EP1338666 - MATERIAL FOR SHADOW MASK, METHOD FOR PRODUCTION THEREOF, SHADOW MASK COMPRISING THE MATERIAL AND PICTURE TUBE USING THE SHADOW MASK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.10.2008 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.10.2008 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.11.2008 [2008/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyo Kohan Co., Ltd. 2-12, Yonbancho, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 102-8447 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/35] | For all designated states Toyo Kohan Co., Ltd. 2-12, Yonbancho, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 102-8447 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UEDA, Toshiyuki c/o TOYO KOHAN CO., LTD. Kudamatsu Plant 1302, Higashitoyoi Kudamatsu-shi, Yamaguchi 744-8611 / JP | 02 /
Yabuta, Naomi c/o TOYO KOHAN CO., LTD. Kudamatsu Plant 1302, Higashitoyoi Kudamatsu-shi, Yamaguchi 744-8611 / JP | 03 /
Aoki, Shinichi c/o TOYO KOHAN CO., LTD. Kudamatsu Plant 1302, Higashitoyoi Kudamatsu-shi, Yamaguchi 744-8611 / JP | [2003/35] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/35] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01983803.6 | 14.11.2001 | [2003/35] | WO2001JP09964 | Priority number, date | JP20000354284 | 21.11.2000 Original published format: JP 2000354284 | [2003/35] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0242509 | Date: | 30.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1338666 | Date: | 27.08.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.05.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C22C38/00, H01J29/07, H01J9/14, C22C38/04, C22C38/06, C21D8/02 | [2004/52] | CPC: |
C22C38/02 (EP,US);
H01J29/07 (EP,KR,US);
C21D8/0226 (EP,US);
C21D8/0236 (EP,US);
C22C38/001 (EP,US);
C22C38/002 (EP,US);
C22C38/004 (EP,US);
C22C38/04 (EP,US);
C22C38/06 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2003/35] | C22C38/00, H01J29/07, H01J9/14 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2004/21] |
Former [2003/35] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MATERIAL FÜR SCHATTENMASKE, VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTLELLUNG, DAS MATERIAL ENTHALTENDE SCHATTENMASKE UND BILDRÖHRE MIT DER SCHATTENMASKE | [2003/35] | English: | MATERIAL FOR SHADOW MASK, METHOD FOR PRODUCTION THEREOF, SHADOW MASK COMPRISING THE MATERIAL AND PICTURE TUBE USING THE SHADOW MASK | [2003/35] | French: | PROCEDE DESTINE A UN MASQUE PERFORE, PROCEDE DE FABRICATION CORRESPONDANT, MASQUE PERFORE COMPRENANT DES MATERIAUX ET TUBE D'IMAGES UTILISANT LE MASQUE PERFORE | [2003/35] | Entry into regional phase | 13.05.2003 | Translation filed | 12.06.2003 | National basic fee paid | 12.06.2003 | Search fee paid | 12.06.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.06.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.05.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 12.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/35] | 10.10.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS6191332 ; | [X]JPH11181523 ; | [X]JPH1150149 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860912), vol. 0102, no. 69, Database accession no. (C - 372), & JP61091332 A 19860509 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [X] 1-3,5,6 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19991029), vol. 1999, no. 12, & JP11181523 A 19990706 (SUMITOMO METAL IND LTD) [X] 1-4 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990531), vol. 1999, no. 05, & JP11050149 A 19990223 (SUMITOMO METAL IND LTD) [X] 1,2 * abstract * | International search | [X]JPH11323500 (NIPPON KOKAN KK); | [X]JPS55138027 (NIPPON KOKAN KK, et al) |