blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1346217

EP1346217 - REVERSIBLE MHC MULTIMER STAINING FOR FUNCTIONAL PURIFICATION OF ANTIGEN-SPECIFIC T CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.08.2021
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  18.09.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  08.09.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  01.05.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip22.07.2022Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE
published on 24.08.2022  [2022/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
IBA GmbH
Rudolf-Wissell-Strasse 28
37079 Göttingen / DE
[2003/39]
Inventor(s)01 / BUSCH, Dirk, H.
Liendlweg 3
81929 München / DE
02 / WAGNER, Hermann
Kaaganerstrasse 36
82279 Eching am Ammersee / DE
 [2003/39]
Representative(s)Schiweck Weinzierl Koch Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Ganghoferstraße 68 B
80339 München / DE
[2020/43]
Former [2011/14]Schiweck, Weinzierl & Koch
European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Straße 98
80339 München / DE
Former [2009/30]Viering, Jentschura & Partner
Postfach 22 14 43
80504 München / DE
Former [2009/09]Viering, Jentschura & Partner
Grillparzerstrasse 14
81675 München / DE
Former [2009/03]Viering, Jentschura & Partner
Grillparzerstrasse 14
81675 München / DE
Former [2003/39]Weiss, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Chem. Dr., et al
Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20
81635 München / DE
Application number, filing date01986941.128.12.2001
[2003/39]
WO2001EP15353
Priority number, dateEP2000012863428.12.2000         Original published format: EP 00128634
[2003/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO02054065
Date:11.07.2002
Language:EN
[2002/28]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1346217
Date:24.09.2003
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.07.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2003/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1346217
Date:21.10.2020
Language:EN
[2020/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.11.2002
ClassificationIPC:G01N33/569
[2020/39]
CPC:
G01N33/56972 (EP,US); A61K39/4611 (EP); A61K39/4648 (EP);
A61K39/464838 (EP); C12N5/0636 (EP,US); G01N33/505 (EP,US);
G01N33/5094 (EP,US); A61K2035/124 (EP,US); A61K2039/5158 (US);
A61K2239/38 (EP) (-)
Former IPC [2003/39]G01N33/50, C12N5/06
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2020/43]
Former [2003/39]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
Extension statesLT11.07.2003
LV11.07.2003
SI11.07.2003
TitleGerman:FUNKTIONELLE REINIGUNG VON ANTIGEN SPEZIFISCHEN T LYMPHOZYTEN DURCH PEPTIDE-MHC MULTIMER FÄRBUNG[2003/39]
English:REVERSIBLE MHC MULTIMER STAINING FOR FUNCTIONAL PURIFICATION OF ANTIGEN-SPECIFIC T CELLS[2003/39]
French:COLORATION REVERSIBLE AUX MULTIMERES CMH POUR UNE PURIFICATION FONCTIONNELLE DE LYMPHOCYTES T SPECIFIQUES DE L'ANTIGENE[2003/39]
Entry into regional phase27.06.2003National basic fee paid 
27.06.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
27.06.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.07.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
27.06.2003Examination requested  [2003/39]
17.09.2003Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.01.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.07.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.11.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.03.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.09.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.01.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.07.2013Date of oral proceedings
16.09.2013Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
16.09.2013Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
07.05.2020Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.05.2020Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.08.2020Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
13.08.2020Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.09.2020Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.09.2020Fee for grant paid
10.09.2020Fee for publishing/printing paid
10.09.2020Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Appeal following examination13.11.2013Appeal received No.  T0401/14
27.01.2014Statement of grounds filed
14.12.2018Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M04) [2018/50]
20.12.2019Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  31.01.2008
Opposition(s)22.07.2021No opposition filed within time limit [2021/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
31.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
30.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
30.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
28.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
31.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
31.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
23.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 11
19.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 12
27.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 13
22.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 14
22.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 15
23.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 16
21.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 17
19.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 18
23.12.2019Renewal fee patent year 19
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT21.10.2020
CY21.10.2020
DK21.10.2020
ES21.10.2020
FI21.10.2020
IT21.10.2020
MC21.10.2020
NL21.10.2020
SE21.10.2020
TR21.10.2020
IE28.12.2020
LU28.12.2020
BE31.12.2020
CH31.12.2020
FR31.12.2020
LI31.12.2020
GB21.01.2021
GR22.01.2021
PT22.02.2021
[2022/34]
Former [2022/27]AT21.10.2020
CY21.10.2020
DK21.10.2020
ES21.10.2020
FI21.10.2020
IT21.10.2020
MC21.10.2020
NL21.10.2020
SE21.10.2020
TR21.10.2020
IE28.12.2020
LU28.12.2020
CH31.12.2020
FR31.12.2020
LI31.12.2020
GB21.01.2021
GR22.01.2021
PT22.02.2021
Former [2022/26]AT21.10.2020
DK21.10.2020
ES21.10.2020
FI21.10.2020
IT21.10.2020
MC21.10.2020
NL21.10.2020
SE21.10.2020
TR21.10.2020
IE28.12.2020
LU28.12.2020
CH31.12.2020
FR31.12.2020
LI31.12.2020
GB21.01.2021
GR22.01.2021
PT22.02.2021
Former [2021/52]AT21.10.2020
DK21.10.2020
ES21.10.2020
FI21.10.2020
IT21.10.2020
MC21.10.2020
NL21.10.2020
SE21.10.2020
IE28.12.2020
LU28.12.2020
CH31.12.2020
FR31.12.2020
LI31.12.2020
GB21.01.2021
GR22.01.2021
PT22.02.2021
Former [2021/49]AT21.10.2020
DK21.10.2020
ES21.10.2020
FI21.10.2020
IT21.10.2020
MC21.10.2020
NL21.10.2020
SE21.10.2020
IE28.12.2020
LU28.12.2020
FR31.12.2020
GB21.01.2021
GR22.01.2021
PT22.02.2021
Former [2021/48]AT21.10.2020
DK21.10.2020
ES21.10.2020
FI21.10.2020
IT21.10.2020
MC21.10.2020
NL21.10.2020
SE21.10.2020
IE28.12.2020
LU28.12.2020
FR31.12.2020
GR22.01.2021
PT22.02.2021
Former [2021/47]AT21.10.2020
DK21.10.2020
ES21.10.2020
FI21.10.2020
MC21.10.2020
NL21.10.2020
SE21.10.2020
IE28.12.2020
LU28.12.2020
GR22.01.2021
PT22.02.2021
Former [2021/46]AT21.10.2020
DK21.10.2020
ES21.10.2020
FI21.10.2020
MC21.10.2020
NL21.10.2020
SE21.10.2020
IE28.12.2020
GR22.01.2021
PT22.02.2021
Former [2021/40]AT21.10.2020
DK21.10.2020
ES21.10.2020
FI21.10.2020
MC21.10.2020
NL21.10.2020
SE21.10.2020
GR22.01.2021
PT22.02.2021
Former [2021/37]AT21.10.2020
DK21.10.2020
ES21.10.2020
FI21.10.2020
NL21.10.2020
SE21.10.2020
GR22.01.2021
PT22.02.2021
Former [2021/25]AT21.10.2020
ES21.10.2020
FI21.10.2020
NL21.10.2020
SE21.10.2020
GR22.01.2021
PT22.02.2021
Former [2021/24]AT21.10.2020
FI21.10.2020
NL21.10.2020
SE21.10.2020
GR22.01.2021
PT22.02.2021
Former [2021/23]FI21.10.2020
NL21.10.2020
SE21.10.2020
GR22.01.2021
PT22.02.2021
Former [2021/21]FI21.10.2020
NL21.10.2020
PT22.02.2021
Former [2021/20]FI21.10.2020
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9605287  (ANERGEN INC [US]) [X] 24-27* example 2 *;
 [XA]WO9711183  (UNIV BOSTON [US]) [X] 24,26,27 * page 15, line 16 - line 26 * * example 15 * * page 17, line 19 - line 24 * [A] 1-23,25,28,29;
 [Y]EP0835934  (INST BIOANALYTIK GMBH [DE]) [Y] 7,10,23,28 * page 5, line 38 - line 46 *;
 [XY]  - YEE C ET AL, "isolation of high avidity melanoma reactive CTL from heterogeneous populations using peptide-MHC tetramers", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (19990215), XP002156019 [X] 1-6,8,9,11-22,24-27,29 * the whole document * [Y] 7,10,23,28
 [XY]  - YOUDE SARAH J ET AL, "Use of fluorogenic histocompatibility leukocyte antigen-A*0201/HPV 16 E7 peptide complexes to isolate rare human cytotoxic T-lymphocyte-recognizing endogenous human papillomavirus antigens.", CANCER RESEARCH, (20000115), vol. 60, no. 2, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 365 - 371, XP002167445 [X] 11-22,24-27,29 * the whole document * [Y] 7,10,23,28
 [Y]  - VOSS SELMA ET AL, "Mutagenesis of a flexible loop in streptavidin leads to higher affinity for the Strep-tag II peptide and improved performance in recombinant protein purification.", PROTEIN ENGINEERING, (199708), vol. 10, no. 8, ISSN 0269-2139, pages 975 - 982, XP002107709 [Y] 7,10,23,28 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/protein/10.8.975
Examination   - LUXEMBOURG ALAIN T ET AL, "Biomagnetic isolation of antigen-specific CD8+ T cells usable in immunotherapy", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, NEW YORK, NY, US LNKD- DOI:10.1038/NBT0398-281, (19980301), vol. 16, no. 3, ISSN 1087-0156, pages 281 - 285, XP002198433

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt0398-281
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.