Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1320520

EP1320520 - SULFONYLGUANIDINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.03.2012
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.09.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 30.10.2013  [2013/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Grünenthal GmbH
Zieglerstrasse 6
52078 Aachen / DE
[2003/26]
Inventor(s)01 / GERLACH, Matthias
Pfarrgasse 1
63636 Brachttal / DE
02 / URAGG, Heinz
Walther-Dobbelmannstr. 70c
52223 Stolberg / DE
03 / HAURAND, Michael
Fuchspfad 18
52078 Aachen / DE
04 / PÜTZ, Claudia, Katharina
Tivolistr. 32
52349 Düren / DE
05 / MAUL, Corinna
Oppenhofallee 83-85
52066 Aachen / DE
06 / CHIZH, Boris
20 Royston Road
Whittlesford, Cambridge CB2 4NW / GB
 [2011/05]
Former [2003/33]01 / GERLACH, Matthias
Pfarrgasse 1
63636 Brachttal / DE
02 / URAGG, Heinz
Walther-Dobbelmannstr. 70c
52223 Stolberg / DE
03 / HAURAND, Michael
Fuchspfad 18
52078 Aachen / DE
04 / PÜTZ, Claudia, Katharina
Holzstr. 15
52349 Düren / DE
05 / MAUL, Corinna
Oppenhofallee 83-85
52066 Aachen / DE
06 / CHIZH, Boris
20 Royston Road
Whittlesford, Cambridge CB2 4NW / GB
Former [2003/26]01 / GERLACH, Matthias
Pfarrgasse 1
63636 Brachttal / DE
02 / URAGG, Heinz
Walther-Dobbelmannstr. 70c
52223 Stolberg / DE
03 / HAURAND, Michael
Fuchspfad 18
52078 Aachen / DE
04 / PÜTZ, Claudia, Katharina
Holzstr. 15
52349 Düren / DE
05 / MAUL, Corinna
Oppenhofallee 83-85
52066 Aachen / DE
06 / CHIZH, Boris
Melanieweg 23
52072 Aachen / DE
Application number, filing date01974309.501.10.2001
[2003/26]
WO2001EP11245
Priority number, dateDE200014871630.09.2000         Original published format: DE 10048716
DE200111206812.03.2001         Original published format: DE 10112068
[2003/26]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0230881
Date:18.04.2002
Language:DE
[2002/16]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1320520
Date:25.06.2003
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.04.2002
[2003/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1320520
Date:11.05.2011
Language:DE
[2011/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.04.2002
ClassificationInternational:C07C311/64, A61K31/18
[2003/26]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/26]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LT22.03.2003
LV22.03.2003
MKNot yet paid
RO22.03.2003
SI22.03.2003
TitleGerman:SULFONYLGUANIDINE[2003/26]
English:SULFONYLGUANIDINE[2003/26]
French:SULFONYLGUANIDINES[2003/26]
Entry into regional phase22.03.2003National basic fee paid 
22.03.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
22.03.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.04.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
22.03.2003Examination requested  [2003/26]
25.05.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.12.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.05.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.09.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.04.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.09.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.09.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.12.2010Fee for grant paid
21.12.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.02.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
14.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
12.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
12.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
12.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
13.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
11.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY11.05.2011
DK11.05.2011
FI11.05.2011
IE11.05.2011
IT11.05.2011
NL11.05.2011
SE11.05.2011
TR11.05.2011
GR12.08.2011
ES22.08.2011
PT12.09.2011
AT01.10.2011
GB01.10.2011
LU01.10.2011
BE31.10.2011
CH31.10.2011
LI31.10.2011
MC31.10.2011
FR02.11.2011
[2013/44]
Former [2013/25]CY11.05.2011
DK11.05.2011
FI11.05.2011
IE11.05.2011
IT11.05.2011
NL11.05.2011
SE11.05.2011
GR12.08.2011
ES22.08.2011
PT12.09.2011
AT01.10.2011
GB01.10.2011
LU01.10.2011
BE31.10.2011
CH31.10.2011
LI31.10.2011
MC31.10.2011
FR02.11.2011
Former [2013/07]CY11.05.2011
DK11.05.2011
FI11.05.2011
IE11.05.2011
IT11.05.2011
NL11.05.2011
SE11.05.2011
GR12.08.2011
ES22.08.2011
PT12.09.2011
AT01.10.2011
GB01.10.2011
BE31.10.2011
CH31.10.2011
LI31.10.2011
MC31.10.2011
FR02.11.2011
Former [2012/37]CY11.05.2011
DK11.05.2011
FI11.05.2011
IE11.05.2011
IT11.05.2011
NL11.05.2011
SE11.05.2011
GR12.08.2011
ES22.08.2011
PT12.09.2011
GB01.10.2011
BE31.10.2011
CH31.10.2011
LI31.10.2011
MC31.10.2011
FR02.11.2011
Former [2012/36]CY11.05.2011
DK11.05.2011
FI11.05.2011
IE11.05.2011
IT11.05.2011
NL11.05.2011
SE11.05.2011
GR12.08.2011
ES22.08.2011
PT12.09.2011
GB01.10.2011
BE31.10.2011
CH31.10.2011
LI31.10.2011
MC31.10.2011
Former [2012/33]CY11.05.2011
DK11.05.2011
FI11.05.2011
IE11.05.2011
IT11.05.2011
NL11.05.2011
SE11.05.2011
GR12.08.2011
ES22.08.2011
PT12.09.2011
BE31.10.2011
CH31.10.2011
LI31.10.2011
MC31.10.2011
Former [2012/25]CY11.05.2011
DK11.05.2011
FI11.05.2011
IE11.05.2011
IT11.05.2011
NL11.05.2011
SE11.05.2011
GR12.08.2011
ES22.08.2011
PT12.09.2011
MC31.10.2011
Former [2012/23]CY11.05.2011
DK11.05.2011
FI11.05.2011
IE11.05.2011
IT11.05.2011
NL11.05.2011
SE11.05.2011
GR12.08.2011
ES22.08.2011
PT12.09.2011
Former [2012/10]CY11.05.2011
DK11.05.2011
FI11.05.2011
IE11.05.2011
NL11.05.2011
SE11.05.2011
GR12.08.2011
ES22.08.2011
PT12.09.2011
Former [2012/08]CY11.05.2011
FI11.05.2011
IE11.05.2011
NL11.05.2011
SE11.05.2011
GR12.08.2011
ES22.08.2011
PT12.09.2011
Former [2012/02]CY11.05.2011
FI11.05.2011
NL11.05.2011
SE11.05.2011
GR12.08.2011
ES22.08.2011
PT12.09.2011
Former [2011/49]CY11.05.2011
FI11.05.2011
SE11.05.2011
GR12.08.2011
ES22.08.2011
PT12.09.2011
Former [2011/47]PT12.09.2011
Cited inInternational searchWO9834113  [ ] (TREGA BIOSCIENCES INC [US]);
 JPH069541  [ ] (SUMITOMO PHARMA);
 [X]US4900740  (MULLER GEORGE W [US], et al) [X] 12-14 * Tabelle 1, Verbindung 25 *;
 [X]EP0195673  (SMITHKLINE BECKMAN CORP [US]) [X] 12,13,17 * page 14, line 1 - line 29 *;
 [A]WO9920599  (CAMBRIDGE NEUROSCIENCE INC [US]) [A] 1 * page 14, line 2 - line 5; example -; claim - *;
 [A]WO0015611  (WARNER LAMBERT CO [US], et al) [A] 1 * page 15, line 10 - page 18, line 9; claim - *
 [X]  - YU. A. BASKAKOV ET AL., "Dervatives of hydroxy phenylamines as new herbicides", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19590425), vol. 53, no. 8, Database accession no. 7062i, XP002185314 [X] 12,13,17 * RN 101281-83-8, 100885-07-2, 100715-41-1 *
    [] - KHIM, NAUKA I PROM., (1958), vol. 3, pages 683 - 4,
 [X]  - A. BARHON ET AL., "N4-acylated derivatives of sulfaguanidine and of its N1'-acylated derivatives", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19590425), vol. 53, no. 8, Database accession no. 7062f, XP002185315 [X] 12,13,17 * RN 102312-16-3, 101285-79-4 *
    [] - ANN. SCI. UNIV. BESANÇON, CHIM. [2], NO. 1, 16 PP. (1955),
 [X]  - DATABASE CROSSFIRE BEILSTEIN, Beilstein Institut zur Förderung der Chemischen Wissenschaften, Frankfurt am Main, DE, Database accession no. BRN 2899488, 2951283, 2903865, XP002185322 [X] 12,13,16
    [] - SUCHORUTSCHKIN ET AL., J. GEN. CHEM. USSR (ENGL. TRANSL.), (1964), vol. 34, page 1333,
 [X]  - DATABASE CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 129:175973, XP002185323 [X] 12-14,17 * RN 211048-19-0, RN 211048-11-2 *
 [X]  - KIMURA, YUMIKO ET AL., "Preparation of .alpha.-guanidic acid derivatives", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19941010), vol. 121, no. 15, Database accession no. 180208, XP002185316 [X] 12,13,17 * RN 157717-27-6, 157717-25-4, *
 [X]  - KOZAKIEWICZ, IRENA, "Synthesis N-(2,4-dichloro-5-methylbenzenesulfonyl)-S-methylisothiourea and its use for preparation of some novel guanidine derivatives", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19930719), vol. 119, no. 3, Database accession no. 27802, XP002185317 [X] 12,13,17 * RN 148274-55-9, 148274-54-8 *
    [] - ANN. ACAD. MED. GEDANENSIS, (1992), vol. 22, pages 83 - 8,
 [X]  - EGGLESTON, IAN M. ET AL., "The acid lability of some arginine side-chain sbstitutents related to the 2,2,5,7,8-pentamethylchroman-6-sulfonyl(Pmc) protecting group", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19911209), vol. 115, no. 23, Database accession no. 256577, XP002185318 [X] 12,13,17 * RN 137361-88-7, 137361-87-6, 137361-86-5, 137361-85-4, 137361-84-3, 137361-83-2 *
    [] - J. CHEM. RES., SYNOP, (1991), no. 10, pages 286 - 7,
 [X]  - FISCHER, E. ET AL., "Synthesis and properties of l.lambda4.2,4,6-thiatriazine-1-oxides. Structure of the hydrolysis product of 1-arenesulfonylimino-l.lambda4.,2,4,6-thiatriazines", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19840910), vol. 101, no. 11, Database accession no. 90880, XP002185319 [X] 12,13,17 * RN 90748-81-5 *
    [] - TETRAHEDRON, (1984), vol. 40, no. 2, pages 385 - 90,
 [X]  - DATABASE CROSSFIRE BEILSTEIN, Beilstein Institut zur Förderung der Chemischen Wissenschaften, Frankfurt am Main, DE, Database accession no. BRN 4170152, 867787, XP002185324 [X] 12-14,16
    [] - SUGIURA ET AL., YAKUGAKU ZASSHI, (1970), vol. 90, page 711, 714,
 [X]  - ROBERT G. GALBREATH ET AL., "Synthesis of 2-chlorophenothiazine via a Smiles rearrangement", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19591110), vol. 53, no. 21, Database accession no. 21887h, XP002185320 [X] 12,13,17 * RN 112441-43-7 *
    [] - J. ORG. CHEM., (1958), vol. 23, pages 1804 - 6,
 [X]  - ALFREDA DANSI ET AL., "Reactions of N1-(.beta.-phenylethyl)biguanide", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19610306), vol. 55, no. 5, Database accession no. 4396e, XP002185321 [X] 12,13,17 * RN 109446-01-7 *
    [] - GAZZ. CHIM. ITAL., (1959), vol. 89, pages 1681 - 6,
by applicant   - J.S. BRYANS; D.J. WUSTROW, "3-Substituted GABA Analogs with Central Nervous System Activity: A Review", MED. RES. REV., (1999), pages 149 - 177,
    - KIM, S. H.; CHUNG, J. M., "An experimental model for peripheral mononeuropathy produced by segmental spinal nerve ligation in the rat.", PAIN, (1992), vol. 50, pages 355 - 363,
    - POGATZKI, E. M.; ZAHN, P. K.; BRENNAN, T. J., "Lumbar catheterization of the subarachnoid space with a 32-gauge polyurethane catheter in the rat.", EUR. J. PAIN, (2000), vol. 4, pages 111 - 113,
    - D. DUBUISSON, PAIN, (1977), vol. 4, pages 161 - 174,
    - T.J. CODERRE ET AL., PAIN, (1993), vol. 52, pages 259 - 285,