Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1365685

EP1365685 - 3D PLANNING TARGET VOLUME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.12.2010
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip24.12.2010No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 26.01.2011  [2011/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
[2010/07]
Former [2003/49]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / BARNI, John, J.
6757 Bramblewood Lane
Mayfield Village, OH 44143 / US
 [2003/49]
Representative(s)Schouten, Marcus Maria
NXP B.V.
Intellectual Property & Licensing
High Tech Campus 60
5656 AG Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2003/49]Schouten, Marcus Maria
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220
5600 AE Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date01985973.521.11.2001
[2003/49]
WO2001US43389
Priority number, dateUS2000071863822.11.2000         Original published format: US 718638
[2003/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0241780
Date:30.05.2002
Language:EN
[2002/22]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1365685
Date:03.12.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2002
[2003/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1365685
Date:17.02.2010
Language:EN
[2010/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.09.2003
ClassificationInternational:A61B6/00
[2003/49]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/21]
Former [2003/49]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:DREIDIMENSIONALES PLANUNGSZIELVOLUMEN[2003/49]
English:3D PLANNING TARGET VOLUME[2003/49]
French:PLANIFICATION TRIDIMENSIONNELLE D'UN VOLUME CIBLE[2003/49]
Entry into regional phase23.06.2003National basic fee paid 
25.03.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
25.03.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.03.2004Examination requested  [2004/22]
14.12.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.03.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.08.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.12.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.06.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.06.2009Fee for grant paid
29.06.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)18.11.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2011/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
30.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
30.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
30.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
30.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
Cited inInternational search[X]US5722411  (SUZUKI TAKUJI [JP], et al) [X] 12-22 * column 21, line 46 - line 53 * * column 26, line 31 - column 27, line 32 *;
 [PX]WO0120552  (MAYO FOUNDATION [US]) [PX] 12 * abstract *
by applicantWO0120552