Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1320335

EP1320335 - FLEXIBLE FLOW APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR THE DISRUPTION OF OCCLUSIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.08.2004
Database last updated on 17.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip20.08.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.10.2004  [2004/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Endovasix, Inc.
298 Harbor Boulevard
Belmont, CA 94002 / US
[2003/26]
Inventor(s)01 / ESCH, Victor, C.
5817 Morgan Lane NW
Albuquerque, NM 87120 / US
02 / JACKSON, Paul, S.
6 Woodleaf Avenue
Redwood City, CA 94061 / US
 [2003/26]
Representative(s)Hitchcock, Esmond Antony
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London
WC2E 9RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/26]Hitchcock, Esmond Antony
Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street
London WC1A 1LW / GB
Application number, filing date01977313.428.09.2001
[2003/26]
WO2001US30657
Priority number, dateUS2000067613129.09.2000         Original published format: US 676131
[2003/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0226150
Date:04.04.2002
Language:EN
[2002/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1320335
Date:25.06.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.04.2002
[2003/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.04.2002
ClassificationInternational:A61B18/24, A61B18/26
[2003/26]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/26]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:FLEXIBLER FLUSSERZEUGUNGSAPPARAT UND METHODE ZUR ZERSTÖRUNG VON OKKLUSIONEN[2003/26]
English:FLEXIBLE FLOW APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR THE DISRUPTION OF OCCLUSIONS[2003/26]
French:APPAREIL FLUX FLEXIBLE ET PROC D DE DISLOCATION DES OCCLUSIONS[2003/26]
Entry into regional phase02.04.2003National basic fee paid 
02.04.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
02.04.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.04.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
02.04.2003Examination requested  [2003/26]
01.04.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/41]
05.05.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2004/41]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200303   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]WO0004838  (ENDOVASIX INC [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5776127  (ANDERSON RICHARD ROX [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 5, line 59 - column 6, line 43; figures 3A-3D *;
 [A]WO9920189  (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [A] 1 * figures 3A,7A-7E; claim 3 *