Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1315553

EP1315553 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR SEPARATING UNDISSOLVED CONSTITUENTS OUT OF BIOLOGICAL FLUIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.10.2007
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.09.2009Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 14.10.2009  [2009/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
peS Gesellschaft für medizinische Diagnose-Systeme mbH
Hauptstrasse 103
04416 Markkleeberg / DE
[2006/19]
Former [2003/23]For all designated states
INSTITUT FUR CHEMO- UND BIOSENSORIK Münster E.V.
Mendelstrasse 7
48149 Münster / DE
Inventor(s)01 / RAUCH, Peter
Rotdornweg 67
48301 Nottuln / DE
02 / KATERKAMP, Andreas
Wilhelmstrasse 65
48149 Münster / DE
03 / SCHMITZ, Marco
Niedenkampstr.28
48565 Steinfurt / DE
04 / GRAWE, Frank
Laurenzstr. 75
48607 Ochtrup / DE
05 / MEUSEL, Markus
Memmertweg 28
48159 Münster / DE
 [2003/23]
Representative(s)Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
An der Frauenkirche 20
01067 Dresden / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/35]Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte An der Frauenkirche 20
01067 Dresden / DE
Former [2003/23]Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR
Gostritzer Strasse 61-63
01217 Dresden / DE
Application number, filing date01978134.305.09.2001
[2003/23]
WO2001DE03517
Priority number, dateDE200014617308.09.2000         Original published format: DE 10046173
[2003/23]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0220141
Date:14.03.2002
Language:DE
[2002/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1315553
Date:04.06.2003
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.03.2002
[2003/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1315553
Date:06.12.2006
Language:DE
[2006/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.03.2002
ClassificationInternational:B01D61/18, B01D63/08, G01N33/49
[2003/23]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/23]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR SEPARATION VON UNGELÖSTEN BESTANDTEILEN AUS BIOLOGISCHEN FLÜSSIGKEITEN[2003/23]
English:DEVICE AND METHOD FOR SEPARATING UNDISSOLVED CONSTITUENTS OUT OF BIOLOGICAL FLUIDS[2003/23]
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDES POUR SEPARER DES CONSTITUANTS NON DISSOUS CONTENUS DANS DES LIQUIDES BIOLOGIQUES[2003/23]
Entry into regional phase13.03.2003National basic fee paid 
13.03.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
13.03.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.03.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
13.03.2003Examination requested  [2003/23]
18.09.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.03.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.02.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.06.2006Fee for grant paid
03.06.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.09.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
23.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
27.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
29.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY06.12.2006
DK06.12.2006
FI06.12.2006
IE06.12.2006
NL06.12.2006
TR06.12.2006
SE06.03.2007
GR07.03.2007
ES17.03.2007
PT07.05.2007
LU05.09.2007
[2009/42]
Former [2009/37]CY06.12.2006
DK06.12.2006
FI06.12.2006
IE06.12.2006
NL06.12.2006
SE06.03.2007
GR07.03.2007
ES17.03.2007
PT07.05.2007
LU05.09.2007
Former [2008/20]DK06.12.2006
FI06.12.2006
IE06.12.2006
NL06.12.2006
SE06.03.2007
GR07.03.2007
ES17.03.2007
PT07.05.2007
Former [2007/46]DK06.12.2006
FI06.12.2006
IE06.12.2006
NL06.12.2006
SE06.03.2007
ES17.03.2007
PT07.05.2007
Former [2007/42]FI06.12.2006
IE06.12.2006
NL06.12.2006
SE06.03.2007
ES17.03.2007
PT07.05.2007
Former [2007/39]FI06.12.2006
NL06.12.2006
SE06.03.2007
ES17.03.2007
PT07.05.2007
Former [2007/37]FI06.12.2006
NL06.12.2006
SE06.03.2007
PT07.05.2007
Former [2007/28]FI06.12.2006
NL06.12.2006
SE06.03.2007
Former [2007/25]FI06.12.2006
SE06.03.2007
Cited inInternational search[X]US5135719  (HILLMAN ROBERT S [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7-10,17,20-26,30,32 * column 1, line 13 - column 1, line 15; figures 1,2 * * column 2, line 43 - column 2, line 45 * * column 5, line 23 - column 5, line 26 * * column 7, line 9 - column 8, line 56 *;
 [X]US4970052  (OBERHARDT BRUCE J [US], et al) [X] 1,7,9,10,13,14,16-18,25,30,33,34,37 * abstract *;
 [X]US4639316  (ELDEGHEIDY MOURAD M [US]) [X] 1,7,13,14,17,21,22,25,30,37 * column 3, line 9 - column 4, line 59; figures 1,2 *;
 [X]US4212742  (LYSAGHT MICHAEL J [US], et al) [X] 1,5,7,9-11,17,20-22,25,26,30,31 * column 5, line 67 - column 7, line 10; figures 1,6,7 * * column 8, line 34 *;
 [DX]EP0785012  (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [DX] 1,2,7,8,13,14,20,23-25,30,37 * figure 1; example 1 *;
 [A]US5135716  (THAKORE YATIN B [US]) [A] 5,7,31,32 * figure 1; claims 1,7,8 *