Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1340756

EP1340756 - NOVEL BETA-LACTAM COMPOUNDS AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2003/36]NOVEL BETA-LACTAM COMPOUNDS AND PROECSS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME
[2007/35]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.08.2008
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip01.02.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 06.03.2013  [2013/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dainippon Sumitomo Pharma Co., Ltd.
6-8, Dosho-machi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka-fu / JP
[2006/02]
Former [2003/36]For all designated states
Sumitomo Pharmaceuticals Company, Limited
2-8, Doshomachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-8510 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / SUNAGAWA, Makoto
5-2-4-303, Nomakita
Itami-shi, Hyogo 664-0875 / JP
02 / KUBOTA, Katsumi
100-2G Morningside Drive
New York, NY 10027 / US
03 / ITOH, Masanori
3-7-A36-301, Shinsenrihigashi-machi
Toyonaka-shi, Osaka 560-0082 / JP
04 / GOETSCHI, Erwin
Landhofweg 23
CH-4153 Reinach / CH
 [2003/36]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [2003/36]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date01979010.406.11.2001
[2003/36]
WO2001JP09664
Priority number, dateJP2000034106308.11.2000         Original published format: JP 2000341063
JP2001012629624.04.2001         Original published format: JP 2001126296
JP2001027361510.09.2001         Original published format: JP 2001273615
[2003/36]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0238564
Date:16.05.2002
Language:EN
[2002/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1340756
Date:03.09.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.05.2002
[2003/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1340756
Date:10.10.2007
Language:EN
[2007/41]
Search report(s)International search reportJP16.05.2002
(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP25.06.2004
ClassificationInternational:C07D477/20, A61K31/427, A61K31/4545, A61P31/04
[2003/36]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/36]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:NEUE BETA-LACTAMVERBINDUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG[2003/36]
English:NOVEL BETA-LACTAM COMPOUNDS AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME[2007/35]
French:NOUVEAUX COMPOSES DE BETA-LACTAME ET LEUR PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION[2003/36]
Former [2003/36]NOVEL BETA-LACTAM COMPOUNDS AND PROECSS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME
Entry into regional phase07.05.2003Translation filed 
05.06.2003National basic fee paid 
05.06.2003Search fee paid 
05.06.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
05.06.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.03.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
05.06.2003Examination requested  [2003/36]
31.05.2005Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.09.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.01.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.02.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.06.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.02.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.06.2007Fee for grant paid
29.06.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)11.07.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
29.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
30.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
Former [2009/42]TR10.10.2007
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0934942  (SUMITOMO PHARMA [JP]) [X] 1-11 * Compounds 1-21, examples 1-2, claims *;
 [X]EP0704446  (SUMITOMO PHARMA [JP]) [X] 1 * cf. ex. 50-b) *
International search[X]WO9809965  (SUMITOMO PHARMA [JP], et al)