Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1320744

EP1320744 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR ANALYSING LIQUIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  09.02.2007
Database last updated on 11.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip13.11.2009Change - applicantpublished on 16.12.2009  [2009/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V.
Hansastrasse 27c
80686 München / DE
[2009/51]
Former [2007/03]For all designated states
Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V.
Hansastrasse 27c
80686 München / DE
Former [2003/47]For all designated states
Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V.
Hansastrasse 27 c
80686 München / DE
Former [2003/26]For all designated states
Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V.
Leonrodstrasse 54
80636 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / SASSENSCHEID, Karsten
Bächelhurst 23
79249 Merzhausen / DE
 [2003/26]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/26]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date01982323.619.09.2001
[2003/26]
WO2001EP10843
Priority number, dateDE200014623419.09.2000         Original published format: DE 10046234
[2003/26]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0227302
Date:04.04.2002
Language:DE
[2002/12]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1320744
Date:25.06.2003
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.04.2002
[2003/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.08.2002
ClassificationInternational:G01N21/77, G01N21/35
[2003/26]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/26]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ANALYSE VON FLUIDEN[2003/26]
English:DEVICE AND METHOD FOR ANALYSING LIQUIDS[2003/26]
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT L'ANALYSE DE LIQUIDES[2003/26]
Entry into regional phase21.11.2002National basic fee paid 
21.11.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
21.11.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.11.2002Examination requested  [2003/26]
09.01.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
20.09.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/11]
26.10.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2007/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
28.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
29.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200606   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9832012  (UNIV STRATHCLYDE [GB], et al) [X] 1,6,7,23-27,31,32,37 * page 7, paragraph 3 - paragraph 4 * * page 11, paragraph 1 - page 12, paragraph 1 * * page 13, paragraph 3; figures 2,5 *;
 [X]US5244813  (WALT DAVID R [US], et al) [X] 1,24 * column 2, line 24 - line 53; figure 1 *;
 [A]DE19630181  (INST PHYSIKALISCHE HOCHTECH EV [DE])