Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1319312

EP1319312 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING RECORDED ANNOUNCEMENTS AND INTERACTIVE VOICE RESPONSES IN PACKET NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.02.2005
Database last updated on 12.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip27.06.2008Change - applicantpublished on 30.07.2008  [2008/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/31]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Former [2004/17]For all designated states
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Former [2003/25]For all designated states
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80339 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / FRANZ, Mathias
Mollstrasse 13
10178 Berlin / DE
02 / JUGEL, Alfred
Johann-Sebastian-Bach-Strasse 55
82538 Geretsried / DE
03 / PULVERER, Klaus
Fallstrasse 24
81369 München / DE
04 / LÖBIG, Norbert
Im Erlich 79
64291 Darmstadt / DE
05 / KLEINER, Patrick
Bauweberstrasse 34
81476 München / DE
 [2003/25]
Application number, filing date01974042.214.09.2001
[2003/25]
WO2001DE03544
Priority number, dateDE200014712922.09.2000         Original published format: DE 10047129
[2003/25]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0225958
Date:28.03.2002
Language:DE
[2002/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1319312
Date:18.06.2003
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.03.2002
[2003/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1319312
Date:21.04.2004
Language:DE
[2004/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.03.2002
ClassificationInternational:H04Q3/00, H04Q3/545
[2003/25]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/17]
Former [2003/25]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG VON ANSAGEN UND DIALOGEN IN PAKETNETZEN[2003/25]
English:METHOD FOR CONTROLLING RECORDED ANNOUNCEMENTS AND INTERACTIVE VOICE RESPONSES IN PACKET NETWORKS[2003/25]
French:PROCEDE DE COMMANDE D'ANNONCES ET DE DIALOGUES DANS DES RESEAUX DE PAQUETS[2003/25]
Entry into regional phase22.08.2002National basic fee paid 
22.08.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
22.08.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.04.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
22.08.2002Examination requested  [2003/25]
05.11.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.02.2004Fee for grant paid
16.02.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.01.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9929095  (BELL COMMUNICATIONS RES [US]) [A] 1-13 * page 3, line 27 - page 4, line 27 * * page 6, line 17 - line 27 * * figure 4 *;
 [A]EP0282187  (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * claims 1-8 *;
 [A]US6014437  (ACKER DEBORAH LYNN [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * column 1, line 49 - column 2, line 37 * * column 10, line 31 - line 48 * * claims 1-7 * * figure 5 *