A] 1-3,6 * figures 1-3 *;
 [A]WO9607043  (QUINCEY STEVEN JOHN [GB], et al) [A] 1-3,6 * figure - *