Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1274589 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1274589



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1023
30.12.2010 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 2
17.09.2010 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
10.02.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
10.02.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
06.02.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
02.02.2010 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 28
13.11.2009 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.11.2009 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.11.2009 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.11.2009 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.11.2009 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
09.11.2009 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
09.11.2009 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
07.11.2009 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
06.11.2009 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 9
06.11.2009 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 3
29.10.2009 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
29.10.2009 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.10.2009 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 2
21.10.2009 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.10.2009 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.10.2009 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
21.10.2009 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
21.10.2009 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
21.10.2009 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
21.10.2009 Non-scannable object Appeal 1
21.10.2009 Non-scannable object Appeal 1
21.10.2009 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
21.10.2009 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
19.10.2009 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 28
19.10.2009 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 7
25.09.2009 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.09.2009 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
24.08.2009 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.08.2009 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
24.07.2009 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
21.07.2009 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.07.2009 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
15.07.2009 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
13.07.2009 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Appeal 9
13.07.2009 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Appeal 9
13.07.2009 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.07.2009 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
13.07.2009 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
13.07.2009 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
13.07.2009 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
13.07.2009 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
13.07.2009 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
10.07.2009 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 15
09.07.2009 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 20
23.04.2009 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
14.11.2008 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.11.2008 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 7
07.11.2008 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 7
26.08.2008 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 2
26.08.2008 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 4
22.08.2008 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 2
28.04.2008 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
14.04.2008 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 21
14.04.2008 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 21
14.04.2008 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 19
14.04.2008 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 19
14.04.2008 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 7
10.04.2008 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 8
10.04.2008 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 8
06.03.2008 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
11.02.2008 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
08.02.2008 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
05.02.2008 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
05.02.2008 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
01.02.2008 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
01.02.2008 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
17.12.2007 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
12.12.2007 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.12.2007 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
30.11.2007 Annex to a communication Opposition 2
30.11.2007 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 4
30.11.2007 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
30.11.2007 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 14
30.11.2007 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
30.11.2007 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
30.11.2007 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
30.11.2007 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
30.11.2007 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
30.11.2007 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
30.11.2007 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
30.11.2007 Text intended for grant Opposition 7
05.10.2007 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
01.10.2007 Claims Opposition 3
01.10.2007 Claims Opposition 3
01.10.2007 Claims Opposition 3
01.10.2007 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 6
24.09.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.09.2007 Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
07.09.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.09.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.09.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.09.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.09.2007 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
04.09.2007 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
04.09.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
04.09.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
04.09.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 19
31.08.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.08.2007 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 6
22.08.2007 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.04.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.04.2007 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.04.2007 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 2
30.03.2007 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
26.03.2007 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.03.2007 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
14.03.2007 Annex to the communication Opposition 5
14.03.2007 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
14.03.2007 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.03.2007 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.03.2007 General enquiry Opposition 1
07.03.2007 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
12.02.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.12.2006 General enquiry Opposition 1
21.11.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.11.2006 General enquiry Opposition 1
13.05.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.05.2005 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 5
11.03.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.03.2005 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
04.03.2005 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
02.03.2005 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
27.10.2004 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
27.10.2004 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
08.09.2004 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
30.08.2004 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 18
30.08.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
30.08.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
30.08.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
30.08.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
30.08.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
30.08.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
30.08.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
30.08.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
30.08.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
30.08.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
30.08.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
30.08.2004 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
30.08.2004 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
30.08.2004 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
30.08.2004 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
30.08.2004 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
30.08.2004 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
30.08.2004 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
30.08.2004 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 26
30.08.2004 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
30.08.2004 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
30.08.2004 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
30.08.2004 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
30.08.2004 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
30.08.2004 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
30.08.2004 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
30.08.2004 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
30.08.2004 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
30.08.2004 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 27
30.08.2004 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
30.08.2004 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
30.08.2004 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
30.08.2004 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
30.08.2004 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
30.08.2004 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
30.08.2004 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
30.08.2004 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
30.08.2004 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
26.08.2004 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 18
26.08.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
26.08.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
26.08.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
26.08.2004 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
16.10.2003 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
24.09.2003 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
24.09.2003 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
24.09.2003 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
26.08.2003 Grant of extension of time limit (grant procedure) Search / examination 1
13.08.2003 Request for extension of time limit to intention to grant Search / examination 1
28.04.2003 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
15.04.2003 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
15.04.2003 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
15.04.2003 Text intended for grant Search / examination 11
03.04.2003 Preparation of grant Search / examination 1
19.03.2003 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
19.03.2003 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
19.03.2003 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
19.03.2003 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
05.03.2003 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
26.02.2003 Description Search / examination 1
26.02.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
19.02.2003 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
14.02.2003 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
14.02.2003 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
31.01.2003 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
04.12.2002 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
29.11.2002 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
06.11.2002 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
23.10.2002 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
04.09.2002 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 5
08.07.2002 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
08.07.2002 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
08.07.2002 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
08.07.2002 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
08.07.2002 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
08.07.2002 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
08.07.2002 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
08.07.2002 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
31.05.2002 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
22.05.2002 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
15.05.2002 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
03.05.2002 Free text PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
03.05.2002 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
03.05.2002 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
17.04.2002 Document concerning representation PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
17.04.2002 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
17.04.2002 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
02.04.2002 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 10
28.03.2002 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 6
28.03.2002 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 12
26.11.2001 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
26.11.2001 Claims International Searching Authority 3
26.11.2001 Description International Searching Authority 6
26.11.2001 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 1
26.11.2001 Drawings International Searching Authority 1