Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1315905

EP1315905 - FLUID-MOVING DEVICE WITH INTEGRATED VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.05.2005
Database last updated on 12.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip27.05.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 13.07.2005  [2005/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Beckman Coulter, Inc.
4300 N Harbor Boulevard, PO Box 3100
Fullerton, CA 92834-3100 / US
[N/P]
Former [2003/23]For all designated states
Beckman Coulter, Inc.
4300 N Harbor Boulevard, PO Box 3100
Fullerton, CA 92834-3100 / US
Inventor(s)01 / KITTOCK, Mark, J.
8127 Currant Place
Eden Prairie, MN 55347 / US
02 / QURESHI, Humayun
18634 Schroers Farm Rd.
Eden Prairie, MN 55347 / US
 [2003/23]
Representative(s)Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/23]Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte
Grafinger Strasse 2
81671 München / DE
Application number, filing date01981426.810.10.2001
[2003/23]
WO2001US31503
Priority number, dateUS2000068547410.10.2000         Original published format: US 685474
[2003/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0231357
Date:18.04.2002
Language:EN
[2002/16]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1315905
Date:04.06.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.04.2002
[2003/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1315905
Date:21.07.2004
Language:EN
[2004/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.09.2002
ClassificationInternational:F04B7/00, F04B53/10, G01N1/00, B01L11/00
[2003/23]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/30]
Former [2003/23]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:FLUID-BEWEGUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT INTEGRIERTEM VENTIL[2003/23]
English:FLUID-MOVING DEVICE WITH INTEGRATED VALVE[2003/23]
French:DISPOSITIF SERVANT A DEPLACER UN FLUIDE EQUIPE D'UNE SOUPAPE INTEGREE[2003/23]
Entry into regional phase03.04.2003National basic fee paid 
03.04.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
03.04.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.01.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
03.04.2003Examination requested  [2003/23]
26.06.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.10.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.01.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.05.2004Fee for grant paid
19.05.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.04.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XAY]US3948607  (ATWOOD JOHN G, et al) [X] 1,2,4,6-9,12,14,16 * abstract * * column 1, line 62 - column 3, line 35 * * figure 1 * [A] 5,10 [Y] 3,17;
 [XA]EP0959005  (HASSIA VERPACKUNG AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-9,14,16 * abstract * * column 2, line 54 - column 3, line 41 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 12,13;
 [X]EP0024313  (BOEHRINGER SOHN INGELHEIM [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-9,12,14-16 * abstract * * page 1, line 15 - page 2, line 30 * * figures 1-3 *;
 [YA]DE19716242  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 3,17 * abstract * * figure 1 * [A] 1