Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1255584

EP1255584 - COMBINATION STYLET AND STIFFENING SHEATH IN AN IMPLANTABLE TISSUE STIMULATING DEVICE, IN PARTICULAR IN A COCHLEAR IMPLANT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2002/46]COMBINATION STYLET AND STRAIGHTENING COATING FOR A COCHLEAR IMPLANT ELECTRODE ARRAY
[2009/50]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.03.2011
Database last updated on 15.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2012Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 21.11.2012  [2012/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cochlear Limited
14 Mars Road
Lane Cove, NSW 2066 / AU
[2002/46]
Inventor(s)01 / DADD, Fysh
14 Mars Road
Lane Cove, NSW 2066 / AU
02 / DARLEY, Ian
14 Mars Road
Lane Cove, NSW 2066 / AU
03 / GIBSON, Peter
14 Mars Road
Lane Cove, NSW 2066 / AU
04 / PARKER, John
14 Mars Road
Lane Cove, NSW 2066 / AU
05 / TREABA, Claudiu
14 Mars Road
Lane Cove, NSW 2066 / AU
 [2002/46]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/09]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Former [2002/46]Frederiksen, Jakob Pade
Plougmann & Vingtoft A/S Sundkrogsgade 9 P.O. Box 831
2100 Copenhagen O / DK
Application number, filing date01975835.828.09.2001
[2002/46]
WO2001AU01232
Priority number, dateAU2000PR0054104.10.2000         Original published format: AU PR054100
AU2000PR0080717.10.2000         Original published format: AU PR080700
AU2000PR0100525.10.2000         Original published format: AU PR100500
AU2000PR0177829.11.2000         Original published format: AU PR177800
[2002/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0228474
Date:11.04.2002
Language:EN
[2002/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1255584
Date:13.11.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.04.2002
[2002/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1255584
Date:19.05.2010
Language:EN
[2010/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AU11.04.2002
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.05.2009
ClassificationInternational:A61N1/05, A61F11/04
[2002/46]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/46]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:KOMBINATION AUS STYLET UND VERSTEIFUNGSHÜLLE IN EINER IMPLANTIERBAREN STIMULIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG , INSBESONDERS IN EINEM KOCHLEARIMPLANTAT[2009/52]
English:COMBINATION STYLET AND STIFFENING SHEATH IN AN IMPLANTABLE TISSUE STIMULATING DEVICE, IN PARTICULAR IN A COCHLEAR IMPLANT[2009/50]
French:COMBINAISON D' UN STYLET ET D'UN MANCHON DE REDRESSEMENT DANS UN APPAREIL DE STIMULATION IMPLANTABLE, EN PARTICULIER DANS UN IMPLANT COCHLEAIRE[2009/50]
Former [2002/46]KOMBINATION AUS SONDE UND RICHTBESCHICHTUNG FÜR EINE KOCHLEARIMPLANTATELEKTRODENANORDNUNG
Former [2002/46]COMBINATION STYLET AND STRAIGHTENING COATING FOR A COCHLEAR IMPLANT ELECTRODE ARRAY
Former [2002/46]STYLET DE COMBINAISON ET REVETEMENT DE DRESSAGE DESTINES A UNE RANGEE D'ELECTRODES D'UN IMPLANT COCHLEAIRE
Entry into regional phase12.06.2002National basic fee paid 
12.06.2002Search fee paid 
11.10.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
11.10.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.11.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU
11.10.2002Examination requested  [2002/50]
30.11.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.03.2010Fee for grant paid
31.03.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.02.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
14.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
06.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
14.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
13.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
11.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
16.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200505   M06   Fee paid on   06.12.2005
30.09.200909   M06   Fee paid on   16.02.2010
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT19.05.2010
BE19.05.2010
CY19.05.2010
DK19.05.2010
FI19.05.2010
IT19.05.2010
NL19.05.2010
SE19.05.2010
TR19.05.2010
GR20.08.2010
ES30.08.2010
PT20.09.2010
IE28.09.2010
LU28.09.2010
CH30.09.2010
FR30.09.2010
LI30.09.2010
MC30.09.2010
[2012/47]
Former [2012/44]AT19.05.2010
BE19.05.2010
CY19.05.2010
DK19.05.2010
FI19.05.2010
IT19.05.2010
NL19.05.2010
SE19.05.2010
GR20.08.2010
ES30.08.2010
PT20.09.2010
IE28.09.2010
LU28.09.2010
CH30.09.2010
FR30.09.2010
LI30.09.2010
MC30.09.2010
Former [2011/35]AT19.05.2010
BE19.05.2010
CY19.05.2010
DK19.05.2010
FI19.05.2010
IT19.05.2010
NL19.05.2010
SE19.05.2010
GR20.08.2010
ES30.08.2010
PT20.09.2010
IE28.09.2010
CH30.09.2010
FR30.09.2010
LI30.09.2010
MC30.09.2010
Former [2011/19]AT19.05.2010
BE19.05.2010
CY19.05.2010
DK19.05.2010
FI19.05.2010
IT19.05.2010
NL19.05.2010
SE19.05.2010
GR20.08.2010
ES30.08.2010
PT20.09.2010
MC30.09.2010
Former [2011/14]AT19.05.2010
BE19.05.2010
CY19.05.2010
DK19.05.2010
FI19.05.2010
IT19.05.2010
NL19.05.2010
SE19.05.2010
GR20.08.2010
ES30.08.2010
PT20.09.2010
Former [2011/08]AT19.05.2010
CY19.05.2010
DK19.05.2010
FI19.05.2010
NL19.05.2010
SE19.05.2010
GR20.08.2010
ES30.08.2010
PT20.09.2010
Former [2011/07]AT19.05.2010
CY19.05.2010
DK19.05.2010
FI19.05.2010
NL19.05.2010
SE19.05.2010
GR20.08.2010
ES30.08.2010
Former [2011/05]AT19.05.2010
CY19.05.2010
FI19.05.2010
SE19.05.2010
GR20.08.2010
ES30.08.2010
Former [2011/01]AT19.05.2010
FI19.05.2010
SE19.05.2010
GR20.08.2010
ES30.08.2010
Former [2010/50]AT19.05.2010
FI19.05.2010
SE19.05.2010
ES30.08.2010
Former [2010/49]AT19.05.2010
SE19.05.2010
ES30.08.2010
Former [2010/46]ES30.08.2010
Documents cited:Search[A]US5571160  (NYMAN PER [SE]) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO0033909  (COOK INC [US]) [A] 1,2 * page 10, line 6 - page 14, line 12 *
International search[X]EP0784995  (PACESETTER AB [SE]);
 [Y]WO9710784  (COCHLEAR LTD [AU]);
 [Y]EP0653223  (INCONTROL INC [US])
by applicantUS4532930