Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1315479 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1315479



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 761
24.09.2015 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
24.09.2015 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
21.09.2015 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
08.09.2015 French translation of claims Opposition 2
08.09.2015 German translation of the claims Opposition 2
08.09.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
02.07.2015 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 2
02.07.2015 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 2
02.07.2015 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 3
25.06.2015 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 2
19.06.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
12.06.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
11.06.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
10.06.2015 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 22
10.06.2015 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
10.06.2015 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
01.06.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 3
27.05.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
26.05.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
22.05.2015 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
22.05.2015 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
07.04.2015 Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents Appeal 1
07.04.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.03.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Appeal 1
26.03.2015 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 1
03.03.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
26.02.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
26.02.2015 Claims Appeal 7
26.02.2015 Claims Appeal 6
26.02.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
26.02.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
25.11.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.11.2014 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
18.11.2014 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 2
14.11.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.11.2014 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
04.11.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
04.11.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
04.11.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
25.10.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
22.10.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
21.10.2014 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 4
16.10.2014 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
25.09.2014 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
03.02.2014 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
22.02.2013 F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal Appeal 2
02.01.2013 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
16.02.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
16.02.2012 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
13.02.2012 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
06.02.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
06.02.2012 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding review procedure Appeal 5
06.02.2012 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding review procedure Appeal 6
06.02.2012 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding review procedure Appeal 7
06.02.2012 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding review procedure Appeal 20
06.02.2012 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding review procedure Appeal 41
06.02.2012 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding review procedure Appeal 6
06.02.2012 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding review procedure Appeal 4
06.02.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
06.02.2012 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 20
31.01.2012 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
19.12.2011 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
13.12.2011 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
07.12.2011 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
11.10.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
05.10.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
28.09.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
28.09.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
28.09.2011 Annex Opposition 19
28.09.2011 Annex Opposition 10
28.09.2011 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 8
28.09.2011 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
28.09.2011 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 6
28.09.2011 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 14
28.09.2011 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
28.09.2011 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
28.09.2011 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
28.09.2011 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
28.09.2011 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
28.09.2011 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
28.09.2011 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
19.09.2011 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 18
31.08.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.08.2011 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
05.08.2011 Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order Search / examination 1
21.07.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.07.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.07.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
13.07.2011 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 7
13.07.2011 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 9
13.07.2011 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 7
13.07.2011 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
13.07.2011 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
13.07.2011 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
13.07.2011 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
13.07.2011 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
13.07.2011 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
13.07.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 13
13.07.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
13.07.2011 Main request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
13.07.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
13.07.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
13.07.2011 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 2
20.12.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
15.12.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
15.12.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
15.12.2010 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.12.2010 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.12.2010 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 7
08.12.2010 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
12.11.2009 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
16.04.2009 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
06.02.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.01.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 12
30.01.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
30.01.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
30.01.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
30.01.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
02.04.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.03.2008 Claims Opposition 2
25.03.2008 Claims Opposition 2
25.03.2008 Claims Opposition 3
25.03.2008 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Opposition 6
25.03.2008 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 23
21.03.2008 Claims Opposition 3
21.03.2008 Claims Opposition 2
21.03.2008 Claims Opposition 2
21.03.2008 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Opposition 6
21.03.2008 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 23
01.02.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.02.2008 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
25.01.2008 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
22.01.2008 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
24.09.2007 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
24.09.2007 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
28.08.2007 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
14.08.2007 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 9
14.08.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.08.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
14.08.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
14.08.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
18.01.2007 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Opposition 1
08.01.2007 Request for change of address Opposition 2
19.10.2006 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
21.08.2006 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
12.08.2006 Request for change of representative Search / examination 2
09.08.2006 Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure Search / examination 2
09.08.2006 Request for change of representative Search / examination 2
12.04.2006 Claims Search / examination 1
12.04.2006 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
12.04.2006 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
12.04.2006 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
11.04.2006 Reply to communication about intention to grant Search / examination 6
22.12.2005 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
22.12.2005 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
22.12.2005 Text intended for grant Search / examination 12
07.12.2005 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
03.08.2005 Claims Search / examination 2
03.08.2005 Description Search / examination 9
03.08.2005 Drawings Search / examination 1
03.08.2005 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
02.08.2005 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 13
02.08.2005 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 14
24.03.2005 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
24.03.2005 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
27.10.2004 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
18.10.2004 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
07.09.2004 Claims Search / examination 2
07.09.2004 Description Search / examination 17
07.09.2004 Request for further processing Search / examination 5
06.09.2004 Request for further processing Search / examination 7
05.07.2004 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
23.03.2004 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
12.03.2004 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
10.03.2004 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
11.11.2003 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
11.11.2003 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
24.04.2003 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
22.04.2003 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
15.04.2003 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
15.04.2003 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
15.04.2003 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
10.03.2003 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
09.03.2003 Notification of the recording of a change PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
19.02.2003 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
19.02.2003 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
10.01.2003 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
02.10.2002 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 2
11.07.2002 International preliminary examination report - Automated PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
11.07.2002 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
11.07.2002 Refund of fees PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
11.07.2002 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
16.05.2002 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
17.04.2002 Written opinion - Automated PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
22.03.2002 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
22.03.2002 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
13.03.2002 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
11.03.2002 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 18
07.03.2002 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
07.03.2002 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 12
08.11.2001 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
08.11.2001 Claims International Searching Authority 2
08.11.2001 Description International Searching Authority 8
08.11.2001 Drawings International Searching Authority 1
21.08.2001 General authorisation Search / examination 2