Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1317512

EP1317512 - BISAZO DYESTUFFS BASED ON HYDROXYNAPHTHALENE CARBOXYLIC ACID [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.04.2005
Database last updated on 15.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.06.2008Change - applicantpublished on 30.07.2008  [2008/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BASF Aktiengesellschaft
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67063 Ludwigshafen / DE
[2008/31]
Former [2003/24]For all designated states
BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / SCHRÖDER, Gunter-Rudolf
Ziethenstrasse 95
68259 Mannheim / DE
02 / EBERT, Sophia
117er Erhrenhof 5
55118 Mainz / DE
03 / ETZBACH, Karl-Heinz
Jean-Ganss-Strasse 46
67227 Frankenthal / DE
04 / TRESCH, Rainer
Nibelungenweg 5
67133 Maxdorf / DE
05 / SENS, Rüdiger
Faselwiese 15
67069 Ludwigshafen / DE
 [2003/24]
Representative(s)Kinzebach, Werner , et al
Reitstötter, Kinzebach & Partner Patentanwälte Sternwartstrasse 4
81679 München / DE
[2008/29]
Former [2003/24]Kinzebach, Werner, Dr. , et al
Reitstötter, Kinzebach & Partner (GbR), Patentanwälte, Sternwartstrasse 4
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date01982284.013.09.2001
[2003/24]
WO2001EP10597
Priority number, dateDE200014543014.09.2000         Original published format: DE 10045430
[2003/24]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0222742
Date:21.03.2002
Language:DE
[2002/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1317512
Date:11.06.2003
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.03.2002
[2003/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1317512
Date:02.06.2004
Language:DE
[2004/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.03.2002
ClassificationInternational:C09B35/033, C09B35/215, C09B44/06
[2003/24]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   LI [2004/23]
Former [2003/24]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:BISAZOFARBSTOFFE AUF DER BASIS VON HYDROXYNAPHTHALINCARBONSÄURE[2003/24]
English:BISAZO DYESTUFFS BASED ON HYDROXYNAPHTHALENE CARBOXYLIC ACID[2003/24]
French:COLORANTS BISAZOIQUES A BASE D'ACIDE HYDROXY-NAPHTALENE-CARBOXYLIQUE[2003/24]
Entry into regional phase12.03.2003National basic fee paid 
12.03.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
12.03.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.04.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
12.03.2003Examination requested  [2003/24]
21.10.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.03.2004Fee for grant paid
01.03.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.03.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[AD]DE2061964  (SANDOZ AG.) [AD] 1-4 * examples 21,94; claim - *;
 [AD]DE2246495  (TOMS RIVER CHEMICAL CORP) [AD] 1-4 * claim - *