Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1317545

EP1317545 - Coryneform bacteria transformed with sequences encoding the PKND gene and their use in producing L-amino acids [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2003/24]NUCLEOTIDE SEQUENCES CODING FOR THE PKND GENE
[2005/45]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  25.09.2009
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.09.2009Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 28.10.2009  [2009/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Evonik Degussa GmbH
Rellinghauser Strasse 1-11
45128 Essen / DE
[2008/32]
Former [2007/45]For all designated states
Evonik Degussa GmbH
Bennigsenplatz 1
40474 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2007/10]For all designated states
Degussa GmbH
Bennigsenplatz 1
40474 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2003/24]For all designated states
Degussa AG
Bennigsenplatz 1
40474 Düsseldorf / DE
Inventor(s)01 / BATHE, Brigitte
Twieten 1
33154 Salzkotten / DE
02 / SCHRÖDER, Indra
Backsheide 21
33803 Steinhagen / DE
03 / FARWICK, Mike
Gustav-Adolf-Strasse 11
33615 Bielefeld / DE
04 / HERMANN, Thomas
Zirkonstrasse 8
33739 Bielefeld / DE
 [2003/24]
Application number, filing date01976189.905.09.2001
[2003/24]
WO2001EP10210
Priority number, dateDE200014494812.09.2000         Original published format: DE 10044948
DE200112009425.04.2001         Original published format: DE 10120094
[2003/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0222632
Date:21.03.2002
Language:EN
[2002/12]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1317545
Date:11.06.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.03.2002
[2003/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1317545
Date:29.03.2006
Language:EN
[2006/13]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP1317545
Date:28.10.2009
Language:EN
[2009/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.06.2002
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/31, C12P13/04, C12P13/08, C12Q1/68
[2003/24]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/24]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:Coryneforme Bakteriën transformiert mit dem PKND-Gen kodierenden Nukleotidsequenzen und deren Verwendung zur Herstellung von L -Aminosäuren[2005/45]
English:Coryneform bacteria transformed with sequences encoding the PKND gene and their use in producing L-amino acids[2005/45]
French:Bactéries coryneformes transformées avec des séquences nucléotidiques codant pour le gene PKND et leur utilisation dans la préparation d'acides aminés L[2005/45]
Former [2003/24]FÜR DAS PKND-GEN KODIERENDE NUKLEOTIDSEQUENZEN
Former [2003/24]NUCLEOTIDE SEQUENCES CODING FOR THE PKND GENE
Former [2003/24]SEQUENCES NUCLEOTIDIQUES CODANTES POUR LE GENE PKND
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
Entry into regional phase11.02.2003National basic fee paid 
11.02.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
11.02.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.04.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
11.02.2003Examination requested  [2003/24]
05.09.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.12.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.01.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.10.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.01.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.05.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
19.05.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.10.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.01.2006Fee for grant paid
21.01.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  29.12.2006  12.01.2007  ADMISSIBLE
BASF SE
Global Intellectual Property
GVX-C006
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Opponent's representative
Bieberbach, Andreas, et al
BASF SE Global Intellectual Property GVX / K - C 6
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2008/31]
Opponent(s)01  29.12.2006  12.01.2007  ADMISSIBLE
BASF SE
Global Intellectual Property GVX-C006
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Opponent's representative
Bieberbach, Andreas, et al
BASF SE Global Intellectual Property GVX / K - C 6
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Former [2007/10]
Opponent(s)01  29.12.2006  12.01.2007  ADMISSIBLE
BASF Aktiengesellschaft Global Intellectual Property
Carl-Bosch-Str. 38
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Opponent's representative
Bieberbach, Andreas, et al
BASF SE Global Intellectual Property GVX / K - C 6
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
14.02.2007Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
31.05.2007Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
16.09.2008Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
16.09.2008Date of oral proceedings
26.01.2009Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
27.01.2009Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
10.06.2009Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
28.08.2009Fee for printing new specification paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
07.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
15.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT29.03.2006
BE29.03.2006
CH29.03.2006
CY29.03.2006
FI29.03.2006
IT29.03.2006
LI29.03.2006
NL29.03.2006
TR29.03.2006
DK29.06.2006
SE29.06.2006
GR30.06.2006
ES10.07.2006
PT29.08.2006
GB05.09.2006
IE05.09.2006
LU05.09.2006
MC30.09.2006
[2009/03]
Former [2008/37]AT29.03.2006
BE29.03.2006
CH29.03.2006
FI29.03.2006
IT29.03.2006
LI29.03.2006
NL29.03.2006
TR29.03.2006
DK29.06.2006
SE29.06.2006
GR30.06.2006
ES10.07.2006
PT29.08.2006
GB05.09.2006
IE05.09.2006
LU05.09.2006
MC30.09.2006
Former [2008/29]AT29.03.2006
BE29.03.2006
CH29.03.2006
FI29.03.2006
IT29.03.2006
LI29.03.2006
NL29.03.2006
DK29.06.2006
SE29.06.2006
GR30.06.2006
ES10.07.2006
PT29.08.2006
GB05.09.2006
IE05.09.2006
MC30.09.2006
Former [2008/20]AT29.03.2006
BE29.03.2006
CH29.03.2006
IT29.03.2006
LI29.03.2006
NL29.03.2006
DK29.06.2006
SE29.06.2006
GR30.06.2006
ES10.07.2006
PT29.08.2006
GB05.09.2006
IE05.09.2006
MC30.09.2006
Former [2007/50]AT29.03.2006
BE29.03.2006
CH29.03.2006
IT29.03.2006
LI29.03.2006
NL29.03.2006
DK29.06.2006
SE29.06.2006
ES10.07.2006
PT29.08.2006
GB05.09.2006
IE05.09.2006
MC30.09.2006
Former [2007/42]AT29.03.2006
BE29.03.2006
CH29.03.2006
IT29.03.2006
LI29.03.2006
NL29.03.2006
DK29.06.2006
SE29.06.2006
ES10.07.2006
PT29.08.2006
IE05.09.2006
MC30.09.2006
Former [2007/37]AT29.03.2006
BE29.03.2006
CH29.03.2006
IT29.03.2006
LI29.03.2006
NL29.03.2006
DK29.06.2006
SE29.06.2006
ES10.07.2006
PT29.08.2006
MC30.09.2006
Former [2007/19]AT29.03.2006
BE29.03.2006
CH29.03.2006
LI29.03.2006
NL29.03.2006
DK29.06.2006
SE29.06.2006
ES10.07.2006
PT29.08.2006
Former [2007/13]AT29.03.2006
BE29.03.2006
CH29.03.2006
LI29.03.2006
DK29.06.2006
SE29.06.2006
ES10.07.2006
PT29.08.2006
Former [2007/10]AT29.03.2006
CH29.03.2006
LI29.03.2006
DK29.06.2006
SE29.06.2006
ES10.07.2006
PT29.08.2006
Former [2007/03]AT29.03.2006
CH29.03.2006
LI29.03.2006
SE29.06.2006
ES10.07.2006
Former [2006/50]AT29.03.2006
SE29.06.2006
ES10.07.2006
Former [2006/46]AT29.03.2006
SE29.06.2006
Former [2006/43]AT29.03.2006
Cited inInternational search[X]US4411997  (SHIMAZAKI KEISHI [JP], et al) [X] 8-11,13-16 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO0017379  (CHEIL JEDANG CORP [KR], et al) [X] 8-11,13-16 * the whole document *;
 [PX]EP1108790  (KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO KK [JP]) [PX] 1-33 * page 160; table 1 *
 [X]  - COLE ET AL., "Mycobacterium tuberculosis H37Rv complete genome; segment 97/162", DATABASE EMBL, (19980223), XP002191212 [X] 1-4 * accession number AL021957 *
 [A]  - AV-GAY Y., AND EVERETT M., "The eukaryotic-like Ser/thr protein kinases of Mycobacterium tuberculosis", TRENDS IN MICROBIOLOGY, (200005), vol. 8, no. 5, pages 238 - 244, XP002191211 [A] 1-33 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0966-842X(00)01734-0
 [A]  - SCHRUMPF B ET AL, "A FUNCTIONALLY SPLIT PATHWAY FOR LYSINE SYNTHESIS IN CORYNEBACTERIUM GLUTAMICUM", JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (199107), vol. 173, no. 14, ISSN 0021-9193, pages 4510 - 4516, XP000884180 [A] 10,11,15,16 * the whole document *
 [PX]  - NAKAGAWA ET AL., "Sequence 7066 from Patent EP1108790", DATABASE EMBL, (20010510), XP002191244 [PX] 1-33 * accession number AX127150 *
 [PX]  - NAKAGAWA ET AL., "Sequence 5884 from Patent EP1108790", DATABASE EMBL, (20010510), XP002191701 [PX] 1-33 * accession number AX125968 *
Examination   - RYKX A. ET AL, "Protein kinase D: a family affair", FEBS LETTERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20030512), vol. 546, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1016/S0014-5793(03)00487-3, pages 81 - 86, XP004433623

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0014-5793(03)00487-3