Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1363575

EP1363575 - A DRESSING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.06.2012
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip27.09.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 30.10.2013  [2013/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Coloplast A/S
Holtedam 1
3050 Humlebaek / DK
[2011/33]
Former [2003/48]For all designated states
COLOPLAST A/S
Holtedam 1
3050 Humlebaek / DK
Inventor(s)01 / KOLTE, Mette, Irene
Daltoftevej 50
DK-2860 Soeborg / DK
02 / WOLSING, Anne, Mette
Noerredamsvej 46c
DK-3480 Fredensborg / DK
03 / STIGSEN, Jeppe
Loebjerg 14
DK-3460 Birkeroed / DK
04 / KVISGAARD, jette
Hoejmose Vaenge 9, 3th
DK-2970 Hoersholm / DK
 [2003/48]
Representative(s)Nilausen, Kim , et al
c/o Coloplast A/S
Holtedam 1
3050 Humlebaek / DK
[N/P]
Former [2003/48]Nilausen, Kim , et al
c/o Coloplast A/S, Holtedam 1
3050 Humlebaek / DK
Application number, filing date01983430.809.11.2001
[2003/48]
WO2001DK00741
Priority number, dateDK2000000174520.11.2000         Original published format: DK 200001745
[2003/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0239940
Date:23.05.2002
Language:EN
[2002/21]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1363575
Date:26.11.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.05.2002
[2003/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1363575
Date:17.08.2011
Language:EN
[2011/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.08.2003
ClassificationInternational:A61F13/02, A61F13/06, A61F13/10
[2003/48]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/48]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:WUNDVERBAND[2003/48]
English:A DRESSING[2003/48]
French:PANSEMENT[2003/48]
Entry into regional phase05.05.2003National basic fee paid 
05.05.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
20.06.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.06.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
20.06.2003Examination requested  [2003/48]
18.05.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.01.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
29.02.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.02.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.06.2011Fee for grant paid
30.06.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.05.2007
Opposition(s)21.05.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/30]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
29.02.2008Request for further processing filed
29.02.2008Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
19.03.2008Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
11.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
30.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
30.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
30.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
01.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
30.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
30.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT17.08.2011
BE17.08.2011
CY17.08.2011
DK17.08.2011
FI17.08.2011
IT17.08.2011
NL17.08.2011
SE17.08.2011
TR17.08.2011
IE09.11.2011
LU09.11.2011
GR18.11.2011
ES28.11.2011
CH30.11.2011
LI30.11.2011
MC30.11.2011
PT19.12.2011
[2013/44]
Former [2013/25]AT17.08.2011
BE17.08.2011
CY17.08.2011
DK17.08.2011
FI17.08.2011
IT17.08.2011
NL17.08.2011
SE17.08.2011
IE09.11.2011
LU09.11.2011
GR18.11.2011
ES28.11.2011
CH30.11.2011
LI30.11.2011
MC30.11.2011
PT19.12.2011
Former [2013/22]AT17.08.2011
BE17.08.2011
CY17.08.2011
DK17.08.2011
FI17.08.2011
IT17.08.2011
NL17.08.2011
SE17.08.2011
IE09.11.2011
GR18.11.2011
ES28.11.2011
CH30.11.2011
LI30.11.2011
MC30.11.2011
PT19.12.2011
Former [2012/47]AT17.08.2011
BE17.08.2011
CY17.08.2011
DK17.08.2011
FI17.08.2011
IT17.08.2011
NL17.08.2011
SE17.08.2011
IE09.11.2011
GR18.11.2011
CH30.11.2011
LI30.11.2011
MC30.11.2011
PT19.12.2011
Former [2012/33]AT17.08.2011
BE17.08.2011
CY17.08.2011
DK17.08.2011
FI17.08.2011
IT17.08.2011
NL17.08.2011
SE17.08.2011
GR18.11.2011
CH30.11.2011
LI30.11.2011
MC30.11.2011
PT19.12.2011
Former [2012/32]AT17.08.2011
BE17.08.2011
CY17.08.2011
DK17.08.2011
FI17.08.2011
IT17.08.2011
NL17.08.2011
SE17.08.2011
GR18.11.2011
MC30.11.2011
PT19.12.2011
Former [2012/29]AT17.08.2011
BE17.08.2011
CY17.08.2011
FI17.08.2011
IT17.08.2011
NL17.08.2011
SE17.08.2011
GR18.11.2011
MC30.11.2011
PT19.12.2011
Former [2012/23]AT17.08.2011
BE17.08.2011
CY17.08.2011
FI17.08.2011
IT17.08.2011
NL17.08.2011
SE17.08.2011
GR18.11.2011
PT19.12.2011
Former [2012/17]AT17.08.2011
BE17.08.2011
CY17.08.2011
FI17.08.2011
NL17.08.2011
SE17.08.2011
GR18.11.2011
PT19.12.2011
Former [2012/12]AT17.08.2011
CY17.08.2011
FI17.08.2011
NL17.08.2011
SE17.08.2011
GR18.11.2011
PT19.12.2011
Former [2012/11]AT17.08.2011
FI17.08.2011
NL17.08.2011
SE17.08.2011
GR18.11.2011
PT19.12.2011
Former [2012/10]FI17.08.2011
NL17.08.2011
SE17.08.2011
GR18.11.2011
PT19.12.2011
Former [2012/09]FI17.08.2011
NL17.08.2011
PT19.12.2011
Former [2012/08]NL17.08.2011
Cited inInternational search[A]FR2793406  (EPITACT M D SA) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]JP2000024026  ;
 [A]JP2000209429  ;
 [A]CH321693  (VERBANDSTOFF FABRIK JOSEF CONR) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000831), vol. 2000, no. 04, & JP2000024026 A 20000125 (TAMAI SHOTEN:KK) [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20001117), vol. 2000, no. 10, & JP2000209429 A 20000728 (CANON INC) [A] 1 * abstract *