blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1318821

EP1318821 - FLUID FOR HAEMOFILTRATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  04.12.2015
Database last updated on 17.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip08.01.2016Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 10.02.2016  [2016/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dieze Delta B.V.
Onderwijsboulevard 219
5223 DE 's-Hertogenbosch / NL
[2009/09]
Former [2008/23]For all designated states
Hollander, Adrianus Antonius Marcus Johannes
Zonnebos 16
5263 EX Vught / NL
Former [2003/25]For all designated states
Hollander, Adrianus Atonius Marcus Johannes
Zonnebos 16
5263 EX Vught / NL
Inventor(s)01 / Hollander, Adrianus Antonius Marcus Johannes
Zonnebos 16
5263 EX Vught / NL
 [2009/09]
Former [2003/25]01 / see applicant
...
Representative(s)Nederlandsch Octrooibureau
P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS The Hague / NL
[2013/28]
Former [2011/46]de Boer, Henricus J.R., et al
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Postbus 29720
2502 LS Den Haag / NL
Former [2009/47]Kingma, Roelofke Leentje, et al
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O.Box 29720
2502 LS The Hague / NL
Former [2009/46]Kingma, Roelofke Leentje
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Bennekomseweg 43
6717 LL Ede / NL
Former [2009/09]Van den Heuvel, Henricus Theodorus, et al
Patentwerk BV P.O. Box 1514
5200 BN 's-Hertogenbosch / NL
Former [2003/25]Jorritsma, Ruurd, et al
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Scheveningseweg 82 P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date01979074.021.09.2001
[2003/25]
WO2001NL00698
Priority number, dateNL2000101623521.09.2000         Original published format: NL 1016235
[2003/25]
Filing languageNL
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO0224209
Date:28.03.2002
Language:EN
[2002/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1318821
Date:18.06.2003
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.03.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2003/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1318821
Date:04.06.2008
Language:EN
[2008/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.03.2002
ClassificationIPC:A61K33/14, A61P13/12
[2003/25]
CPC:
A61K33/00 (EP,US); A61K31/194 (EP,US); A61K31/7004 (EP,US);
A61K33/06 (EP,US); A61K33/14 (EP,US); A61P13/12 (EP)
C-Set:
A61K31/194, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/7004, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K33/00, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K33/06, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K33/14, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
(-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/25]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:FLÜSSIGKEIT FÜR DIE HÄMOFILTRATION[2003/25]
English:FLUID FOR HAEMOFILTRATION[2003/25]
French:LIQUIDE POUR HEMOFILTRATION[2003/25]
Entry into regional phase21.09.2001Translation filed 
03.04.2003National basic fee paid 
03.04.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
03.04.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.04.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
03.04.2003Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.04.2003Examination requested  [2003/25]
27.10.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.03.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.07.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.01.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
21.03.2008Fee for grant paid
21.03.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  03.03.2009  12.03.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Gambro Lundia AB
P.O.Box 10101
220 10 Lund / SE
Opponent's representative
Simons, Amanda Louise, et al, et al
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
 02  03.03.2009  12.03.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Fresenius Medical Care Deutschland GmbH
Else-Kröner-Strasse 1
61352 Bad Homburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Nordmeyer, Philipp Werner, et al, et al
df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Theatinerstraße 16
80333 München / DE
 03  04.03.2009  16.04.2009  ADMISSIBLE
B. Braun Melsungen AG
Carl-Braun-Str.1
34212 Melsungen / DE
Opponent's representative
Arth, Hans-Lothar, et al, et al
ABK Patent & Trademark Attorneys
Jasminweg 9
14052 Berlin / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2015/16]
Opponent(s)01  03.03.2009  12.03.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Gambro Lundia AB
P.O.Box 10101
220 10 Lund / SE
Opponent's representative
Simons, Amanda Louise, et al, et al
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
 02  03.03.2009  12.03.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Fresenius Medical Care Deutschland GmbH
Else-Kröner-Strasse 1
61352 Bad Homburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Nordmeyer, Philipp Werner, et al, et al
df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Theatinerstraße 16
80333 München / DE
 03  04.03.2009  16.04.2009  ADMISSIBLE
B. Braun Melsungen AG
Carl-Braun-Str.1
34212 Melsungen / DE
Opponent's representative
Arth, Hans-Lothar, et al, et al
ABK Patent & Trademark Attorneys
Jasminweg 9
14052 Berlin / DE
Former [2014/10]
Opponent(s)01  03.03.2009  12.03.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Gambro Lundia AB
P.O.Box 10101
220 10 Lund / SE
Opponent's representative
Simons, Amanda Louise, et al, et al
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
 02  03.03.2009  12.03.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Fresenius Medical Care Deutschland GmbH
Else-Kröner-Strasse 1
61352 Bad Homburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Molnia, David, et al, et al
df-mp
Fünf Höfe
Theatinerstrasse 16
80333 München / DE
 03  04.03.2009  16.04.2009  ADMISSIBLE
B. Braun Melsungen AG
Carl-Braun-Str.1
34212 Melsungen / DE
Opponent's representative
Arth, Hans-Lothar, et al, et al
ABK Patent & Trademark Attorneys
Jasminweg 9
14052 Berlin / DE
Former [2011/38]
Opponent(s)01  03.03.2009  12.03.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Gambro Lundia AB
P.O.Box 10101
220 10 Lund / SE
Opponent's representative
McCluskie, Gail Wilson, et al, et al
J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
 02  03.03.2009  12.03.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Fresenius Medical Care Deutschland GmbH
Else-Kröner-Strasse 1
61352 Bad Homburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Molnia, David, et al, et al
df-mp Fünf Höfe Theatinerstrasse 16
80333 München / DE
 03  04.03.2009  16.04.2009  ADMISSIBLE
B. Braun Melsungen AG
Carl-Braun-Str.1
34212 Melsungen / DE
Opponent's representative
Arth, Hans-Lothar, et al, et al
ABK Patent & Trademark Attorneys
Jasminweg 9
D-14052 Berlin / DE
Former [2009/16]
Opponent(s)01  03.03.2009  12.03.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Gambro Lundia AB
P.O.Box 10101
220 10 Lund / SE
Opponent's representative
McCluskie, Gail Wilson, et al, et al
J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
 02  03.03.2009  12.03.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Fresenius Medical Care Deutschland GmbH
Else-Kröner-Strasse 1
61352 Bad Homburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Molnia, David, et al, et al
df-mp Fünf Höfe Theatinerstrasse 16
80333 München / DE
 03  04.03.2009   
B. Braun Melsungen AG
Carl-Braun-Str.1
34212 Melsungen / DE
Former [2009/15]
Opponent(s)01  03.03.2009   
Gambro Lundia AB
P.O.Box 10101
220 10 Lund / SE
Opponent's representative
McCluskie, Gail Wilson, et al, et al
J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
 02  03.03.2009   
Fresenius Medical Care Deutschland GmbH
Else-Kröner-Strasse 1
61352 Bad Homburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Molnia, David, et al, et al
df-mp Fünf Höfe Theatinerstrasse 16
80333 München / DE
07.05.2009Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
21.12.2009Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
15.12.2011Date of oral proceedings
22.12.2011Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
27.01.2012Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
13.10.2015Legal effect of revocation of patent [2016/01]
Appeal following opposition27.03.2012Appeal received No.  T0677/12
06.06.2012Statement of grounds filed
13.10.2015Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected
13.10.2015Date of oral proceedings
19.10.2015Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent
21.03.2008Request for further processing filed
21.03.2008Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
15.04.2008Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
30.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
29.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
31.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
31.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH04.06.2008
LI04.06.2008
[2016/06]
Cited inInternational search[X]DE4122754  (VLAHO MARTIN PROF DR MED [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,5,8-10,13-15 * claim 1 *;
 [X]  - C.J.OLBRIGHT, "Substitutionslösungen zur kontinuierlichen Hämofiltration", INTENSIVMEDIZIN UND NOTFALLMEDIZIN, (1995), vol. 32, no. 3, pages 194-194 - 198, XP001002227 [X] 1,2,4,5,8-10,13-15 * page 194 * * page 195, column 2 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.