Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1317199

EP1317199 - APPARATUS FOR PREPARING A COFFEE EXTRACT WITH A FINE-BUBBLE FROTH LAYER USING A LIQUID FLOW DECELERATING BARRIER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.05.2005
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.02.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, LU
published on 07.03.2007  [2007/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sara Lee/DE N.V.
Keulsekade 143
3532 AA Utrecht / NL
[2003/24]
Inventor(s)01 / BROUWER, Gustaaf, Frans
Hoefslag 48
NL-3862 KC Nijkerk / NL
 [2003/24]
Representative(s)Prins, Adrianus Willem , et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2003/24]Prins, Adrianus Willem , et al
Vereenigde, Nieuwe Parklaan 97
2587 BN Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date01975017.305.09.2001
[2003/24]
WO2001NL00655
Priority number, dateNL2000101610705.09.2000         Original published format: NL 1016107
[2003/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0219876
Date:14.03.2002
Language:EN
[2002/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1317199
Date:11.06.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.03.2002
[2003/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1317199
Date:14.07.2004
Language:EN
[2004/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.03.2002
ClassificationInternational:A47J31/46
[2003/24]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/24]
Extension statesAL04.04.2003
LT04.04.2003
LV04.04.2003
MK04.04.2003
RO04.04.2003
SI04.04.2003
TitleGerman:BRÜHGERÄT FÜR KAFFEE MIT EINER FEINPORIGEN SCHAUMSCHICHT, WOBEI DAS GERÄT EINE STRÖMUNGSBARRIERE HAT[2003/24]
English:APPARATUS FOR PREPARING A COFFEE EXTRACT WITH A FINE-BUBBLE FROTH LAYER USING A LIQUID FLOW DECELERATING BARRIER[2003/24]
French:APPAREIL POUR LA PREPARATION D'UN EXTRAIT DE CAFE AVEC UNE COUCHE MOUSSEUSE DE FINES BULLES CREEE PAR UNE BARRIERE DE DECELERATION DU DEBIT LIQUIDE[2003/24]
Entry into regional phase04.04.2003National basic fee paid 
04.04.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
04.04.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.04.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
04.04.2003Examination requested  [2003/24]
20.10.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.02.2004Fee for grant paid
27.02.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.04.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT14.07.2004
CH14.07.2004
CY14.07.2004
FI14.07.2004
LI14.07.2004
LU05.09.2004
IE06.09.2004
MC30.09.2004
GR14.10.2004
[2007/10]
Former [2005/46]AT14.07.2004
CH14.07.2004
FI14.07.2004
LI14.07.2004
IE06.09.2004
MC30.09.2004
GR14.10.2004
Former [2005/22]AT14.07.2004
CH14.07.2004
FI14.07.2004
LI14.07.2004
MC30.09.2004
GR14.10.2004
Former [2005/21]AT14.07.2004
CH14.07.2004
FI14.07.2004
LI14.07.2004
GR14.10.2004
Former [2005/18]AT14.07.2004
FI14.07.2004
GR14.10.2004
Former [2005/13]AT14.07.2004
FI14.07.2004
Former [2005/11]FI14.07.2004
Cited inInternational search[DA]EP0878158  (SARA LEE DE NV [NL]) [DA] 1 * column 5, lines 10-33 * * column 5, line 45 - column 6, line 11 * * column 9, lines 17-27; figures 1-9 *;
 [A]US5151199  (POULIN JEAN-MARC [CH], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0709131  (NESTLE SA [CH])
by applicantEP0878158