EP1340209 - ARRANGEMENT INCLUDING A REMOTE CONTROL DEVICE AND A FIRST ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.01.2011 Database last updated on 19.04.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [2010/11] |
Former [2003/36] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE BOLSTER, Ann Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
LAMBRECHTS, Marc, E., C. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
WOUTERS, Johan, A., E. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2003/36] | Representative(s) | Deguelle, Wilhelmus H. G. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2003/36] | Deguelle, Wilhelmus Hendrikus Gerardus INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 01982493.7 | 15.11.2001 | [2003/36] | WO2001EP13327 | Priority number, date | EP20000204165 | 23.11.2000 Original published format: EP 00204165 | [2003/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0243024 | Date: | 30.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1340209 | Date: | 03.09.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1340209 | Date: | 17.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G08C19/28 | [2003/36] | CPC: |
G08C19/28 (EP,US);
H04Q9/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/36] | Title | German: | EINRICHTUNG MIT EINER FERNBEDIENUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND EINEM ERSTEN GERÄT | [2003/36] | English: | ARRANGEMENT INCLUDING A REMOTE CONTROL DEVICE AND A FIRST ELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2003/36] | French: | EQUIPEMENT COMPRENANT UN DISPOSITIF DE TELECOMMANDE ET UN PREMIER DISPOSITIF ELECTRONIQUE | [2003/36] | Entry into regional phase | 23.06.2003 | National basic fee paid | 23.06.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.06.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/36] | 09.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.03.2010 | BE | 17.03.2010 | CY | 17.03.2010 | DK | 17.03.2010 | FI | 17.03.2010 | IT | 17.03.2010 | NL | 17.03.2010 | SE | 17.03.2010 | TR | 17.03.2010 | GR | 18.06.2010 | ES | 28.06.2010 | PT | 19.07.2010 | IE | 15.11.2010 | LU | 15.11.2010 | CH | 30.11.2010 | LI | 30.11.2010 | MC | 30.11.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
BE | 17.03.2010 | ||
CY | 17.03.2010 | ||
DK | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
IT | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
SE | 17.03.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
ES | 28.06.2010 | ||
PT | 19.07.2010 | ||
IE | 15.11.2010 | ||
LU | 15.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
BE | 17.03.2010 | ||
CY | 17.03.2010 | ||
DK | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
IT | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
SE | 17.03.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
ES | 28.06.2010 | ||
PT | 19.07.2010 | ||
IE | 15.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
BE | 17.03.2010 | ||
CY | 17.03.2010 | ||
DK | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
IT | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
SE | 17.03.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
ES | 28.06.2010 | ||
PT | 19.07.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/31] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
BE | 17.03.2010 | ||
CY | 17.03.2010 | ||
DK | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
IT | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
SE | 17.03.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
ES | 28.06.2010 | ||
PT | 19.07.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
BE | 17.03.2010 | ||
CY | 17.03.2010 | ||
DK | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
IT | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
SE | 17.03.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
ES | 28.06.2010 | ||
PT | 19.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
BE | 17.03.2010 | ||
CY | 17.03.2010 | ||
DK | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
SE | 17.03.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
ES | 28.06.2010 | ||
PT | 19.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
BE | 17.03.2010 | ||
CY | 17.03.2010 | ||
DK | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
SE | 17.03.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
ES | 28.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/49] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
BE | 17.03.2010 | ||
CY | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
SE | 17.03.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
ES | 28.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/47] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
BE | 17.03.2010 | ||
CY | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
ES | 28.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
ES | 28.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/38] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/37] | AT | 17.03.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9950807 (U S ELECTRONICS COMPONENTS COR [US]) [A] 1,7 * abstract *; | [X]US6104334 (ALLPORT DAVID E [US]) [X] 1,2,7,8 * column 22, line 19 - column 23, line 22 *; | [A]EP1039772 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-7* abstract * | Examination | JP2000156893 |