Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1242766

EP1242766 - METHOD FOR PASSIVE ALIGNMENT OF SUPPORTS, PARTICULARLY PLATES BEARING OPTICAL COMPONENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.07.2006
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.07.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 23.08.2006  [2006/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE
31-33, rue de la Fédération
75752 Paris Cédex 15 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2002/39]For all designated states
COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE
31-33, rue de la Fédération
75752 Paris Cédex 15 / FR
Inventor(s)01 / MARION, François
23 B avenue du Collège
F-38120 SAINT-EGREVE / FR
02 / BORY, Cécile
5 rue Bach
F-38120 LE FONTANIL / FR
 [2002/39]
Representative(s)Brykman, Georges , et al
BREVALEX
95 rue d'Amsterdam
75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2002/39]Brykman, Georges , et al
c/o BREVATOME 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date01982540.524.10.2001
[2002/39]
WO2001FR03301
Priority number, dateFR2000001368025.10.2000         Original published format: FR 0013680
[2002/39]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0235138
Date:02.05.2002
Language:FR
[2002/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1242766
Date:25.09.2002
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.2002
[2002/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP02.05.2002
ClassificationInternational:F16M11/04, G02B6/42
[2002/39]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB,   IT [2004/20]
Former [2002/39]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR PASSIVEN AUSRICHTUNG VON TRÄGERN, INSBESONDRE VON PLATTEN MIT OPTISCHEN KOMPONENTEN[2002/39]
English:METHOD FOR PASSIVE ALIGNMENT OF SUPPORTS, PARTICULARLY PLATES BEARING OPTICAL COMPONENTS[2002/39]
French:PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF D'ALIGNEMENT PASSIF DE SUPPORTS, EN PARTICULIER DE PLAQUES PORTANT DES COMPOSANTS OPTIQUES[2002/39]
Entry into regional phase17.05.2002National basic fee paid 
17.05.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
17.05.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.05.2002Examination requested  [2002/39]
07.01.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.07.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.10.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.03.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/34]
04.04.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2006/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
19.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
18.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[A]US4565314  (SCHOLZ HARRY R [US]) [A] 1,10 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5818994  (HEHMANN JOERG [DE]) [A] 1,10 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE19512256  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,10 * column 5, line 25 - line 49; figures 1A,1B,4B *;
 [A]JP2000206376  ;
 [AD]US5496769  (MARION FRANCOIS [FR], et al);
 [AD]FR2704961  (SCHLUMBERGER IND SA [FR]);
 [A]US6085007  (JIANG CHING-LONG [US], et al);
 [D]WO9944088  (WHITAKER CORP [US]);
 [AD]US4079404  (COMERFORD LIAM DAVID, et al)
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20001117), vol. 2000, no. 10, [A] 1,10 * abstract * * fig.1-7 *
by applicantUS5496769
 FR2704691