Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1328889 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1328889



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 388
26.02.2008 Closing of application Search / examination 2
26.11.2007 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
15.11.2007 Annex to a communication Search / examination 2
15.11.2007 Annex to a communication Search / examination 2
15.11.2007 Annex to the communication Search / examination 7
15.11.2007 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
15.11.2007 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
15.11.2007 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 11
15.11.2007 Means of redress Search / examination 1
15.11.2007 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
15.11.2007 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
15.11.2007 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
23.08.2007 Claims Search / examination 3
23.08.2007 Claims Search / examination 1
23.08.2007 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 5
21.08.2007 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
21.08.2007 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 1
20.08.2007 Claims Search / examination 1
20.08.2007 Claims Search / examination 3
20.08.2007 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
20.08.2007 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 5
14.06.2007 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
05.06.2007 Annex to the communication Search / examination 6
05.06.2007 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
24.05.2007 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
02.03.2006 Claims Search / examination 4
02.03.2006 Claims Search / examination 4
02.03.2006 Claims Search / examination 1
02.03.2006 Description Search / examination 1
02.03.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
27.02.2006 Claims Search / examination 1
27.02.2006 Claims Search / examination 4
27.02.2006 Claims Search / examination 4
27.02.2006 Description Search / examination 1
27.02.2006 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
27.02.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
19.12.2005 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
12.12.2005 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
13.10.2005 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
22.09.2005 Request for change of address Search / examination 1
17.08.2005 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
17.08.2005 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
30.06.2005 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
22.04.2005 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
20.04.2005 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
20.04.2005 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
24.03.2005 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 1
24.03.2005 Corrected international publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 41
24.03.2005 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
25.02.2005 Communication in cases for which no other form is applicable Search / examination 1
20.12.2004 General enquiry Search / examination 1
14.11.2003 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 4
13.08.2003 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
31.07.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
31.07.2003 Enquiry with the International Bureau Search / examination 6
03.07.2003 Request for assignment Search / examination 9
12.06.2003 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
28.05.2003 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
23.05.2003 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
23.05.2003 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
23.05.2003 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
23.05.2003 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
20.05.2003 Enquiry with the International Bureau Search / examination 1
08.05.2003 Claims Search / examination 5
08.05.2003 Drawings Search / examination 4
08.05.2003 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
08.05.2003 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
07.05.2003 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 19
21.02.2003 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
15.07.2002 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
10.07.2002 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
10.07.2002 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
10.07.2002 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
08.07.2002 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
25.04.2002 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
23.04.2002 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 122
18.04.2002 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 1
18.04.2002 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 40