Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1317648

EP1317648 - HEAT EXCHANGER AND HEATING SYSTEM EQUIPPED THEREWITH [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.03.2007
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.12.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 14.01.2009  [2009/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
3F Holding B.V.
Vechtdijk 16
7721 AG Dalfsen / NL
[2006/06]
Former [2003/24]For all designated states
3F Holding B.V.
Curiestraat 13
6716 AR Ede / NL
Inventor(s)01 / MEIJER, Willem
Jan Steenstraat 92
NL-7021 DV Zelhem / NL
 [2003/24]
Representative(s)Bartelds, Erik , et al
Arnold & Siedsma
Bezuidenhoutseweg 57
2594 AC The Hague / NL
[N/P]
Former [2008/34]Bartelds, Erik , et al
Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1
2517 GK The Hague / NL
Former [2003/24]Bartelds, Erik , et al
Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1
2517 GK Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date01976933.005.09.2001
[2003/24]
WO2001NL00658
Priority number, dateNL2000101610405.09.2000         Original published format: NL 1016104
[2003/24]
Filing languageNL
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0221063
Date:14.03.2002
Language:EN
[2002/11]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1317648
Date:11.06.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.03.2002
[2003/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1317648
Date:03.05.2006
Language:EN
[2006/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.06.2002
ClassificationInternational:F28F13/02
[2003/24]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/24]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:WÄRMETAUSCHER UND DAMIT AUSGERÜSTETES HEIZSYSTEM[2003/24]
English:HEAT EXCHANGER AND HEATING SYSTEM EQUIPPED THEREWITH[2003/24]
French:ECHANGEUR THERMIQUE ET SYSTEME DE CHAUFFAGE EQUIPE DE CET ECHANGEUR[2003/24]
Entry into regional phase14.03.2002Translation filed 
07.04.2003National basic fee paid 
07.04.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
07.04.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.04.2003Examination requested  [2003/24]
18.12.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.08.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
13.10.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.03.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.09.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.11.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.01.2006Fee for grant paid
10.01.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.02.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/15]
Request for further processing for:13.10.2004Request for further processing filed
13.10.2004Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
04.11.2004Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
24.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
28.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200303   M06   Fee paid on   26.11.2003
30.09.200404   M06   Fee paid on   24.03.2005
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY03.05.2006
FI03.05.2006
TR03.05.2006
DK03.08.2006
SE03.08.2006
GR04.08.2006
ES14.08.2006
MC30.09.2006
PT03.10.2006
[2009/03]
Former [2008/38]FI03.05.2006
TR03.05.2006
DK03.08.2006
SE03.08.2006
GR04.08.2006
ES14.08.2006
MC30.09.2006
PT03.10.2006
Former [2008/20]FI03.05.2006
DK03.08.2006
SE03.08.2006
GR04.08.2006
ES14.08.2006
MC30.09.2006
PT03.10.2006
Former [2007/45]FI03.05.2006
DK03.08.2006
SE03.08.2006
ES14.08.2006
MC30.09.2006
PT03.10.2006
Former [2007/37]FI03.05.2006
IT03.05.2006
DK03.08.2006
SE03.08.2006
ES14.08.2006
MC30.09.2006
PT03.10.2006
Former [2007/12]FI03.05.2006
DK03.08.2006
SE03.08.2006
ES14.08.2006
PT03.10.2006
Former [2007/10]FI03.05.2006
DK03.08.2006
SE03.08.2006
ES14.08.2006
Former [2006/51]FI03.05.2006
SE03.08.2006
ES14.08.2006
Former [2006/50]SE03.08.2006
ES14.08.2006
Former [2006/48]SE03.08.2006
Cited inInternational search[A]DE2254851  (AHLMANN CARLSHUETTE KG) [A] 1,6 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5121792  (SCHUKEY JUERGEN [DE]) [A] 1,6 * column 3, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]SU992993
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1983, no. 47, Database accession no. 1983-825775, XP002192464 & SU992993 A 19830130 (NOVOPOLOTSK POLY) [A] 1,6 * abstract *