Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1320795

EP1320795 - SOFTWARE CODE SIGNING SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  24.07.2009
Database last updated on 15.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.07.2009Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 26.08.2009  [2009/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Research In Motion Limited
295 Phillip Street
Waterloo, ON N2L 3W8 / CA
[N/P]
Former [2005/46]For all designated states
Research In Motion Limited
295 Phillip Street
Waterloo, Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA
Former [2003/26]For all designated states
Research In Motion Limited
295 Phillip Street
Waterloo, Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / YACH, David, P.
254 Castlefield Avenue
Waterloo, Ontario N2K 2N1 / CA
02 / BROWN, Michael, S.
7 Danube Street
Heidelberg, Ontario N0B 1Y0 / CA
03 / LITTLE, Herbert, A.
504 Old Oak Place
Waterloo, Ontario N2T 2V8 / CA
 [2003/26]
Representative(s)Dagg, Nicola Helen
Allen & Overy LLP One Bishops Square
London E1 6AO / GB
[2008/47]
Former [2007/20]Dagg, Nicola Helen , et al
Allen & Overy LLP One Bishops Square
London E1 6AO / GB
Former [2007/17]Dagg, Nicola Helen
Allen & Overy LLP One Bishops Square
London E1 6AO / GB
Former [2004/15]Jones Day
Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law, Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
Former [2003/26]Ricker, Mathias, Dr.
Jones Day, Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law, Patentanwälte, Prinzregentenstrasse 56
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date01973901.020.09.2001
[2003/26]
WO2001CA01344
Priority number, dateUS20000234152P21.09.2000         Original published format: US 234152 P
US20000235354P26.09.2000         Original published format: US 235354 P
US20010270663P20.02.2001         Original published format: US 270663 P
[2003/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0225409
Date:28.03.2002
Language:EN
[2002/12]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1320795
Date:25.06.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.03.2002
[2003/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1320795
Date:16.11.2005
Language:EN
[2005/46]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP1320795
Date:26.08.2009
Language:EN
[2009/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.06.2002
ClassificationInternational:G06F1/00
[2003/26]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/26]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM UNTERSCHREIBEN EINES SOFTWARE-KODES[2003/26]
English:SOFTWARE CODE SIGNING SYSTEM AND METHOD[2003/26]
French:SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE SIGNATURE PAR CODE[2003/26]
Entry into regional phase15.04.2003National basic fee paid 
15.04.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
15.04.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.04.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
15.04.2003Examination requested  [2003/26]
24.06.2003Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.09.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05)
28.12.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.05.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.09.2005Fee for grant paid
09.09.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP05024661.0  / EP1626324
EP05024662.8  / EP1626325
EP05024663.6  / EP1626326
EP10183655.9  / EP2284644
EP10183997.5  / EP2278429
EP10185538.5   Application deemed to be withdrawn  : 03.11.2010
EP10186194.6  / EP2306259
EP10186296.9  / EP2306260
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  11.08.2006   
Giesecke & Devrient GmbH
Prinzregentenstrasse 159
81677 München / DE
 [2006/38]
26.09.2006Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
07.05.2007Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
25.11.2008Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
25.11.2008Date of oral proceedings
22.12.2008Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
22.12.2008Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
14.04.2009Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
10.07.2009Fee for printing new specification paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
23.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
14.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT16.11.2005
BE16.11.2005
CH16.11.2005
CY16.11.2005
FI16.11.2005
LI16.11.2005
NL16.11.2005
TR16.11.2005
DK16.02.2006
GR16.02.2006
SE16.02.2006
PT17.04.2006
IE20.09.2006
LU20.09.2006
MC30.09.2006
[2009/02]
Former [2008/37]AT16.11.2005
BE16.11.2005
CH16.11.2005
FI16.11.2005
LI16.11.2005
NL16.11.2005
TR16.11.2005
DK16.02.2006
GR16.02.2006
SE16.02.2006
PT17.04.2006
IE20.09.2006
LU20.09.2006
MC30.09.2006
Former [2007/45]AT16.11.2005
BE16.11.2005
CH16.11.2005
FI16.11.2005
LI16.11.2005
NL16.11.2005
DK16.02.2006
GR16.02.2006
SE16.02.2006
PT17.04.2006
IE20.09.2006
MC30.09.2006
Former [2007/42]AT16.11.2005
BE16.11.2005
CH16.11.2005
FI16.11.2005
IT16.11.2005
LI16.11.2005
NL16.11.2005
DK16.02.2006
GR16.02.2006
SE16.02.2006
PT17.04.2006
IE20.09.2006
MC30.09.2006
Former [2007/37]AT16.11.2005
BE16.11.2005
CH16.11.2005
FI16.11.2005
IT16.11.2005
LI16.11.2005
NL16.11.2005
DK16.02.2006
GR16.02.2006
SE16.02.2006
PT17.04.2006
MC30.09.2006
Former [2006/48]AT16.11.2005
BE16.11.2005
CH16.11.2005
FI16.11.2005
LI16.11.2005
NL16.11.2005
DK16.02.2006
GR16.02.2006
SE16.02.2006
PT17.04.2006
Former [2006/38]AT16.11.2005
BE16.11.2005
CH16.11.2005
FI16.11.2005
LI16.11.2005
NL16.11.2005
DK16.02.2006
GR16.02.2006
SE16.02.2006
Former [2006/36]AT16.11.2005
BE16.11.2005
CH16.11.2005
FI16.11.2005
LI16.11.2005
NL16.11.2005
DK16.02.2006
SE16.02.2006
Former [2006/34]AT16.11.2005
CH16.11.2005
FI16.11.2005
LI16.11.2005
NL16.11.2005
DK16.02.2006
SE16.02.2006
Former [2006/33]CH16.11.2005
FI16.11.2005
LI16.11.2005
NL16.11.2005
SE16.02.2006
Former [2006/27]FI16.11.2005
NL16.11.2005
SE16.02.2006
Former [2006/23]FI16.11.2005
NL16.11.2005
Cited inInternational search[XY]WO9905600  (APPLE COMPUTER [US]) [X] 1,2,6,7,12-15,21,26,27,29,32 * abstract * * page 6, line 1 - line 15 * * page 19, line 4 - line 14 * * page 20, line 19 - page 21, line 4 * * page 24, line 6 - line 23 * * page 25, line 23 - line 26 * [Y] 11,18,19,26,31,38-56;
 [XY]EP0930793  (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [X] 1,3-6,8-10,20,22-24,28-33,36,37 * abstract * * page 15, line 54 - page 16, line 5 * * page 16, line 32 - line 44 * [Y] 34,35;
 [PY]US6157721  (SHEAR VICTOR H [US], et al) [PY] 11,18,19,26,31,34,35,38-56 * column A; figures 2,3,5,8,14 * * column 2, line 27 - line 65 * * column 11, line 7 - line 19 * * column 15, line 23 - line 41 *;
 [Y]AU3681597  (INTERTRUST TECH CORP);
 [A]US5978484  (APPERSON NORMAN [US], et al) [A] 11,18,19,31,34,35 * column A; figure 5 * * column 2, line 41 - line 60 * * column 3, line 44 - line 57 * * column 8, line 17 - line 25 *
Opposition   - ""Additional interindustry commands and security attributes"", ISO/IEC FCD 7816-9 PART 9
    - ""Security related interindustry commands"", ISO/IEC FDIS 7816-8 PART 8
    - ""Interindustry commands for interchange"", ISO/IEC 7816-4 PART 4, pages 12 - 16
    - "pp. 197-203, 261-272, 740, 795-797", RANKL, WOLFGANG UND EFFING, WOLFGANG, Handbuch der Chipkarten, 3. AUFLAGE, 1999, ISBN 3-446-21115-2
    - ""Interindustry commands for interchange"", ISO/IEC 7816-4 PART 4, XP002269400