blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1368594 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1368594



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1122
13.07.2017 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
07.07.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
06.07.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
30.06.2017 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 18
30.06.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
30.06.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
06.04.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
06.04.2017 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
06.04.2017 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
06.04.2017 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 3
30.03.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.03.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
26.03.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
26.03.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
26.03.2017 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Opposition 2
26.03.2017 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Opposition 39
07.03.2017 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
07.03.2017 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
07.03.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.03.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
03.03.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.03.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
02.03.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
02.03.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
02.03.2017 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
02.03.2017 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
28.02.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
28.02.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
28.02.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
28.02.2017 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
28.02.2017 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 25
28.02.2017 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 5
27.02.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
27.02.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
27.02.2017 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
03.02.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
03.01.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
29.12.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
29.12.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
16.12.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
16.12.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
16.12.2016 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 7
13.12.2016 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
10.07.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.07.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
07.07.2014 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 5
07.07.2014 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 41
07.07.2014 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 8
07.07.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
07.07.2014 Reply to appeal Appeal 22
12.03.2014 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
12.03.2014 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
12.03.2014 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
12.03.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.02.2014 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 15
16.01.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
16.01.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
19.12.2013 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
19.12.2013 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
18.12.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
18.12.2013 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
18.12.2013 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
18.12.2013 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
18.12.2013 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
06.11.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
04.11.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
25.10.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.10.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.10.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
08.10.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
08.10.2013 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 3
08.10.2013 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
08.10.2013 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
08.10.2013 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 7
08.10.2013 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
08.10.2013 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
08.10.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
08.10.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
08.10.2013 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
01.10.2013 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
16.09.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.09.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
16.09.2013 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
13.09.2013 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 1
10.09.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
10.09.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
10.09.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
05.09.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.08.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
30.08.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
30.08.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
30.08.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
30.08.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
22.08.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.08.2013 Claims Opposition 1
20.08.2013 Claims Opposition 1
20.08.2013 Claims Opposition 1
20.08.2013 Claims Opposition 1
20.08.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
20.08.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Opposition 1
20.08.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Opposition 13
16.08.2013 Claims Opposition 1
16.08.2013 Claims Opposition 1
16.08.2013 Claims Opposition 1
16.08.2013 Claims Opposition 1
16.08.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
16.08.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
16.08.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
22.07.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.07.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
05.07.2013 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
05.07.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
04.07.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.06.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.06.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
20.06.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
20.06.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 15
20.06.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
20.06.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
20.06.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
20.06.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 112
20.06.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
20.06.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
20.06.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
20.06.2013 Non-scannable object Opposition 3
20.06.2013 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
20.06.2013 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
20.06.2013 Non-scannable object Opposition 6
20.06.2013 Non-scannable object Opposition 3
20.06.2013 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
20.06.2013 Non-scannable object Opposition 6
20.06.2013 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.06.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
19.06.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
19.06.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
19.06.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
19.06.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
19.06.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
19.06.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
19.06.2013 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 15
01.06.2013 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
09.04.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
28.03.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
27.03.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
19.03.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
19.03.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
19.03.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
15.03.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
15.03.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
15.03.2013 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 3
15.03.2013 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
15.03.2013 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
15.03.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.03.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
12.03.2013 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.07.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.07.2012 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 7
18.07.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
18.07.2012 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 7
13.03.2012 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
13.03.2012 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
14.02.2012 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
03.02.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
03.02.2012 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 2
03.02.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
03.02.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
03.02.2012 Notice of opposition Opposition 23
03.02.2012 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
03.02.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
03.02.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 29
03.02.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
03.02.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
03.02.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
03.02.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
03.02.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
07.04.2011 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
18.03.2011 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
18.03.2011 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
18.03.2011 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
02.12.2010 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
02.12.2010 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
02.12.2010 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
02.12.2010 Text intended for grant Search / examination 31
30.09.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
30.09.2010 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 4
30.09.2010 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
29.09.2010 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
14.09.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
14.09.2010 Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) Search / examination 1
14.09.2010 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
14.09.2010 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
08.09.2010 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 1
06.09.2010 Communication concerning signing of documents Search / examination 1
06.09.2010 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 1
06.09.2010 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 1
02.09.2010 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 1
02.09.2010 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 1
26.08.2010 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
23.08.2010 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
20.08.2010 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 1
11.08.2010 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
11.08.2010 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 12
10.08.2010 Cover sheet for fax transmission Search / examination 1
10.08.2010 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
10.08.2010 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 1
10.08.2010 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 12
09.08.2010 Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order Search / examination 1
09.08.2010 Cover sheet for fax transmission Search / examination 1
09.08.2010 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
09.08.2010 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
09.08.2010 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 12
04.08.2010 Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure Search / examination 1
21.07.2010 Notification of termination of representative's authorisation Search / examination 2
12.07.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
12.07.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
12.07.2010 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
30.04.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 2
20.04.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
20.04.2010 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
30.03.2010 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
06.12.2007 Claims Search / examination 6
06.12.2007 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
04.12.2007 Claims Search / examination 6
04.12.2007 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
12.11.2007 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
12.11.2007 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
06.03.2007 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 13
11.12.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
11.12.2006 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
05.07.2006 Claims Search / examination 3
05.07.2006 Claims Search / examination 3
05.07.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
19.06.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
19.06.2006 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
02.03.2006 Claims Search / examination 3
02.03.2006 Claims Search / examination 3
02.03.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
06.02.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
06.02.2006 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
02.11.2005 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
02.11.2005 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
02.11.2005 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
04.08.2005 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
04.08.2005 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
30.08.2004 Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order Search / examination 1
29.10.2003 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
21.10.2003 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
17.10.2003 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
17.07.2003 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
17.07.2003 Claims Search / examination 4
17.07.2003 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
11.07.2003 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
10.09.2002 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 15
10.09.2002 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 15
06.09.2002 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
06.09.2002 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 32
05.09.2002 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
05.09.2002 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 32
27.11.2001 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 1
15.11.2001 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
15.11.2001 Claims International Searching Authority 5
15.11.2001 Description International Searching Authority 17
15.11.2001 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 1
15.11.2001 Drawings International Searching Authority 8