Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP1333918 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1333918



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 696
02.11.2012 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
02.11.2012 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
26.10.2012 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 2
13.10.2012 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
13.10.2012 French translation of claims Opposition 2
13.10.2012 German translation of the claims Opposition 3
11.10.2012 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
11.10.2012 French translation of claims Opposition 2
11.10.2012 German translation of the claims Opposition 3
11.10.2012 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
22.08.2012 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
22.08.2012 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 2
22.08.2012 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 2
31.07.2012 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
20.07.2012 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
25.05.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.05.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.05.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
17.05.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
17.05.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
17.05.2011 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
17.05.2011 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 10
17.05.2011 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 2
17.05.2011 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
17.05.2011 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
20.12.2010 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
20.12.2010 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
13.12.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.12.2010 Description Opposition 4
07.12.2010 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
03.12.2010 Description Opposition 4
03.12.2010 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
31.08.2010 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
31.08.2010 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
31.08.2010 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
31.08.2010 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 10
04.08.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
31.07.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
28.07.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
26.07.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
20.07.2010 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 41
22.04.2010 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
21.04.2010 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.04.2010 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
06.04.2010 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
31.03.2010 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
29.03.2010 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
24.03.2010 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.03.2010 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
18.03.2010 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 5
12.01.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
12.01.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
09.01.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
07.01.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
16.12.2009 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
05.08.2008 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
26.02.2008 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.02.2008 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
08.02.2008 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
28.01.2008 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 2
24.01.2008 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
21.01.2008 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
18.01.2008 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 2
18.01.2008 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
17.01.2008 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
15.01.2008 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
14.01.2008 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
14.09.2007 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 2
06.09.2007 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 7
03.09.2007 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 7
31.08.2007 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 8
29.08.2007 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 9
20.08.2007 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
26.07.2007 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
26.07.2007 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
20.07.2007 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
10.07.2007 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
05.07.2007 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
02.07.2007 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
29.06.2007 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
22.06.2007 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
20.06.2007 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
28.04.2007 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
27.04.2007 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
26.04.2007 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.04.2007 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.04.2007 Annex to a communication Opposition 4
23.04.2007 Annex to a communication Opposition 3
23.04.2007 Annex to a communication Opposition 3
23.04.2007 Annex to a communication Opposition 4
23.04.2007 Annex to a communication Opposition 2
23.04.2007 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 4
23.04.2007 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
23.04.2007 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 10
23.04.2007 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
23.04.2007 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
23.04.2007 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
23.04.2007 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
23.04.2007 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
23.04.2007 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
23.04.2007 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
23.04.2007 Text intended for grant Opposition 11
23.03.2007 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.03.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.03.2007 Claims Opposition 3
12.03.2007 Claims Opposition 4
12.03.2007 Claims Opposition 3
12.03.2007 Claims Opposition 3
12.03.2007 Claims Opposition 3
12.03.2007 Claims Opposition 4
12.03.2007 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
07.03.2007 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 24
20.02.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.02.2007 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 9
14.02.2007 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 10
06.02.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.02.2007 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
31.01.2007 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 2
16.10.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
13.10.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
13.10.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
09.10.2006 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 2
09.10.2006 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
09.10.2006 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.09.2006 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
30.08.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.08.2006 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 7
14.08.2006 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 7
02.06.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.06.2006 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
01.06.2006 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
26.05.2006 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
03.02.2006 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
03.02.2006 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
16.12.2005 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
05.12.2005 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 12
05.12.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
05.12.2005 Notice of opposition Opposition 8
05.12.2005 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 32
05.12.2005 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
01.12.2005 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 11
20.01.2005 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
26.11.2004 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
26.11.2004 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
26.11.2004 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
23.11.2004 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 7
23.11.2004 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
13.09.2004 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
13.09.2004 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
13.09.2004 Text intended for grant Search / examination 17
16.08.2004 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
14.06.2004 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
02.06.2004 Request for change of address Search / examination 3
02.07.2003 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
27.06.2003 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
28.05.2003 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
31.03.2003 Annex Search / examination 6
31.03.2003 Annex Search / examination 4
31.03.2003 Claims Search / examination 3
31.03.2003 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
28.03.2003 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
28.03.2003 Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language Search / examination 3
21.03.2003 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 4
21.03.2003 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 6
07.03.2003 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
05.02.2003 Annex to International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
05.02.2003 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
05.02.2003 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
05.02.2003 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
05.02.2003 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
05.02.2003 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
05.02.2003 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
05.02.2003 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
05.02.2003 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
17.01.2003 Claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
17.01.2003 Claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
17.01.2003 Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
13.01.2003 Claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
13.01.2003 Claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
13.01.2003 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
13.01.2003 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
13.01.2003 Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
11.12.2002 Written opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
11.12.2002 Written opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
11.12.2002 Written opinion - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
11.12.2002 Written opinion - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
14.09.2002 Claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
14.09.2002 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
10.09.2002 Claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
10.09.2002 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
10.09.2002 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
26.08.2002 Grant of extension of time limit PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
08.08.2002 Request for extension of time limit PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
10.06.2002 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
10.06.2002 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
10.06.2002 Written opinion - Automated PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
16.05.2002 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
13.05.2002 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
06.05.2002 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 20
02.05.2002 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
02.05.2002 Published international application - A1 Search / examination 18
27.02.2002 Modified abstract Search / examination 1
30.11.2001 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
30.11.2001 Claims International Searching Authority 2
30.11.2001 Description International Searching Authority 11
30.11.2001 Drawings International Searching Authority 3