Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1319267

EP1319267 - HILBERT SAMPLER/FILTER CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2003/25]COMPLEX VALUED DELTA SIGMA PHASE LOCKED LOOP DEMODULATOR
[2012/24]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.09.2013
Database last updated on 13.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip13.09.2013No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 16.10.2013  [2013/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kaben Research Inc.
P.O. Box 730
Osgoode, Ontario K0A 2W0 / CA
[2004/52]
Former [2003/25]For all designated states
Riley, Tom
3356 Leroy Street
Osgoode, Ontario KOA 2WO / CA
Inventor(s)01 / Riley, Tom
3356 Leroy Street
Osgoode, Ontario K0A 2WO / CA
 [2004/52]
Former [2003/25]01 / see applicant
...
Representative(s)Maillet, Alain
Cabinet Le Guen Maillet
5, place Newquay
B.P. 70250
35802 Dinard Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2012/45]Maillet, Alain
Cabinet Le Guen Maillet 5, place Newquay B.P. 70250
35802 Dinard Cedex / FR
Former [2004/52]Maillet, Alain
Cabinet le Guen & Maillet, 5, Place Newquay, B.P. 70250
35802 Dinard Cedex / FR
Former [2003/25]Maillet, Alain
SCP Le Guen & Maillet, 5, Place Newquay, B.P. 70250
35802 Dinard Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date01973898.819.09.2001
[2003/25]
WO2001CA01338
Priority number, dateUS20000233660P19.09.2000         Original published format: US 233660 P
US2000066478819.09.2000         Original published format: US 664788
[2003/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0225803
Date:28.03.2002
Language:EN
[2002/12]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1319267
Date:18.06.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.03.2002
[2003/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1319267
Date:07.11.2012
Language:EN
[2012/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.10.2002
ClassificationInternational:H03D7/16, H03D3/00
[2012/24]
Former International [2003/25]H03D3/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/20]
Former [2003/25]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:HILBERT ABTAST- UND FILTERSCHALTUNG[2012/25]
English:HILBERT SAMPLER/FILTER CIRCUIT[2012/25]
French:CIRCUIT DE HILBERT POUR ÉCHANTILLONNEUR/FILTRE[2012/25]
Former [2003/25]KOMPLEXWERTIGER DELTA-SIGMA PHASENREGELSCHLEIFEN DEMODULATOR
Former [2003/25]COMPLEX VALUED DELTA SIGMA PHASE LOCKED LOOP DEMODULATOR
Former [2003/25]DEMODULATEUR DELTA SIGMA A BOUCLE A VERROUILLAGE DE PHASES A VALEUR COMPLEXE
Entry into regional phase03.04.2003National basic fee paid 
03.04.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
03.04.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.04.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
03.04.2003Examination requested  [2003/25]
27.11.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.04.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.11.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.04.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.05.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.08.2012Fee for grant paid
30.08.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.11.2007
Opposition(s)08.08.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
09.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
16.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
18.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
22.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
12.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
17.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
06.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
16.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 11
21.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 12
Cited inInternational search[A]US5400366  (IWAMATSU TAKANORI [JP]) [A] 1,18,26 * column 14, line 9 - column 16, line 58; figures 1,3 *;
 [A]US4947409  (RAITH ALEX K [SE], et al) [A] 1,18,26 * column 4, line 27 - line 64 *;
 [A]US5533071  (KRISHNAMURTHY GOPALAN [US], et al) [A] 5,27 * figures 4,12 *;
 [A]EP0519891  (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US])