Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1320952

EP1320952 - COMMUNICATIONS PROTOCOL FOR WIRELESS LAN HARMONIZING THE IEEE 802.11a AND ETSI HiPerLAN/2 STANDARDS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.07.2005
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.07.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.09.2005  [2005/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Envara Ltd.
3 Ha'Tidhar Street, Millenium Building
Ra'anana 43000 / IL
[2004/22]
Former [2004/14]For all designated states
Envara, Inc.
2711 Centerville Road, Suite 400
Wilmington, New Castle County, Delaware 19808 / US
Former [2003/26]For all designated states
Hlan Inc.
Merkaz Sharona, 12 Derech Hasharon
Kfar Saba 44269 / IL
Inventor(s)01 / TEXERMAN, Yossi
7 Yaakov Dori St.
Modiin 71700 / IL
02 / DAVIDI, Oren
17 Haeshel St.
Ramat Gan 52535 / IL
03 / HALPERIN, Arik
14 Harzit St.
Modiin 71700 / IL
 [2003/26]
Representative(s)Becker Kurig Straus
Patentanwälte
Bavariastrasse 7
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/26]Becker Kurig Straus
Patentanwälte Bavariastrasse 7
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date01984507.211.07.2001
[2003/26]
WO2001US21796
Priority number, dateUS20000223993P09.08.2000         Original published format: US 223993 P
US20000230412P06.09.2000         Original published format: US 230412 P
[2003/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0213429
Date:14.02.2002
Language:EN
[2002/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1320952
Date:25.06.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.02.2002
[2003/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US14.02.2002
ClassificationInternational:H04J3/00, H04Q7/28
[2003/26]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/26]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:KOMMUNIKATIONSPROTOKOLL FÜR EIN DRAHTLOSES LAN, DAS DIE NORMEN IEEE 802.11a UND ETSI HiPerLAN/2 HARMONISIERT[2003/26]
English:COMMUNICATIONS PROTOCOL FOR WIRELESS LAN HARMONIZING THE IEEE 802.11a AND ETSI HiPerLAN/2 STANDARDS[2003/26]
French:PROTOCOLE DE COMMUNICATIONS POUR RLE SANS FIL POUVANT HARMONISER LES NORMES IEEE 802.11A ET HIPERLAN/2 ETSI[2003/26]
Entry into regional phase07.02.2003National basic fee paid 
07.02.2003Search fee paid 
07.02.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
07.02.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.03.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
07.02.2003Examination requested  [2003/26]
01.02.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/36]
10.03.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2005/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200404   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]US5793757  (UDDENFELDT JAN [SE]);
 [XP]US6130886  (KETSEOGLOU THOMAS J [US], et al);
 [A]US5745483  (NAKAGAWA YOSHIKATSU [JP], et al)