Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1317575

EP1317575 - SELF-CLEANING IRON [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  31.07.2015
Database last updated on 16.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip31.07.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.09.2015  [2015/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rowenta Werke GmbH
Herrnrainweg 5
63067 Offenbach / DE
[2003/24]
Inventor(s)01 / HORCHER, Roger
Haydnstrasse 16
63069 Offenbach / DE
02 / MAIER, Klaus
In Den Lindengärten 11
63073 Offenbach / DE
03 / DEMUTH, Ulrich
Dellenweg 8
64711 Erbach / DE
 [2003/24]
Representative(s)Kiehl, Hubert
SEB Développement
Les 4 M-Chemin du Petit Bois
B.P. 172
69132 Ecully Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2003/24]Kiehl, Hubert
SEB Développement, Les 4 M-Chemin du Petit Bois, B.P. 172
69132 Ecully Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date01984659.111.09.2001
[2003/24]
WO2001IB02531
Priority number, dateFR2000001156212.09.2000         Original published format: FR 0011562
[2003/24]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0222939
Date:21.03.2002
Language:FR
[2002/12]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1317575
Date:11.06.2003
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.03.2002
[2003/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.08.2002
ClassificationInternational:D06F75/18
[2003/24]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/24]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:SELBSTREINIGENDES DAMPFBÜGELEISEN[2003/24]
English:SELF-CLEANING IRON[2003/24]
French:FER A VAPEUR AUTO NETTOYANT[2003/24]
Entry into regional phase13.02.2003National basic fee paid 
13.02.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
13.02.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.04.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
13.02.2003Examination requested  [2003/24]
06.06.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.09.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.02.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.06.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.04.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/36]
24.04.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2015/36]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.06.2005
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
30.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
19.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
02.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
23.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
21.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
18.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
12.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
12.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 11
27.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 12
26.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 13
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.201414   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[DA]US3889406  (CHIVERS JAMES R, et al) [DA] 1-4 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE29720259U  (ROWENTA WERKE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *;
 [DA]DE4412825  (BRAUN AG [DE]) [DA] 1,5 * figures 1,2 *;
 [DA]DE3405465  (ROWENTA WERKE GMBH [DE]);
 [DA]FR2156103  (GEN ELECTRIC);
 [A]WO9809015  (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al)