Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1315420

EP1315420 - HERBICIDE MIXTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.03.2007
Database last updated on 15.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.12.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 14.01.2009  [2009/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BASF Aktiengesellschaft
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67063 Ludwigshafen / DE
[2008/31]
Former [2006/21]For all designated states
BASF Aktiengesellschaft
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Former [2003/23]For all designated states
BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / ZAGAR, Cyrill
Untere Clignetstrasse 8
68167 Mannheim / DE
02 / NUYKEN, Wessel
Keltenstr. 1
67166 Otterstadt / DE
03 / SCHMIDT, Oskar
Greifengasse 15
67105 Schifferstadt / DE
04 / JÄGER, Karl-Friedrich
Weinbietstr. 18
67117 Limburgerhof / DE
05 / WESTPHALEN, Karl-Otto
Zum Pfauenturm 17
67346 Speyer / DE
 [2003/23]
Application number, filing date01980303.030.08.2001
[2003/23]
WO2001EP09999
Priority number, dateDE200014312131.08.2000         Original published format: DE 10043121
[2003/23]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0217719
Date:07.03.2002
Language:DE
[2002/10]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1315420
Date:04.06.2003
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.2002
[2003/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1315420
Date:24.05.2006
Language:DE
[2006/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.05.2002
ClassificationInternational:A01N47/36, // (A01N47/36, 47:36, 41:10)
[2006/21]
Former International [2003/23]A01N47/36, // (A01N47/36, 47:38, 47:36, 43:90, 43:653, 43:56, 41:10, 37:38), A01N37:20
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/23]
Extension statesAL31.03.2003
LT31.03.2003
LV31.03.2003
MK31.03.2003
RO31.03.2003
SI31.03.2003
TitleGerman:HERBIZIDE MISCHUNGEN[2003/23]
English:HERBICIDE MIXTURES[2003/23]
French:MELANGES HERBICIDES[2003/23]
Entry into regional phase31.03.2003National basic fee paid 
31.03.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
31.03.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.03.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
31.03.2003Examination requested  [2003/23]
24.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.11.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.01.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.08.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.10.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.02.2006Fee for grant paid
28.02.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP06110045.9  / EP1661459
EP07109418.9  / EP1817958
Opposition(s)27.02.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
31.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
31.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY24.05.2006
TR24.05.2006
GR25.08.2006
MC31.08.2006
[2009/03]
Former [2008/38]TR24.05.2006
GR25.08.2006
MC31.08.2006
Former [2008/20]GR25.08.2006
MC31.08.2006
Former [2007/45]MC31.08.2006
Former [2007/37]IT24.05.2006
MC31.08.2006
Former [2007/19]MC31.08.2006
Cited inInternational search[A]WO0008932  (HOECHST SCHERING AGREVO GMBH [DE]) [A] * page 29 - page 32 *;
 [A]WO0008936  (HOECHST SCHERING AGREVO GMBH [DE]) [A] * table 15 *;
 [A]WO0003591  (HOECHST SCHERING AGREVO GMBH [DE]) [A] * table 13 *;
 [A]WO0003592  (HOECHST SCHERING AGREVO GMBH [DE]) [A] * page 27 *;
 [PX]WO0135741  (BAYER AG [DE], et al) [PX] 1-22 * claim 1 *;
 [PX]WO0137652  (BAYER AG [DE], et al) [PX] 1-22 * claim 1 *