Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1372521

EP1372521 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING ALL-CERAMIC DENTAL DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.12.2009
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.10.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, TR
published on 09.11.2011  [2011/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Wieland Dental + Technik GmbH & Co. KG
Schwenninger Strasse 13
75179 Pforzheim / DE
[2004/01]
Inventor(s)01 / BURGER, Goran
Hachelallee 94
75179 Pforhheim / DE
02 / KNOLL, Stefan
Brahmsweg 33
70195 Stuttgart / DE
03 / LAUBERSHEIMER, Jürgen
Remchinger Strasse 65
76307 Karlsbad / DE
 [2004/01]
Representative(s)Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner mbB
Kronenstrasse 30
70174 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/01]Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner
Kronenstrasse 30
70174 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date01988074.922.12.2001
[2004/01]
WO2001EP15295
Priority number, dateDE200111582026.03.2001         Original published format: DE 10115820
[2004/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO02076321
Date:03.10.2002
Language:DE
[2002/40]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1372521
Date:02.01.2004
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.2002
[2004/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1372521
Date:18.02.2009
Language:DE
[2009/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP09.01.2003
ClassificationInternational:A61C13/00, A61K6/027, C25D1/14
[2004/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2004/01]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON VOLLKERAMISCHEN DENTALFORMTEILEN[2004/01]
English:METHOD FOR PRODUCING ALL-CERAMIC DENTAL DEVICES[2004/01]
French:PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE PIECES MOULEES DENTAIRES EN CERAMIQUE PLEINE[2004/01]
Entry into regional phase18.10.2003National basic fee paid 
18.10.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
18.10.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.10.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
18.10.2003Examination requested  [2004/01]
11.04.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.07.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.08.2005Observations by third parties
06.02.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
12.04.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.10.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.02.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.06.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.10.2008Fee for grant paid
23.10.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
10.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
16.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
09.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
12.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
11.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IE18.02.2009
IT18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
TR18.02.2009
SE18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
PT27.07.2009
[2011/44]
Former [2011/14]DK18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IE18.02.2009
IT18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
SE18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
PT27.07.2009
Former [2010/47]DK18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IE18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
SE18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
PT27.07.2009
Former [2009/49]DK18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IE18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
SE18.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
PT27.07.2009
Former [2009/47]DK18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IE18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
SE18.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
Former [2009/46]DK18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
SE18.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
Former [2009/37]FI18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
SE18.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
Former [2009/34]NL18.02.2009
ES29.05.2009
Former [2009/33]ES29.05.2009
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0781530  (IVOCLAR AG [LI]) [X] 1-5,7-15 * figure - * * claim - *;
 [A]WO9950480  (CEREL CERAMIC TECHNOLOGIES LTD [IL], et al) [A] 1,5,6,14-19 * figure . * * claim - *;
 [A]WO9952467  (LEONHARDT DIRK [DK]) [A] 1-19 * figure - * * claim - *
ExaminationEP0241384
otherEP0241384