Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1341453

EP1341453 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR PIERCING SKIN WITH MICROPROTRUSIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  22.09.2017
Database last updated on 22.08.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  08.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip22.09.2017Opposition rejectedpublished on 25.10.2017  [2017/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Alza Corporation
700 Eubanks Drive
Vacaville, CA 95688 / US
[2013/49]
Former [2011/40]For all designated states
ALZA Corporation
6500 Paseo Padre Parkway
Fremont, CA 94555 / US
Former [2008/40]For all designated states
ALZA Corporation
1010 Joaquin Road
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
Former [2003/37]For all designated states
Alza Corporation
1900 Charleston Road, P.O. Box 7210, Building M10-3
Mountain View, CA 94039-7210 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CORMIER, Michel, J., N.
278 Andsbury Avenue
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
02 / DADDONA, Peter, E.
35 Anderson Way
Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US
03 / KEENAN, Richard, L.
14711 Fruitvale Avenue
Saratoga, CA 95070 / US
04 / LIN, WeiQi
72 Peter Coutts Circle
Palo Alto, CA 94305 / US
05 / MATRIANO, James, A.
2384 Lida Drive
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
06 / SAMIEE, Ahmad, P.
Apt. 4, 637 Kirkland Drive
Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US
07 / TRAUTMAN, Joseph, C.
1574 Wright Avenue
Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US
 [2003/37]
Representative(s)Maschio, Antonio , et al
Maschio & Soames IP Limited
30 Carlton Crescent
Southampton SO15 2EW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/44]Maschio, Antonio , et al
Maschio & Soames IP Limited
20 Carlton Crescent
Southampton, SO15 2ET / GB
Former [2012/08]Lloyd, John Scott , et al
Edwards Wildman Innovations LLP
10 Carlton Crescent
Southampton SO15 2EZ / GB
Former [2011/51]Lloyd, John Scott , et al
Edwards Angell Palmer
& Dodge Innovations LLP
10 Carlton Crescent
Southampton SO15 2EZ / GB
Former [2008/39]Soames, Candida Jane , et al
EAPD Innovations 10 Carlton Crescent Southampton
SO15 2EZ / GB
Former [2003/37]Mercer, Christopher Paul , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford 43, Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date01977734.112.10.2001
[2003/37]
WO2001US31936
Priority number, dateUS20000240307P13.10.2000         Original published format: US 240307 P
[2003/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0230301
Date:18.04.2002
Language:EN
[2002/16]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1341453
Date:10.09.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.04.2002
[2003/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1341453
Date:15.04.2009
Language:EN
[2009/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.04.2002
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/20, A61M37/00, A61M35/00, A61N1/30
[2003/37]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/37]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM DURCHSTECHEN DER HAUT MIT MICRONADELN[2003/37]
English:APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR PIERCING SKIN WITH MICROPROTRUSIONS[2003/37]
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT LA PERFORATION DE LA PEAU AU MOYEN DE MICROPROTUBERANCES[2003/37]
Entry into regional phase12.05.2003National basic fee paid 
12.05.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
12.05.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.04.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
12.05.2003Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.05.2003Examination requested  [2003/37]
24.05.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.07.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.08.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.11.2008Fee for grant paid
12.11.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  04.12.2009   
Engelhard, Dorothee
Josef-Kamm-Ring 12
93096 Köfering / DE
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle, et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2010/02]
Opponent(s)01  04.12.2009   
Engelhard, Dorothee
Josef-Kamm-Ring 12
93096 Köfering / DE
Opponent's representative
HOFFMANN EITLE, et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
22.02.2010Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
22.10.2010Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
05.10.2011Date of oral proceedings
20.10.2011Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
31.03.2017Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 18.05.2017
18.05.2017Date of oral proceedings
09.06.2017Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
19.06.2017Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2017/43]
Appeal following opposition15.11.2011Appeal received No.  T2365/11
16.02.2012Statement of grounds filed
24.02.2016Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure
24.02.2016Date of oral proceedings
01.03.2016Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
14.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
12.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
12.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
29.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
27.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT15.04.2009
BE15.04.2009
CY15.04.2009
DK15.04.2009
FI15.04.2009
NL15.04.2009
TR15.04.2009
SE15.07.2009
GR16.07.2009
PT15.09.2009
IE12.10.2009
LU12.10.2009
CH31.10.2009
LI31.10.2009
MC31.10.2009
[2015/21]
Former [2011/21]AT15.04.2009
BE15.04.2009
DK15.04.2009
FI15.04.2009
NL15.04.2009
SE15.07.2009
GR16.07.2009
PT15.09.2009
IE12.10.2009
LU12.10.2009
CH31.10.2009
LI31.10.2009
MC31.10.2009
Former [2010/46]AT15.04.2009
BE15.04.2009
DK15.04.2009
FI15.04.2009
NL15.04.2009
SE15.07.2009
GR16.07.2009
PT15.09.2009
IE12.10.2009
CH31.10.2009
LI31.10.2009
MC31.10.2009
Former [2010/25]AT15.04.2009
BE15.04.2009
DK15.04.2009
FI15.04.2009
NL15.04.2009
SE15.07.2009
PT15.09.2009
MC31.10.2009
Former [2010/10]AT15.04.2009
BE15.04.2009
DK15.04.2009
FI15.04.2009
NL15.04.2009
SE15.07.2009
PT15.09.2009
Former [2010/08]AT15.04.2009
DK15.04.2009
FI15.04.2009
NL15.04.2009
SE15.07.2009
PT15.09.2009
Former [2009/52]AT15.04.2009
FI15.04.2009
NL15.04.2009
SE15.07.2009
PT15.09.2009
Former [2009/50]AT15.04.2009
FI15.04.2009
NL15.04.2009
PT15.09.2009
Former [2009/49]AT15.04.2009
FI15.04.2009
PT15.09.2009
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9929365  (ALZA CORP [US]) [A] 16,18,20,28-30,38 * page 9, line 9 - line 33; figures 5,10 *;
 [A]WO9748440  (ALZA CORP [US]) [A] 16,20,29,38 * abstract *;
 [A]US6048337  (SVEDMAN PAL [SE]) [A] 16,18,20,29,30,38 * column 20, line 1 - column 21, line 60; figures 21-24 *;
 [PA]WO0143643  (ALZA CORP [US]) [PA] 16-18,20,29,30,38 * the whole document *