EP1316057 - EVALUATION OF EDGE DIRECTION INFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.06.2007 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Change - applicant | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/03] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/33] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27 c 80686 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/47] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27 c 80686 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/23] | For all designated states FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FÖRDERUNG DER ANGEWANDTEN FORSCHUNG E.V. Leonrodstrasse 54 80636 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FROEBA, Bernhard Rothenkirchener Str. 18 96361 Steinbach / DE | 02 /
KUEBLBECK, Christian Schenkstr. 172 91052 Erlangen / DE | [2003/23] | Representative(s) | Leonhard, Frank Reimund Leonhard & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 10 09 62 80083 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/23] | Leonhard, Frank Reimund, Dipl.-Ing. Leonhard - Olgemöller - Fricke Patentanwälte Postfach 10 09 57 80083 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01978090.7 | 03.09.2001 | [2003/23] | WO2001DE03375 | Priority number, date | DE20001043460 | 04.09.2000 Original published format: DE 10043460 | [2003/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0221427 | Date: | 14.03.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/11] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1316057 | Date: | 04.06.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.03.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1316057 | Date: | 16.08.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00, G06T7/00 | [2003/23] | CPC: |
G06V40/161 (EP,US);
G06T7/75 (EP,US);
G06V40/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUSWERTEN VON KANTENRICHTUNGSINFORMATION | [2003/23] | English: | EVALUATION OF EDGE DIRECTION INFORMATION | [2003/23] | French: | EVALUATION D'INFORMATIONS DE DIRECTION D'ARETES | [2003/23] | Entry into regional phase | 21.03.2003 | National basic fee paid | 21.03.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.03.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.04.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/23] | 25.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.01.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 07.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/30] | Request for further processing for: | 07.03.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 07.03.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.05.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 16.08.2006 | FI | 16.08.2006 | IT | 16.08.2006 | TR | 16.08.2006 | LU | 03.09.2006 | MC | 30.09.2006 | DK | 16.11.2006 | SE | 16.11.2006 | GR | 17.11.2006 | ES | 27.11.2006 | PT | 16.01.2007 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | FI | 16.08.2006 | |
IT | 16.08.2006 | ||
TR | 16.08.2006 | ||
LU | 03.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
DK | 16.11.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
GR | 17.11.2006 | ||
ES | 27.11.2006 | ||
PT | 16.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/20] | FI | 16.08.2006 | |
IT | 16.08.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
DK | 16.11.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
GR | 17.11.2006 | ||
ES | 27.11.2006 | ||
PT | 16.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/37] | FI | 16.08.2006 | |
IT | 16.08.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
DK | 16.11.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
ES | 27.11.2006 | ||
PT | 16.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/26] | FI | 16.08.2006 | |
DK | 16.11.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
ES | 27.11.2006 | ||
PT | 16.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/22] | FI | 16.08.2006 | |
DK | 16.11.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
ES | 27.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | FI | 16.08.2006 | |
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
ES | 27.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/10] | FI | 16.08.2006 | |
SE | 16.11.2006 | Cited in | International search | [DXA] - MAIO D ET AL, "Real-time face location on gray-scale static images", PATTERN RECOGNITION, PERGAMON PRESS INC. ELMSFORD, N.Y, US, (200009), vol. 33, no. 9, ISSN 0031-3203, pages 1525 - 1539, XP004243904 [DX] 1-7,9,10,13-15,23,25-27 * Seite 1527, Abschnitt "2. Directional Image"; page 1531, column L, paragraph 2 - column R, paragraph 2; figures 2,6,8,9 * [A] 8,11,12,16-22,24 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0031-3203(99)00130-2 | [A] - DONAHUE M J ET AL, "ON THE USE OF LEVEL CURVES IN IMAGE ANALYSIS", CVGIP IMAGE UNDERSTANDING, ACADEMIC PRESS, DULUTH, MA, US, (19930301), vol. 57, no. 2, ISSN 1049-9660, pages 185 - 203, XP000226774 [A] 15 * Seite 189, Abschnitt "3.4 Region Contrast and Consistency" Seite 199-201, Abschnitt "5.1 Tangent Examples";; figures 13-15 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/ciun.1993.1012 | [A] - SEITZ P ET AL, "THE DIGITAL DOORKEEPER - AUTOMATIC FACE RECOGNITION WITH THE COMPUTER", PROCEEDINGS OF THE ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL CARNAHAN CONFERENCE ON SECURITY TECHNOLOGY. TAIPEI, OCT. 1 - 3, 1991, NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19911001), vol. CONF. 25, ISBN 0-7803-0120-X, pages 77 - 83, XP000300411 [A] 1-27 * page 79, column L, paragraph 2 - paragraph 4; figures 1,2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CCST.1991.202194 |