EP1315644 - WIPER DEVICE, ESPECIALLY FOR MOTOR VEHICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.2004 Database last updated on 22.04.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valeo Systèmes d'Essuyage Service Propriété Industrielle 8 Rue Louis Lormand CS 90581 La Verrière 78322 Le Mesnil Saint Denis / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/23] | For all designated states Valeo Systemes d'essuyage ZA de l'Agiot, 8 rue Louis Lormand BP 81 - La Verrière 78321 Le Mesnil Saint Denis / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EGNER-WALTER, Bruno Käferflugstrasse 43 74076 Heilbronn / DE | [2003/23] | Representative(s) | Jahn, Wolf-Diethart Valeo Wischersysteme GmbH Poststrässle 10 74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/23] | Jahn, Wolf-Diethart Valeo Wischersysteme GmbH, Stuttgarter Strasse 119 74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 01976057.8 | 03.08.2001 | [2003/23] | WO2001EP09013 | Priority number, date | DE2000138395 | 07.08.2000 Original published format: DE 10038395 | [2003/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0212035 | Date: | 14.02.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1315644 | Date: | 04.06.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.02.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1315644 | Date: | 14.01.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B60S1/38 | [2003/23] | CPC: |
B60S1/38 (EP);
B60S1/3872 (EP);
B60S1/3875 (EP);
B60S2001/382 (EP);
B60S2001/3825 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/23] | Title | German: | WISCHVORRICHTUNG, INSBESONDERE FÜR KRAFTFAHRZEUGE | [2003/23] | English: | WIPER DEVICE, ESPECIALLY FOR MOTOR VEHICLES | [2003/23] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ESSUIE-GLACE, NOTAMMENT POUR AUTOMOBILES | [2003/23] | Entry into regional phase | 15.01.2003 | National basic fee paid | 15.01.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.01.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.02.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/23] | 09.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 29.10.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 14.01.2004 | FI | 14.01.2004 | IE | 14.01.2004 | NL | 14.01.2004 | TR | 14.01.2004 | DK | 14.04.2004 | GR | 14.04.2004 | SE | 14.04.2004 | PT | 14.06.2004 | AT | 03.08.2004 | LU | 03.08.2004 | BE | 31.08.2004 | MC | 31.08.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/10] | CY | 14.01.2004 | |
FI | 14.01.2004 | ||
IE | 14.01.2004 | ||
NL | 14.01.2004 | ||
TR | 14.01.2004 | ||
DK | 14.04.2004 | ||
GR | 14.04.2004 | ||
SE | 14.04.2004 | ||
AT | 03.08.2004 | ||
LU | 03.08.2004 | ||
BE | 31.08.2004 | ||
MC | 31.08.2004 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 14.01.2004 | |
IE | 14.01.2004 | ||
NL | 14.01.2004 | ||
TR | 14.01.2004 | ||
DK | 14.04.2004 | ||
GR | 14.04.2004 | ||
SE | 14.04.2004 | ||
AT | 03.08.2004 | ||
BE | 31.08.2004 | ||
MC | 31.08.2004 | ||
Former [2006/12] | FI | 14.01.2004 | |
IE | 14.01.2004 | ||
NL | 14.01.2004 | ||
DK | 14.04.2004 | ||
GR | 14.04.2004 | ||
SE | 14.04.2004 | ||
AT | 03.08.2004 | ||
BE | 31.08.2004 | ||
MC | 31.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/51] | FI | 14.01.2004 | |
IE | 14.01.2004 | ||
DK | 14.04.2004 | ||
GR | 14.04.2004 | ||
SE | 14.04.2004 | ||
BE | 31.08.2004 | ||
MC | 31.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | FI | 14.01.2004 | |
IE | 14.01.2004 | ||
DK | 14.04.2004 | ||
GR | 14.04.2004 | ||
SE | 14.04.2004 | ||
MC | 31.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/03] | FI | 14.01.2004 | |
IE | 14.01.2004 | ||
DK | 14.04.2004 | ||
GR | 14.04.2004 | ||
SE | 14.04.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | FI | 14.01.2004 | |
DK | 14.04.2004 | ||
GR | 14.04.2004 | ||
SE | 14.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | FI | 14.01.2004 | |
GR | 14.04.2004 | ||
SE | 14.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 14.01.2004 | |
SE | 14.04.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3480986 (FORSTER LLOYD M) [A] 1* figure - *; | [XA]FR2755926 (VALEO SYSTEMES DESSUYAGE [FR]) [X] 1,2,10,12-14 * page 5, line 11 - page 6, line 4; figures 2,5,10,11 * * page 7, line 3 - page 8, line 28 * * page 10, line 21 - page 11, line 6 * [A] 4-9,11; | [A]DE19650929 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [A] 1,13,14 * column 4, line 25 - column 5, line 33; figures 1-4 * | by applicant | DE1505357 | DE19627115 |