Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1237301

EP1237301 - SYSTEM FOR RADIO COMMUNICATIONS TO BE MADE FOR RESPECTIVE PARTICULAR GROUPS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  09.01.2004
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.01.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 25.02.2004  [2004/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Temco Japan Co., Ltd.
12-26, Hounan 2-chome, Suginami-ku
Tokyo 168-0062 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2002/36]For all designated states
Temco Japan Co., Ltd.
12-26, Hounan 2-chome, Suginami-ku
Tokyo 168-0062 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / TAKEDA, Takeshi, c/o TEMCO JAPAN CO., LTD.
12-26, Hounan 2-chome, Suginami-ku
Tokyo 168-0062 / JP
02 / MASUDA, Tetsuya, c/o TEMCO JAPAN CO., LTD.
12-26, Hounan 2-chome, Suginami-ku
Tokyo 168-0062 / JP
 [2002/36]
Representative(s)de Roquemaurel, Bruno
Novagraaf Technologies
122, rue Edouard Vaillant
92593 Levallois Perret Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2002/36]de Roquemaurel, Bruno
Novagraaf Technologies 122, rue Edouard Vaillant
92593 Levallois Perret Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date01976777.119.10.2001
[2002/36]
WO2001JP09202
Priority number, dateJP2000032801827.10.2000         Original published format: JP 2000328018
[2002/36]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0235737
Date:02.05.2002
Language:EN
[2002/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1237301
Date:04.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.2002
[2002/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP02.05.2002
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.11.2002
ClassificationInternational:H04B7/26, H04Q7/06
[2003/01]
Former International [2002/36]H04B7/26
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/36]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM ZUR FUNKKOMMUNIKATION ZWISCHEN BESTIMMTEN GRUPPEN[2002/36]
English:SYSTEM FOR RADIO COMMUNICATIONS TO BE MADE FOR RESPECTIVE PARTICULAR GROUPS[2002/36]
French:SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATIONS RADIO A EFFECTUER POUR DES GROUPES SPECIFIQUES CORRESPONDANTS[2002/36]
Entry into regional phase04.07.2002Translation filed 
25.06.2002National basic fee paid 
25.06.2002Search fee paid 
25.06.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
25.06.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.06.2002Examination requested  [2002/36]
12.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.08.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/09]
26.09.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/09]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200303   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO9302433  (ANAGNOSTOPOULOS A PANAGIOTIS [GR]) [Y] 1-5 * page 1, lines 5-30 * * page 7, lines 18-24 * * page 6, lines 5-12 * * page 13, line 11 - page 15, line 16 * * figure 1 *;
 [Y]US5337364  (FITCH FRANK [US]) [Y] 1-5 * column 1, lines 7-12 * * column 2, lines 16-33 * * column 4, lines 27-43 *;
 [Y]US5732326  (MARUYAMA MINORU [JP], et al) [Y] 1,2 * column 1, lines 23-44 * * column 1, lines 54-62 * * figure 33 *
International search[Y]JPH08102790  (FUJITSU LTD);
 [Y]JP2000115069  (JAPAN RADIO CO LTD);
 [Y]JP2000023267  (NIPPON COLUMBIA)