Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1315479

EP1315479 - PECTIN FILM COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  18.09.2015
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip13.05.2016Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: GR
published on 15.06.2016  [2016/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Capsugel Belgium NV
Rijksweg 11
2880 Bornem / BE
[2012/12]
Former [2007/08]For all designated states
Warner-Lambert Company LLC
235 East 42nd Street
New York, NY 10017 / US
Former [2006/46]For all designated states
Warner-Lambert Company LLC
201 Tabor Road Morris Plains
New Jersey 07950 / US
Former [2003/23]For all designated states
Warner-Lambert Company LLC
201 Tabor Road
Morris Plains, New Jersey 07950 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Scott, Robert
Königin Elisabethplein 26
bus 4
B-9100 Sint Niklaas / BE
02 / Cade, Dominique
11, rue des Américains
F-68000 Colmar / FR
03 / He, Xiongwei
3, rue du Jura
F-68280 Andolsheim / FR
 [2015/43]
Former [2003/23]01 / Scott, Robert
Königin Elisabethplein 26 bus 4
B-9100 Sint Niklaas / BE
02 / Cade, Dominique
11, rue des Américains
F-68000 Colmar / FR
03 / He, Xiongwei
3, rue du Jura
F-68280 Andolsheim / FR
Representative(s)Finnegan Europe LLP
1 London Bridge
London SE1 9BG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/43]Finnegan Europe LLP
16 Old Bailey
London EC4M 7EG / GB
Former [2011/36]Hyden, Martin Douglas , et al
FINNEGAN
Avenue Louise 326
Box 37
1050 Brussels / BE
Former [2009/20]Dekker, Henrike Cornelie Christine , et al
Pfizer Limited European Patent Department Ramsgate Road Sandwich
Kent CT13 9NJ / GB
Former [2006/38]Dekker, Henrike Cornelie Christine , et al
Pfizer European Pharma Patent Department 23-25, avenue du Docteur Lannelongue
75668 Paris Cedex 14 / FR
Former [2003/23]Tesch, Rudolf, Dr. , et al
Warner-Lambert Company LLC Patent Department c/o Gödecke GmbH
79090 Freiburg / DE
Application number, filing date01978285.321.08.2001
[2003/23]
WO2001EP09594
Priority number, dateEP2000040242301.09.2000         Original published format: EP 00402423
[2003/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0217886
Date:07.03.2002
Language:EN
[2002/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1315479
Date:04.06.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.2002
[2003/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1315479
Date:15.11.2006
Language:EN
[2006/46]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP1315479
Date:21.10.2015
Language:EN
[2015/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.03.2002
ClassificationInternational:A61K9/48, C08J5/18, C08L5/06, C08L3/08, C08L89/06
[2003/23]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2015/43]
Former [2003/23]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
Extension statesAL01.04.2003
LT01.04.2003
LV01.04.2003
MK01.04.2003
RO01.04.2003
SI01.04.2003
TitleGerman:FILMBILDENDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN AUS PEKTIN[2003/23]
English:PECTIN FILM COMPOSITIONS[2003/23]
French:COMPOSITIONS DE FILM DE PECTINE[2003/23]
Entry into regional phase01.04.2003National basic fee paid 
01.04.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
01.04.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.03.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
01.04.2003Examination requested  [2003/23]
11.11.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.07.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
07.09.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.03.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.08.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.12.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.05.2006Fee for grant paid
02.05.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  14.08.2007  24.08.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Cargill, Inc.
15407 McGinty Road West Wayzata
Minnesota, MN 55391-5624 / US
Opponent's representative
Wibbelmann, Jobst, et al
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2009/51]
Opponent(s)01  14.08.2007  24.08.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Cargill, Inc.
15407 McGinty Road West Wayzata
Minnesota, MN 55391-5624 / US
Opponent's representative
Wibbelmann, Jobst, et al
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
Former [2007/39]
Opponent(s)01  14.08.2007   
Cargill, Inc.
15407 McGinty Road West Wayzata
Minnesota, MN 55391-5624 / US
Opponent's representative
Wibbelmann, Jobst, et al
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
24.09.2007Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
21.03.2008Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
15.09.2011Date of oral proceedings
28.09.2011Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
28.09.2011Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
03.06.2015Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
02.07.2015Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
08.09.2015Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition07.12.2011Appeal received No.  T2538/11
06.02.2012Statement of grounds filed
03.06.2015Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected
Request for further processing for:06.09.2004Request for further processing filed
06.09.2004Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
18.10.2004Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
31.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
31.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
31.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipMC31.08.2007
AT21.08.2008
CY21.08.2008
FI21.08.2008
IE21.08.2008
LU21.08.2008
TR21.08.2008
SE22.08.2008
BE31.08.2008
CH31.08.2008
DK31.08.2008
LI31.08.2008
PT23.02.2009
NL01.03.2009
IT21.08.2015
[2016/24]
Former [2016/21]MC31.08.2007
AT21.08.2008
CY21.08.2008
FI21.08.2008
IE21.08.2008
LU21.08.2008
TR21.08.2008
SE22.08.2008
BE31.08.2008
CH31.08.2008
DK31.08.2008
LI31.08.2008
PT23.02.2009
NL01.03.2009
GR04.03.2009
IT21.08.2015
Former [2015/21]MC31.08.2007
AT21.08.2008
CY21.08.2008
FI21.08.2008
IE21.08.2008
LU21.08.2008
TR21.08.2008
SE22.08.2008
BE31.08.2008
CH31.08.2008
DK31.08.2008
LI31.08.2008
PT23.02.2009
NL01.03.2009
GR04.03.2009
Former [2011/32]MC31.08.2007
AT21.08.2008
CY21.08.2008
FI21.08.2008
IE21.08.2008
LU21.08.2008
SE22.08.2008
BE31.08.2008
CH31.08.2008
DK31.08.2008
LI31.08.2008
PT23.02.2009
NL01.03.2009
GR04.03.2009
Former [2010/32]IT21.08.2007
MC31.08.2007
AT21.08.2008
CY21.08.2008
FI21.08.2008
IE21.08.2008
LU21.08.2008
SE22.08.2008
BE31.08.2008
CH31.08.2008
DK31.08.2008
LI31.08.2008
PT23.02.2009
NL01.03.2009
GR04.03.2009
Former [2010/31]IT21.08.2007
MC31.08.2007
AT21.08.2008
CY21.08.2008
FI21.08.2008
IE21.08.2008
SE22.08.2008
BE31.08.2008
CH31.08.2008
DK31.08.2008
LI31.08.2008
PT23.02.2009
NL01.03.2009
GR04.03.2009
Former [2009/41]IT21.08.2007
MC31.08.2007
AT21.08.2008
CY21.08.2008
FI21.08.2008
IE21.08.2008
BE31.08.2008
CH31.08.2008
DK31.08.2008
LI31.08.2008
PT23.02.2009
NL01.03.2009
GR04.03.2009
Former [2009/34]MC31.08.2007
AT21.08.2008
CY21.08.2008
FI21.08.2008
IE21.08.2008
BE31.08.2008
CH31.08.2008
DK31.08.2008
LI31.08.2008
PT23.02.2009
NL01.03.2009
GR04.03.2009
Former [2009/32]MC31.08.2007
AT21.08.2008
CY21.08.2008
FI21.08.2008
BE31.08.2008
CH31.08.2008
LI31.08.2008
PT23.02.2009
NL01.03.2009
GR04.03.2009
Former [2009/30]MC31.08.2007
AT21.08.2008
FI21.08.2008
CH31.08.2008
LI31.08.2008
PT23.02.2009
NL01.03.2009
GR04.03.2009
Former [2009/28]MC31.08.2007
AT21.08.2008
FI21.08.2008
PT23.02.2009
NL01.03.2009
GR04.03.2009
Former [2009/25]MC31.08.2007
AT21.08.2008
FI21.08.2008
PT23.02.2009
NL01.03.2009
Former [2009/23]MC31.08.2007
AT21.08.2008
Former [2008/23]MC31.08.2007
Cited inInternational search[X]JPH0427352  ;
 [X]JPH0436159  ;
 [X]JPS58172313  ;
 [X]US5431917  (TAIZO YAMAMOTO ET AL.) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,9,14,15 * column 2, line 25 - column 4, line 33 *;
 [X]WO0018835  (WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY) [X] 1-5,8 * page 2, line 21 - page 6, line 8 *;
 [A]GB1559644  (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY) [A] * page 2, line 28 - line 30 *;
 [A]EP0888778  (SAMYANG CORPORATION) [A] * page 5, line 51 - line 52 *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920508), vol. 16, no. 190, Database accession no. (C - 937), & JP04027352 A 19921030 (FUJI KAPUSERU KK) [X] 1-16 * abstract *
    [ ] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1992, Database accession no. 1992-084752 [ ] * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920518), vol. 16, no. 207, Database accession no. (C - 941), & JP04036159 A 19920206 (FUJI KAPUSERU KK) [X] 1-16 * abstract *
    [ ] - FUKAZAWA TAKAYUKI ET AL., "Soft capsules containing royal jelly-cyclodextrin complex.", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19920608), vol. 116, no. 23, Database accession no. 234272 [ ] * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19841007), vol. 8, no. 3, Database accession no. (C - 203), & JP58172313 A 19831011 (MORISHITA JINTAN) [X] 1-16 * abstract *
    [ ] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1983, no. 46, Database accession no. 1983-818130 [ ] * abstract *
OppositionJPH0427352
 US5614217
    - Z. WAKERLY ET AL., "Pectin/Ethylcellulose Film Coating Formulations", PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH, (1996), vol. 13, no. 8, pages 1210 - 1212
    - M. ASHFORD ET AL., "Studies on pectin formulations for colonic drug delivery", JOURNAL OF CONTROLLED RELEASE, (1994), vol. 30, pages 225 - 232
    - Ullmanns Encyklopädie der technischen Chemie, WEINHEIM - DEERFIELD BEACH - BASEL, VERLAG CHEMIE, (1980), vol. 19, pages 237 - 244
    - S. COFFEY, Rodd's Chemistry of Carbon Compounds, AMSTERDAM - LONDON - NEW YORK, ELSEVIER PUBLISHING COMPANY, (1967), vol. 1, pages 690 - 691
    - Plasticizer - definition of plasticizer by the Free Online Dictionary, Thesaurusand Encyclopedia. Version of 01.07.2011, from http://www. thefreedictionary.com/plasticizer
    - L. LACHMAN PHD. ET AL, The Theory and Practice of Industrial Pharmacy, PHILADELPHIA, LEA & FEBIGER, (1986), vol. 3, pages 374 - 412