Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1317668

EP1317668 - METHOD FOR THE PYROLYSIS OF MERCURIC CHLORIDE FOR THE SUBSEQUENT ANALYSIS OF THE MERCURY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.08.2005
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 16.01.2008  [2008/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Forschungszentrum Karlsruhe GmbH
Herrmann-von-Helmholtz-Platz 1
76344 Eggenstein-Leopoldshafen / DE
[2005/13]
Former [2003/24]For all designated states
Seefelder Messtechnik Gmbh & Co, Vertriebs KG
Mühlbachstr.20
82229 Seefeld / DE
For all designated states
Forschungszentrum Karlsruhe GmbH
Herrmann-von-Helmholtz-Platz 1
76344 Eggenstein-Leopoldshafen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / WINKLER, Wilfried, M.
Stauchartinger Weg 2
82041 Oberbiberg / DE
02 / BERKHAHN, Wolfgang
Magnolienweg 1
88662 Überlingen / DE
03 / SCHRADER, Christoph
Potsdamer Ring 28
76344 Eggenstein-Leopoldshafen / DE
04 / PAUR, Hanns, Rudolf
Lauenburger Str. 84
76139 Karlsruhe / DE
 [2003/35]
Former [2003/24]01 / WINKLER, Wilfried, M.
Stauchartinger Weg 2
82041 Oberbiberg / DE
02 / BERKHAHN, Wolfgang
Magnolienweg 1
88662 Überlingen / DE
03 / SCHRADER, Christoph
Potsdamer Ring 28
76344 Eggenstein / DE
04 / PAUR, Hanns, Rudolf
Lauenburger Str. 84
76139 Karlsruhe / DE
Representative(s)Müller, Bernhard
Breuer & Müller Partnerschaft
Patentanwälte
Graf-Toerring-Strasse 45
82229 Seefeld / DE
[N/P]
Former [2005/13]Müller, Bernhard
Breuer & Müller Partnerschaft Patentanwälte Graf-Toerring-Strasse 45
82229 Seefeld / DE
Former [2003/24]Müller, Bernhard, Dr. H. Schmidt & B. Müller Patentanwälte
Graf-Toerring-Strasse 45
82229 Seefeld / DE
Application number, filing date01978361.212.09.2001
[2003/24]
WO2001EP10535
Priority number, dateDE200014521213.09.2000         Original published format: DE 10045212
[2003/24]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0223182
Date:21.03.2002
Language:DE
[2002/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1317668
Date:11.06.2003
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.03.2002
[2003/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1317668
Date:06.10.2004
Language:DE
[2004/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.03.2002
ClassificationInternational:G01N31/10, B01J23/755, B01D53/86
[2003/24]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/24]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR PYROLYSE VON QUECKSILBER(II)CHLORID ZUR ANSCHLIESSENDEN BESTIMMUNG DES QUECKSILBERS[2003/24]
English:METHOD FOR THE PYROLYSIS OF MERCURIC CHLORIDE FOR THE SUBSEQUENT ANALYSIS OF THE MERCURY[2003/24]
French:PROCEDE POUR LA PYROLYSE DE CHLORURE MERCURIQUE POUR LE DOSAGE CONSECUTIF DU MERCURE[2003/24]
Entry into regional phase22.01.2003National basic fee paid 
22.01.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
22.01.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.04.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
22.01.2003Examination requested  [2003/24]
23.04.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.07.2004Fee for grant paid
01.07.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.07.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
24.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB06.10.2004
IE06.10.2004
IT06.10.2004
TR06.10.2004
GR06.01.2005
ES17.01.2005
PT06.03.2005
[2008/03]
Former [2007/37]GB06.10.2004
IE06.10.2004
IT06.10.2004
TR06.10.2004
GR06.01.2005
ES17.01.2005
Former [2006/52]GB06.10.2004
IE06.10.2004
TR06.10.2004
GR06.01.2005
ES17.01.2005
Former [2006/13]GB06.10.2004
IE06.10.2004
GR06.01.2005
ES17.01.2005
Former [2005/46]IE06.10.2004
GR06.01.2005
ES17.01.2005
Former [2005/27]GR06.01.2005
ES17.01.2005
Former [2005/26]GR06.01.2005
Cited inInternational search[A]US4758519  (NAKAO SHOZO [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * column 2, line 52 - line 68 * * column 3, line 1 - line 13 *;
 [A]DE3931891  (NARVA VEB [DE]) [A] 1-5 * column 1, line 61 - column 2, line 12 *;
 [A]DE4143170  (SEEFELDER MESSTECHNIK GMBH & C [DE]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 58 - line 63 * * column 3, line 3 - line 17 *