blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1344777

EP1344777 - IMIDAZOLE DERIVATIVES, PROCESS FOR THEIR PREPARATION AND THEIR USE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.01.2012
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip27.09.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 30.10.2013  [2013/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited
1-1, Doshomachi 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 541-0045 / JP
[2011/03]
Former [2005/04]For all designated states
Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited
1-1, Doshomachi 4-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka / JP
Former [2003/38]For all designated states
Takeda Chemical Industries, Ltd.
1-1 Doshomachi 4-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-8645 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / TASAKA, Akihiro
9-20-102, Yamadahigashi 2-chome
Suita-shi, Osaka 565-0821 / JP
02 / MATSUNAGA, Nobuyuki
30-3, Hannan-cho 3-chome, Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-0021 / JP
03 / OJIDA, Akio
36-25, Hakozaki 2-chome, Higashi-ku
Fukuoka-shi, Fukuoka 812-0053 / JP
04 / KUSAKA, Masami
4-102-301, Gakuenhigashimachi 1-chome, Nishi-ku
Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-2102 / JP
 [2003/38]
Representative(s)Wright, Robert Gordon McRae, et al
Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks
Kent TN13 1XR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/29]Wright, Robert Gordon McRae, et al
Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks
Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Former [2003/38]Lewin, John Harvey
Takeda Euro IP Department, 11-12 Charles II Street
London SW1Y 4QU / GB
Application number, filing date01982839.119.11.2001
[2003/38]
WO2001JP10079
Priority number, dateJP2000035363420.11.2000         Original published format: JP 2000353634
JP2000038205615.12.2000         Original published format: JP 2000382056
[2003/38]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO0240470
Date:23.05.2002
Language:EN
[2002/21]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1344777
Date:17.09.2003
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.05.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2003/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1344777
Date:16.03.2011
Language:EN
[2011/11]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP23.05.2002
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.04.2007
ClassificationIPC:C07D403/06, C07D233/54, A61K31/4178, A61K31/502, A61P43/00, A61P35/00, A61P13/08, A61P15/00
[2003/38]
CPC:
C07D403/06 (EP,US); A61P13/08 (EP); A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP); A61P43/00 (EP); C07D401/06 (EP,US);
Y02P20/55 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/38]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:IMIDAZOLDERIVATE, VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG UND DEREN VERWENDUNG[2003/38]
English:IMIDAZOLE DERIVATIVES, PROCESS FOR THEIR PREPARATION AND THEIR USE[2003/38]
French:DERIVES DE L'IMIDAZOLE, LEUR PROCEDE DE PREPARATION ET LEUR APPLICATION[2003/38]
Entry into regional phase06.06.2003Translation filed 
06.06.2003National basic fee paid 
06.06.2003Search fee paid 
06.06.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
06.06.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.12.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
06.06.2003Examination requested  [2003/38]
28.01.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.07.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.10.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.02.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.09.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.01.2011Fee for grant paid
19.01.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.12.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2012/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
12.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
14.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
14.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
15.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
10.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
12.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT16.03.2011
BE16.03.2011
CY16.03.2011
DK16.03.2011
FI16.03.2011
IT16.03.2011
NL16.03.2011
SE16.03.2011
TR16.03.2011
GR17.06.2011
ES27.06.2011
PT18.07.2011
IE19.11.2011
LU19.11.2011
MC30.11.2011
[2013/44]
Former [2013/25]AT16.03.2011
BE16.03.2011
CY16.03.2011
DK16.03.2011
FI16.03.2011
IT16.03.2011
NL16.03.2011
SE16.03.2011
GR17.06.2011
ES27.06.2011
PT18.07.2011
IE19.11.2011
LU19.11.2011
MC30.11.2011
Former [2012/47]AT16.03.2011
BE16.03.2011
CY16.03.2011
DK16.03.2011
FI16.03.2011
IT16.03.2011
NL16.03.2011
SE16.03.2011
GR17.06.2011
ES27.06.2011
PT18.07.2011
IE19.11.2011
MC30.11.2011
Former [2012/29]AT16.03.2011
BE16.03.2011
CY16.03.2011
DK16.03.2011
FI16.03.2011
IT16.03.2011
NL16.03.2011
SE16.03.2011
GR17.06.2011
ES27.06.2011
PT18.07.2011
MC30.11.2011
Former [2012/23]AT16.03.2011
BE16.03.2011
CY16.03.2011
DK16.03.2011
FI16.03.2011
IT16.03.2011
NL16.03.2011
SE16.03.2011
GR17.06.2011
ES27.06.2011
PT18.07.2011
Former [2012/10]AT16.03.2011
BE16.03.2011
CY16.03.2011
DK16.03.2011
FI16.03.2011
NL16.03.2011
SE16.03.2011
GR17.06.2011
ES27.06.2011
PT18.07.2011
Former [2012/02]AT16.03.2011
BE16.03.2011
CY16.03.2011
FI16.03.2011
NL16.03.2011
SE16.03.2011
GR17.06.2011
ES27.06.2011
PT18.07.2011
Former [2011/47]AT16.03.2011
BE16.03.2011
CY16.03.2011
FI16.03.2011
SE16.03.2011
GR17.06.2011
ES27.06.2011
PT18.07.2011
Former [2011/41]AT16.03.2011
BE16.03.2011
CY16.03.2011
FI16.03.2011
SE16.03.2011
GR17.06.2011
ES27.06.2011
Former [2011/39]AT16.03.2011
CY16.03.2011
FI16.03.2011
SE16.03.2011
GR17.06.2011
ES27.06.2011
Former [2011/37]CY16.03.2011
FI16.03.2011
SE16.03.2011
GR17.06.2011
ES27.06.2011
Former [2011/36]SE16.03.2011
GR17.06.2011
ES27.06.2011
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[A]WO9954309  (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP], et al);
 [AP]WO0130762  (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP], et al);
 [AP]WO0130763  (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP], et al);
 [AP]WO0130764  (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP], et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.