Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1332418

EP1332418 - WORKFLOW MANAGEMENT SOFTWARE OVERVIEW [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.09.2009
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip20.11.2009Change - representativepublished on 23.12.2009  [2009/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Setteducati, Michael
300 Grand Street, Apt. 221
Hoboken, NJ 07030-2713 / US
[2003/32]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2003/32]
Representative(s)Feray, Valérie , et al
Ipsilon
Le Centralis
63, avenue du Général Leclerc
92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR
[N/P]
Former [2009/52]Feray, Valérie , et al
Feray Lenne Conseil 39-41, Avenue Aristide Briand
92163 Antony Cedex / FR
Former [2003/32]Feray, Valérie , et al
Feray Lenne Conseil 44/52, Rue de la Justice
75020 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date01977371.202.10.2001
[2003/32]
WO2001US30837
Priority number, dateUS20000237827P03.10.2000         Original published format: US 237827 P
[2003/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0229515
Date:11.04.2002
Language:EN
[2002/15]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1332418
Date:06.08.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.04.2002
[2003/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US03.01.2003
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.05.2006
ClassificationInternational:G06F1/00
[2003/32]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/32]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:ARBEITSFLUSSMANAGEMENTSOFTWARE-ÜBERSICHT[2003/32]
English:WORKFLOW MANAGEMENT SOFTWARE OVERVIEW[2003/32]
French:LOGICIEL DE GESTION DE FLUX DE TRAVAUX[2003/32]
Entry into regional phase05.05.2003National basic fee paid 
05.05.2003Search fee paid 
05.05.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
05.05.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.05.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
28.04.2003Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.05.2003Examination requested  [2003/32]
26.07.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.01.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.05.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2009/43]
05.06.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2009/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
26.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
12.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
14.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
16.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200303   M06   Fee paid on   29.01.2004
31.10.200606   M06   Fee paid on   14.03.2007
31.10.200808   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - No Search
International search[AE]US2002040312  ;
 [X]US5581691  ;
 [A]US5745687  ;
 [A]US5960420  ;
 [A]US5974392  ;
 [XP]US6144955  ;
 [XE]US6349287