EP1421502 - FIBRE CHANNEL PORT ADAPTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.11.2007 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Inrange Technologies Corporation 100 Mount Holly By-Pass, P.O. Box 440 Lumberton, NJ 08048-0440 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/22] | For all designated states Inrange Technologies Corporation 100 Mount Holly By-Pass, P.O. Box 440 Lumberton, NJ 08048-0440 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TORNETTA, Anthony, G. 210 Leonard Drive King of Prussia, PA 19406 / US | 02 /
PAUL, Harry, V. 155 Marne Avenue Haddonfield, NJ 08033 / US | 03 /
WRIGHT, James, C. 5 Saw Mill Road Sewell, NJ 08080 / US | [2004/22] | Representative(s) | Prins, Adrianus Willem, et al V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2004/22] | Prins, Adrianus Willem, Mr. Ir., et al Vereenigde, Nieuwe Parklaan 97 2587 BN Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 01989230.6 | 20.12.2001 | [2004/22] | WO2001US48768 | Priority number, date | US20000257023P | 20.12.2000 Original published format: US 257023 P | [2004/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02056524 | Date: | 18.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1421502 | Date: | 26.05.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/38 | [2004/22] | CPC: |
H04L49/357 (EP,US);
H04L47/50 (EP,US);
H04L47/527 (EP,US);
H04L49/30 (EP,US);
H04L49/602 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/22] | Title | German: | FASERKANALPORTADAPTER | [2004/22] | English: | FIBRE CHANNEL PORT ADAPTER | [2004/22] | French: | ADAPTATEUR DE PORTE DE CANAL DE FIBRES OPTIQUES | [2004/22] | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.2003 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2003 | Search fee paid | 21.07.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.07.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 21.07.2003 | Examination requested [2004/22] | 03.07.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/01] | 07.08.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2006 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US6148004 (NELSON JEFFREY J [US], et al); | [Y]US5430442 (KAISER JOHN MICHAEL [US], et al) |