Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1320594

EP1320594 - EXBB-EXBD-TONB GENE CLUSTER OF PSEUDOMONAS PUTIDA DOT-T1E CONFERRING TOLERANCE TO AROMATIC COMPOUNDS AND RESISTANCE TO ANTIBIOTICS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  27.08.2005
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.08.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 12.10.2005  [2005/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NORTH CAROLINA STATE UNIVERSITY
1 Holladay Hall Raleigh
North Carolina 27695 / US
[N/P]
Former [2004/15]For all designated states
North Carolina State University
1 Holladay Hall
Raleigh North Carolina 27695 / US
Former [2003/44]For all designated states
North Carolina State University
2401 Research Drive, Campus Box 8210
Raleigh, NC 27695-8210 / US
Former [2003/26]For all designated states
E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY
1007 Market Street
Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US
Inventor(s)01 / RAMOS, Juan, L.
Calle Los Rosales No.6 , Pinos Genil
E-18191 Granada / ES
02 / BEN-BASSAT, Arie
49 West Periwinkle Lane
Newark, DE 19711 / US
03 / GODOY, Patricia, E.I. duPont de Nemours and Co.
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19805 / US
04 / RAMOS-GONZALES, M., Isabel
C/Castaneda No. 18, 2 Isda
18009 Granada / ES
05 / DUQUE, Estrella, E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Co.
10007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19898 / US
 [2003/34]
Former [2003/32]01 / RAMOS, Juan, L.
Los Rosales No.6, Pinos Genil
E-18191 Granada / ES
02 / BEN-BASSAT, Arie
49 West Periwinkle Lane
Newark, DE 19711 / US
03 / GODOY, Patricia, E.I. duPont de Nemours and Co.
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19805 / US
04 / RAMOS-GONZALES, M., Isabel
C/Castaneda No. 18, 2 Isda
18009 Granada / ES
05 / DUQUE, Estrella, E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Co.
10007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19898 / US
Former [2003/26]01 / RAMOS, Juan, L.
Los Rosales No. 14, Pinos Genil
E-18191 Granada / ES
02 / BEN-BASSAT, Arie
49 West Periwinkle Lane
Newark, DE 19711 / US
03 / GODOY, Patricia, E.I. duPont de Nemours and Co.
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19805 / US
04 / RAMOS-GONZALES, M., Isabel
C/Castaneda No. 18, 2 Isda
18009 Granada / ES
05 / DUQUE, Estrella, E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Co.
10007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19898 / US
Representative(s)HGF Limited
1 City Walk
Leeds LS11 9DX / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/26]Harrison Goddard Foote
Belgrave Hall Belgrave Street
Leeds LS2 8DD / GB
Application number, filing date01981383.128.09.2001
[2003/26]
WO2001US31180
Priority number, dateUS2000023687930.09.2000         Original published format: US 236879
[2005/01]
Former [2004/52]US2000023687929.09.2000
Former [2003/26]US2000023687930.09.2000
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0229034
Date:11.04.2002
Language:EN
[2002/15]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1320594
Date:25.06.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.04.2002
[2003/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.04.2003
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/00
[2003/26]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/26]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:TOLERANZ GEGENÜBER AROMATISCHEN VERBINDUNGEN UND ANTIBIOTIKARESISTENZ VERLEIHENDE GENGRUPPE EXBB-EXBD-TONB AUS PSEUDOMONAS PUTIDA DOT-T1E[2003/26]
English:EXBB-EXBD-TONB GENE CLUSTER OF PSEUDOMONAS PUTIDA DOT-T1E CONFERRING TOLERANCE TO AROMATIC COMPOUNDS AND RESISTANCE TO ANTIBIOTICS[2003/26]
French:PROCEDES DE PRODUCTION DE P-HYDROXYBENZOATE DANS DES BACTERIES[2003/26]
Entry into regional phase17.04.2003National basic fee paid 
17.04.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
17.04.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.04.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
17.04.2003Examination requested  [2003/26]
16.05.2003Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.04.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/41]
12.05.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2005/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200404   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9923224  (DU PONT [US], et al) [A] 28-32,36-38 * abstract * * page 2, line 21 - page 3, line 26 * * page 25 - page 26; example 4; tables 2,3 * * page 28 - page 29; claims 1-14 *;
 [DXA]  - BITTER, W. ET AL., "Identification and characterization of the exbB, exbD and tonB genes of Pseudomonas putida WCS358: their involvement in ferric-pseudobactin transport", MOLECULAR MICROBIOLOGY, (199301), vol. 7, no. 1, pages 117 - 130, XP008005110 [DX] 1,16,17,24,25,27 * abstract * * page 119, column 1, line 5 - column 2, line 7; figure 1 * * page 120, column 1, line 28 - page 124, column 1, line 19; figures 2,3 * * page 125; table 2 * * page 127, column 1, line 39 - line 49 * [A] 2,26

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2958.1993.tb01103.x
 [A]  - MOSQUEDA, G. & RAMOS, J.L., "A Set of Genes Encoding a Second Toluene Efflux System in Pseudomonas putida DOT-T1E Is Linked to the tod Genes for Toluene Metabolism", JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, (200002), vol. 182, no. 4, pages 937 - 948, XP002204719 [A] 1,2,28-32,36-38 * abstract * * page 942, column 1, line 9 - page 943, column 1, line 8 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JB.182.4.937-943.2000
 [A]  - SEGURA, A. ET AL., "Multiple responses of Gram-negative bacteria to organic solvents", ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY, (199906), vol. 1, no. 3, pages 191 - 198, XP001089600 [A] 1,2,28-32,36-38 * page 191, column 2, line 4 - page 192, column 1, line 10 * * page 193, column 2, line 37 - page 196, column 2, line 18; figure 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1462-2920.1999.00033.x
 [DA]  - RAMOS, J.L. ET AL., "Isolation and Expansion of the Catabolic Potential of a Pseudomonas putida Strain Able To Grow in the Presence of High Concentrations of Aromatic Hydrocarbons", JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, (199507), vol. 177, no. 14, pages 3911 - 3916, XP002204720 [DA] 28-32,36-38 * abstract * * page 3913, column 2, line 10 - line 32 * * page 3915; figure 4 *
 [A]  - ZHAO, Q. ET AL., "Influence of the TonB Energy-Coupling Protein on Efflux-Mediated Multidrug Resistance in Pseudomonas aeruginosa", ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS AND CHEMOTHERAPY, (199809), vol. 42, no. 9, pages 2225 - 2231, XP002204721 [A] 1,2,15-17,24-27 * abstract * * page 2225, column 2, line 5 - line 32 * * page 2227, column 2, line 23 - page 2228, column 1, line 18; tables 2,3 * * page 2228, column 2, line 14 - page 2229, column 1, line 4; figure 3 * * page 2229, column 2, line 5 - line 16 * * page 2229, column 2, line 55 - page 2230, column 2, line 10 *
 [A]  - KLINE T. ET AL., "Antimicrobial Effects of Novel Siderophores Linked to beta-Lactam Antibiotics", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (200001), vol. 8, no. 1, pages 73 - 93, XP002204722 [A] 1,2,15-17,24-27 * abstract * * page 78, column 2, line 8 - line 30 * * page 79; table 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0968-0896(99)00261-8
 [PXA]  - GODOY, P. ET AL., "Involvement of the TonB System in Tolerance to Solvents and Drugs in Pseudomonas putida DOT-T1E", JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, (200109), vol. 183, no. 18, pages 5285 - 5292, XP001063905 [PX] 1,2,15-17,24,26,27,36-38 * the whole document * [PA] 25,28-32

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JB.183.18.5285-5292.2001
 [PA]  - RAMOS-GONZALEZ, M.I. ET AL., "Physiological Characterization of Pseudomonas putida DOT-T1E Tolerance to p-Hydroxybenzoate", APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY, (200109), vol. 67, no. 9, pages 4338 - 4341, XP002204723 [PA] 1,2,15-17,24-32,36-38 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/AEM.67.9.4338-4341.2001