EP1365685 - 3D PLANNING TARGET VOLUME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.12.2010 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.01.2011 [2011/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [2010/07] |
Former [2003/49] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARNI, John, J. 6757 Bramblewood Lane Mayfield Village, OH 44143 / US | [2003/49] | Representative(s) | Schouten, Marcus Maria NXP B.V. Intellectual Property & Licensing High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2003/49] | Schouten, Marcus Maria Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 01985973.5 | 21.11.2001 | [2003/49] | WO2001US43389 | Priority number, date | US20000718638 | 22.11.2000 Original published format: US 718638 | [2003/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0241780 | Date: | 30.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1365685 | Date: | 03.12.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1365685 | Date: | 17.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61B6/00 | [2003/49] | CPC: |
A61B6/463 (EP,US);
A61B6/00 (EP,US);
A61B5/7289 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/21] |
Former [2003/49] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | DREIDIMENSIONALES PLANUNGSZIELVOLUMEN | [2003/49] | English: | 3D PLANNING TARGET VOLUME | [2003/49] | French: | PLANIFICATION TRIDIMENSIONNELLE D'UN VOLUME CIBLE | [2003/49] | Entry into regional phase | 23.06.2003 | National basic fee paid | 25.03.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/22] | 14.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.11.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5722411 (SUZUKI TAKUJI [JP], et al) [X] 12-22 * column 21, line 46 - line 53 * * column 26, line 31 - column 27, line 32 *; | [PX]WO0120552 (MAYO FOUNDATION [US]) [PX] 12* abstract * | by applicant | WO0120552 |