Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1315520

EP1315520 - USE OF TRIFUNCTIONAL BISPECIFIC AND TRISPECIFIC ANTIBODIES FOR THE TREATMENT OF MALIGNANT ASCITES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.03.2006
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip24.10.2008Change - representativepublished on 26.11.2008  [2008/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TRION PHARMA GMBH
Frankfurter Ring 193a
80807 München / DE
[2006/02]
Former [2005/15]For all designated states
Lindhofer, Horst, Dr.
Gröbenbachstrasse 38a
82194 Gröbenzell / DE
Former [2003/23]For all designated states
Lindhofer, Horst
Bodenseestrasse 12
82194 Gröbenzell / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Dr. Horst Lindhofer
Brunhildenstrasse 10
80639 München / DE
 [2006/13]
Former [2006/02]01 / Dr. Horst Lindhofer
Bodenseestrasse 12
82194 Gröbenzell / DE
Former [2003/23]01 / see applicant
...
Representative(s)Isarpatent
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles
Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB
Postfach 44 01 51
80750 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/48]Reinhard - Skuhra - Weise & Partner
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte P.O. Box 440151
80750 München / DE
Former [2003/23]Reinhard - Skuhra - Weise & Partner GbR
Postfach 44 01 51
80750 München / DE
Application number, filing date01982241.004.09.2001
[2003/23]
WO2001EP10184
Priority number, dateDE200014343704.09.2000         Original published format: DE 10043437
[2003/23]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0220039
Date:14.03.2002
Language:DE
[2002/11]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1315520
Date:04.06.2003
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.03.2002
[2003/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1315520
Date:04.05.2005
Language:DE
[2005/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.07.2002
ClassificationInternational:A61K39/395, A61K39/00, A61P35/00, // (A61K39/395, 39:00)
[2003/23]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/23]
TitleGerman:VERWENDUNG VON TRIFUNKTIONELLEN BISPEZIFISCHEN UND TRISPEZIFISCHEN ANTIKÖRPERN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON MALIGNEM ASZITES[2003/23]
English:USE OF TRIFUNCTIONAL BISPECIFIC AND TRISPECIFIC ANTIBODIES FOR THE TREATMENT OF MALIGNANT ASCITES[2003/23]
French:UTILISATION D'ANTICORPS TRIFONCTIONNELS BISPECIFIQUES ET TRISPECIFIQUES DANS LE TRAITEMENT D'ASCITES MALIGNES[2003/23]
Entry into regional phase25.03.2003National basic fee paid 
25.03.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
25.03.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.03.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
25.03.2003Examination requested  [2003/23]
19.05.2003Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.08.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.02.2005Fee for grant paid
09.02.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.02.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
30.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY04.09.2005
[2007/20]
Cited inInternational search[X]DE19859115  (LINDHOFER HORST [DE]) [X] 1-27 * the whole document *;
 [X]DE19859110  (LINDHOFER HORST [DE]) [X] 1-27 * the whole document *;
 [X]  - H. LINDHOFER, "Neuartige trifunktionelle Antikörper befreien Stammzelltransplantate von residualen Tumorzellen.", BIOSPEKTRUM, Deutschland, (2000), vol. 6, no. 6, pages 500 - 501, XP001053756 [X] 1-21,24-27 * the whole document *
 [X]  - R. ZEIDLER ET AL., "The Fc-region of a new class of intact bispecific antibody mediates activation of accessory cells and NK cells and induces direct phagocytosis of tumour cells.", BRITISH JOURNAL OF CANCER, Basingstoke, Grossbritannien, (200007), vol. 83, no. 2, pages 261 - 266, XP001053758 [X] 1-21,24-27 * abstract * * Discussion *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1054/bjoc.2000.1237
 [A]  - H. LINDHOFER ET AL., "Preferential species-restricted heavy/light chain pairing in rat/mouse quadromas. Implications for a single-step purification of bispecific antibodies.", THE JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, Baltimore, MD, USA, (19950701), vol. 155, no. 1, pages 219 - 225, XP002190775 [A] 19 * abstract * * figure 1 * * table I *
 [A]  - G. STRAUSS ET AL., "Without prior stimulation, tumor-associated lymphocytes from malignant effusions lyse autologous tumor cells in the presence of bispecific antibody HEA125xOKT3.", CLINICAL CANCER RESEARCH, Philadelphia, PA, USA, (199901), vol. 5, no. 1, pages 171 - 180, XP002190776 [A] 1,11,15,18,25 * abstract * * page 174, column R, line 4 - line 12 * * Discussion *