Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1316162

EP1316162 - METHOD FOR DISTRIBUTING SIGNALING DATA ON TRANSMISSION CHANNELS IN A MOBILE RADIO SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  13.10.2006
Database last updated on 17.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.10.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 15.11.2006  [2006/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/23]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / BAUER, Rudolf
Thannerstrasse 41
83607 Holzkirchen / DE
02 / DASSER, Peter
Liesel-Beckmann-Strasse 4
81369 München / DE
 [2003/23]
Application number, filing date01976012.303.09.2001
[2003/23]
WO2001DE03370
Priority number, dateDE200014347704.09.2000         Original published format: DE 10043477
[2003/23]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0221719
Date:14.03.2002
Language:DE
[2002/11]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1316162
Date:04.06.2003
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.03.2002
[2003/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.06.2002
ClassificationInternational:H04B7/26
[2003/23]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2004/20]
Former [2003/23]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR VERTEILUNG VON SIGNALISIERUNGSDATEN AUF ÜBERTRAGUNGSKANÄLEN IN EINEM MOBILFUNKSYSTEM[2003/23]
English:METHOD FOR DISTRIBUTING SIGNALING DATA ON TRANSMISSION CHANNELS IN A MOBILE RADIO SYSTEM[2003/23]
French:PROCEDE POUR REPARTIR DES DONNEES DE SIGNALISATION SUR DES CANAUX DE TRANSMISSION DANS UN SYSTEME DE RADIOTELEPHONIE MOBILE[2003/23]
Entry into regional phase05.03.2003National basic fee paid 
05.03.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
05.03.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.03.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
05.03.2003Examination requested  [2003/23]
13.01.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.05.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/46]
27.06.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2006/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
20.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
22.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[XA]US5790549  (DENT PAUL W [SE]) [X] 1,3 * column 4, line 55 - column 5, line 6 * * column 6, line 3 - line 29 * [A] 2;
 [PX]EP1056222  (ICO SERVICES LTD [GB]) [PX] 1 * column 3, line 7 - line 20 *;
 [A]  - CWTS WG1, "C1.01 Physical Layer - General Description", TSG-RAN WORKING GROUP 1 (RADIO) MEETING #5, Cheju, South Korea, (19990601), pages 1 - 18, XP002192729 [A] 2 * paragraph [5.2.3] *