Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1332456

EP1332456 - COMPUTERIZED INTERFACE FOR CONSTRUCTING AND EXECUTING COMPUTERIZED TRANSACTION PROCESSES AND PROGRAMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  12.01.2007
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip12.01.2007Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 14.02.2007  [2007/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Goldman, Sachs & Co.
85 Broad Street
New York, NY 10004 / US
[2003/32]
Inventor(s)01 / OTERO, Hernan, G.
20 Briarcliff Pl.
Huntington, NY 11743 / US
02 / HORN, Steven, B.
29 The Hemlocks
Roslyn Estates, NY 11576 / US
03 / TUMILTY, John
105 Duane Street, Apt. 22B
New York, NY 10007 / US
 [2003/43]
Former [2003/32]01 / OTERO, Hernan, G.
20 Briarcliff Pl.
Huntington, NY 11743 / US
02 / HORN, Steven, B.
315 E. 65th Street 7L
New York, NY 10021 / US
03 / TUMILTY, John
105 Duane Street, Apt. 22B
New York, NY 10007 / US
Representative(s)Finnie, Peter John
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/32]Finnie, Peter John
Gill Jennings & Every, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date01979556.609.10.2001
[2003/32]
WO2001US31378
Priority number, dateUS20000241807P14.10.2000         Original published format: US 241807 P
US2001077313931.01.2001         Original published format: US 773139
US2001082312530.03.2001         Original published format: US 823125
US2001087268731.05.2001         Original published format: US 872687
[2003/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0233621
Date:25.04.2002
Language:EN
[2002/17]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1332456
Date:06.08.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.04.2002
[2003/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US25.04.2002
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/60
[2003/32]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/32]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:COMPUTERISIERTE SCHNITTSTELLE ZUR KONSTRUKTION UND AUSFÜHRUNG COMPUTERISIERTER TRANSAKTIONSPROZESSE UND -PROGRAMME[2003/32]
English:COMPUTERIZED INTERFACE FOR CONSTRUCTING AND EXECUTING COMPUTERIZED TRANSACTION PROCESSES AND PROGRAMS[2003/32]
French:INTERFACE INFORMATISEE DESTINEE A LA CONSTRUCTION ET A L'EXECUTION DE PROGRAMMES ET DE PROCESSUS DE TRANSACTIONS INFORMATISEES[2003/32]
Entry into regional phase29.04.2003National basic fee paid 
29.04.2003Search fee paid 
29.04.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
29.04.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.04.2003Examination requested  [2003/32]
09.01.2007Application withdrawn by applicant  [2007/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
14.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
12.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200606   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[Y]US6119104  ;
 [Y]US6026440  ;
 [A]US5434395