Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1316194

EP1316194 - HANDSET PERSONALISATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.02.2010
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.10.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, TR
published on 09.11.2011  [2011/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nokia Corporation
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
[2003/23]
Inventor(s)01 / MCCARTHY, Kevin
Marie Grubbes Allé 56
DK-2800 Lyngby / DK
02 / SOERENSEN, Lone, Tram
Gyvelvej 35, 1TV
DK-4000 Roskilde / DK
03 / NYMARK, Niels
Harloesevej 200
DK-3400 Hilleroed / DK
04 / MONTENARO, Mauro
123 Meyer Road, 09-04
437934 Singapore / SG
05 / SUONPERA, Allan
Huixquilucan Edomex Torre a Depto 1201
MX - C.P 52779 Mexico / MX
 [2009/11]
Former [2003/23]01 / MCCARTHY, Kevin
Bymidten 12, 2.3
DK-3500 Vaerloese / DK
02 / SOERENSEN, Lone, Tram
Gyvelvej 35, 1TV
DK-4000 Roskilde / DK
03 / NYMARK, Niels
Harloesevej 20
DK-3400 Hilleroed / DK
04 / MONTENARO, Mauro
123 Meyer Road, 09-04
437934 Singapore / SG
05 / SUONPERA, Allan
Hiekkalaiturintie 2 B 31
FIN-00980 Helsinki / FI
Representative(s)Read, Matthew Charles , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London
EC1A 4HD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Read, Matthew Charles , et al
Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain
London EC1A 7DH / GB
Former [2003/23]Read, Matthew Charles , et al
Venner Shipley & Co. 20 Little Britain
London EC1A 7DH / GB
Application number, filing date01976114.720.08.2001
[2003/23]
WO2001EP09563
Priority number, dateGB2000002145131.08.2000         Original published format: GB 0021451
[2003/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0219667
Date:07.03.2002
Language:EN
[2002/10]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1316194
Date:04.06.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.2002
[2003/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1316194
Date:15.04.2009
Language:EN
[2009/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.10.2002
ClassificationInternational:H04M1/725, H04M19/04
[2003/23]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/23]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:PERSONALISIERUNG EINES HANDAPPARATES[2003/23]
English:HANDSET PERSONALISATION[2003/23]
French:PERSONNALISATION DE COMBINE TELEPHONIQUE[2003/23]
Entry into regional phase28.03.2003National basic fee paid 
28.03.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
28.03.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.03.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
28.03.2003Examination requested  [2003/23]
09.02.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.05.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.09.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.01.2009Fee for grant paid
30.01.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)18.01.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
12.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
12.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
14.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
14.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT15.04.2009
BE15.04.2009
CY15.04.2009
DK15.04.2009
FI15.04.2009
IT15.04.2009
NL15.04.2009
TR15.04.2009
SE15.07.2009
GR16.07.2009
ES26.07.2009
IE20.08.2009
LU20.08.2009
CH31.08.2009
FR31.08.2009
LI31.08.2009
MC31.08.2009
PT15.09.2009
[2011/44]
Former [2011/21]AT15.04.2009
BE15.04.2009
DK15.04.2009
FI15.04.2009
IT15.04.2009
NL15.04.2009
SE15.07.2009
GR16.07.2009
ES26.07.2009
IE20.08.2009
LU20.08.2009
CH31.08.2009
FR31.08.2009
LI31.08.2009
MC31.08.2009
PT15.09.2009
Former [2011/14]AT15.04.2009
BE15.04.2009
DK15.04.2009
FI15.04.2009
IT15.04.2009
NL15.04.2009
SE15.07.2009
GR16.07.2009
ES26.07.2009
IE20.08.2009
CH31.08.2009
FR31.08.2009
LI31.08.2009
MC31.08.2009
PT15.09.2009
Former [2010/47]AT15.04.2009
BE15.04.2009
DK15.04.2009
FI15.04.2009
NL15.04.2009
SE15.07.2009
GR16.07.2009
ES26.07.2009
IE20.08.2009
CH31.08.2009
FR31.08.2009
LI31.08.2009
MC31.08.2009
PT15.09.2009
Former [2010/35]AT15.04.2009
BE15.04.2009
DK15.04.2009
FI15.04.2009
NL15.04.2009
SE15.07.2009
ES26.07.2009
IE20.08.2009
CH31.08.2009
FR31.08.2009
LI31.08.2009
MC31.08.2009
PT15.09.2009
Former [2010/21]AT15.04.2009
BE15.04.2009
DK15.04.2009
FI15.04.2009
NL15.04.2009
SE15.07.2009
ES26.07.2009
CH31.08.2009
LI31.08.2009
MC31.08.2009
PT15.09.2009
Former [2010/16]AT15.04.2009
BE15.04.2009
DK15.04.2009
FI15.04.2009
NL15.04.2009
SE15.07.2009
ES26.07.2009
MC31.08.2009
PT15.09.2009
Former [2010/10]AT15.04.2009
BE15.04.2009
DK15.04.2009
FI15.04.2009
NL15.04.2009
SE15.07.2009
ES26.07.2009
PT15.09.2009
Former [2010/08]AT15.04.2009
DK15.04.2009
FI15.04.2009
NL15.04.2009
SE15.07.2009
ES26.07.2009
PT15.09.2009
Former [2009/52]AT15.04.2009
FI15.04.2009
NL15.04.2009
SE15.07.2009
ES26.07.2009
PT15.09.2009
Former [2009/50]AT15.04.2009
FI15.04.2009
NL15.04.2009
ES26.07.2009
PT15.09.2009
Former [2009/49]AT15.04.2009
FI15.04.2009
ES26.07.2009
PT15.09.2009
Former [2009/46]ES26.07.2009
Cited inInternational search[PX]WO0054530  (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [PX] 1,12,19,26,33,40 * page 3, line 15 - line 23 * * page 4, line 9 - line 17 * * page 5, line 24 - page 7, line 8 * * page 11, line 6 - line 22 * * page 13, line 23 - line 27 * * figures 1-3 *;
 [DY]EP0611070  (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [DY] 1,2,8,11-13,15,18-20,22,25-27,29,32-34,40,43 * abstract * * column 1, line 49 - column 2, line 7 * * column 3, line 58 - column 4, line 35 * * column 5, line 1 - column 6, line 55 * * figures 2,3 *;
 [Y]US5381138  (STAIR MARK T [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,8,11-13,15,18-20,22,25-27,29,32-34,40,43 * abstract * * column 1, line 39 - line 52 * * column 2, line 35 - column 3, line 5 * * column 5, line 16 - column 7, line 12 * * table 1 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]GB2305073  (MOTOROLA LTD [GB]) [A] 1-3,7,12-14,19-21,26-28,33,34,37,39,40,42,43 * abstract * * page 2, line 1 - page 3, line 6 * * page 3, line 20 - page 5, line 33 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]WO9817045  (BRIGHT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [A] 1,2,4,6,12,13,19,20,26,27,33,34,36,38,40,41,43,44 * page 5, line 19 - line 25 * * page 8, line 17 - line 20 * * page 21, line 19 - page 27, line 3 *;
 [A]US4868561  (DAVIS WALTER L [US]) [A] 1,2,12,13,19,20,26,27,40,43 * abstract * * column 1, line 45 - column 2, line 11 * * column 2, line 60 - column 3, line 25 * * column 3, line 64 - column 4, line 61 * * column 5, line 1 - line 49 * * figures 1-4 *;
 [DA]US6094587  (ARMANTO TANELI [FI], et al) [DA] 1,2,12,13,19,20,26,27,33,34,40,43 * column 3, line 1 - column 4, line 31 * * column 7, line 5 - line 35 * * column 8, line 25 - line 34 * * figures 5,6 *